Helmer v. East Noble School Corporation
Plaintiff: Nancy Helmer and Nancy E Helmer
Defendant: East Noble School Corporation
Case Number: 1:2019cv00248
Filed: June 6, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Susan L Collins
Referring Judge: William C Lee
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 15, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 15, 2019 Filing 9 RULE 16 PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL CONFERENCE held on 7/15/2019 before Magistrate Judge Susan L Collins. Pla appeared with atty Samuel Bolinger. Atty Matthew Hinkle appeared telephonically on behalf of the Dft. Dft representative not present. The #8 Report of the Parties Planning Meeting is approved in all respects (except dispositive motion deadlines and trial dates) and is hereby made an ORDER of the Court. The Summary Judgment deadline in Fed.R.Civ.P. 56(b) SHALL NOT control. Any dispositive motion SHALL brief out in accordance with L.R. 56-1. DISCOVERY DEADLINE is 7/10/2020. Following the close of discovery, unless otherwise ordered by the Court, the assigned District Judge will establish all further deadlines and dates. Parties are to file a notice with the Court by 8/30/2019 providing selection of a mediator. Magistrate Consent forms due by 8/5/2019. (FTR 1st floor.) (mr)
July 8, 2019 Filing 8 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Hinkle, Matthew)
July 1, 2019 Filing 7 CERTIFICATE Attorney - Client. (Bolinger, Samuel)
June 18, 2019 Filing 6 ANSWER to Complaint by East Noble School Corporation.(Hinkle, Matthew)
June 7, 2019 Filing 5 MAGISTRATE JUDGE CONSENT FORMS sent to all parties. (mr)
June 7, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Hearing: Rule 16 Preliminary Pretrial Conference set for 7/15/2019 at 10:30 AM in US District Court - Fort Wayne before Magistrate Judge Susan L Collins. Counsel, Plaintiff, and Defendant representative to attend.(mr)
June 7, 2019 Judge William C Lee and Magistrate Judge Susan L Collins added. NEW CASE. (jat)
June 6, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by James Alex Emerson on behalf of East Noble School Corporation (Emerson, James)
June 6, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0755-3915487.) from NOBLE COUNTY CIRCUIT COURT, Cause No. 57C01-1905-PL-000013, filed by East Noble School Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A- Complaint, #3 Exhibit B- Summons to ENSC, #4 Exhibit C- Appearance (Bolinger))(Hinkle, Matthew)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Helmer v. East Noble School Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nancy Helmer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Nancy E Helmer
Represented By: Samuel L Bolinger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: East Noble School Corporation
Represented By: Matthew L Hinkle
Represented By: James Alex Emerson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?