Black v. Friedrichsen et al
Plaintiff: Sandra A. Black and Sandra Black
Defendant: Naomi Friedrichsen, Interstate Reality Management Co, Erika Holiday, Hunters Run Apt. and Owners, Morris Kelsay and Hunters Run Apartment and Owners
Case Number: 1:2019cv00222
Filed: May 20, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Susan L Collins
Referring Judge: William C Lee
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Accomodations
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 10, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 10, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER: The Motion for Reconsideration filed by Plaintiff Sandra Black on June 12, 2019 ECF #5 is DENIED. The Clerk of the Court is instructed to docket the motion as an original Complaint in a new case, together with the attachment thereto titled"Affidavit of Destitution and Inability to Pay Court Filing Fees" (ECF 5-1). The new case, brought pursuant to the Fair Housing Act, 42 U.S.C. 3601 et seq, will then be randomly assigned to a judicial officer in this division who will review it, along with Black's application to proceed in forma pauperis, pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915. Signed by Judge William C Lee on 7/10/19. (Copy mailed to pro se party). (nal)
June 12, 2019 Filing 5 MOTION for Reconsideration by Plaintiff Sandra A. Black. (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Destitution and Inability to Pay Court Filing Fees)(mrm)
May 24, 2019 Filing 4 CLERK'S ENTRY OF JUDGMENT. (copy mailed to pro se party via certified mail receipt 7000 1670 0012 9260 9758) (lns)
May 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER DISMISSING CASE: Pla's #2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis is DENIED. This case is DISMISSED FOR LACK OF SUBJECT-MATTER JURISDICTION. Signed by Judge William C Lee on 5/24/2019. (Copy mailed to pro se party via certified mail receipt 7000 1670 0012 9260 9758)(lns)
May 20, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Sandra A. Black. (document not signed) (mrm) Modified on 5/21/2019 to add notation that the document is not signed (lns).
May 20, 2019 Filing 1 PRO SE COMPLAINT with 0 copies of summons forms and 0 copies of USM-285 forms and with Jury Demand against Hunters Run Apt. and Owners, Naomi Friedrichsen, Erika Holiday, Morris Kelsay, Interstate Reality Management Co filed by Sandra A. Black.(mrm)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Black v. Friedrichsen et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Naomi Friedrichsen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Interstate Reality Management Co
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Erika Holiday
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hunters Run Apt. and Owners
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Morris Kelsay
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Hunters Run Apartment and Owners
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sandra A. Black
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sandra Black
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?