Heiman v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: ROCHELLE D. HEIMAN and Rochelle D Heiman
Defendant: Social Security Administration and Commissioner of Social Security
Not Yet Classified: SSA (Court Use Only)
Case Number: 1:2019cv00243
Filed: June 3, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Michael G Gotsch
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 25, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 25, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Sharon Jefferson - AUSA on behalf of Commissioner of Social Security (Jefferson - AUSA, Sharon)
July 22, 2019 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by USM obo Rochelle D Heiman. Commissioner of Social Security served on 7/10/2019. U.S. Attorney General served on 7/10/2019. U.S. Attorney served on 7/11/2019, answer due 9/9/2019. (bas)
July 22, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Jill S Reeder on behalf of Commissioner of Social Security (Reeder, Jill)
June 6, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Commissioner of Social Security, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. NOTE: The attached document is accessible by court personnel only. (cc: USM) (sct)
June 6, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER GRANTS the Plaintiff leave to proceed in forma pauperis ECF No. #2 . WAIVES payment of the filing fee. DIRECTS, pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915(d), the United States Marshals Service to effect service of process on the Defendant. Signed by Chief Judge Theresa L Springmann on 6/6/2019. (cc: USM) (sct)
June 4, 2019 Magistrate Judge Michael G Gotsch, Sr added. (New Case, motion for ifp pending) (mlc)
June 3, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis accompanied by 3 copies of summons forms and 3 copies of USM-285 forms by Plaintiff ROCHELLE D. HEIMAN. (Attachments: #1 Appendix USM-285, #2 Proposed Summons PROPOSED SUMMONSES)(Schultis, Angelica)
June 3, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Social Security Administration, filed by ROCHELLE D. HEIMAN. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit EXHIBIT A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet CIVIL COVER SHEET, #3 Proposed Summons PROPOSED SUMMONSES)(Schultis, Angelica)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Heiman v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Social Security Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Represented By: Jill S Reeder
Represented By: Sharon Jefferson - AUSA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ROCHELLE D. HEIMAN
Represented By: Angelica Catherine Schultis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rochelle D Heiman
Represented By: Angelica Catherine Schultis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: SSA (Court Use Only)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?