Warner-Borkenstein et al v. American Medical Systems Inc et al
Plaintiff: Cynthia Ann Warner-Borkenstein and David Borkenstein
Defendant: Endo Health Solutions, Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc., American Medical Systems, Inc., American Medical Systems Holdings, Inc. and Endo Pharmaceuticals Holdings Inc
Case Number: 1:2019cv00255
Filed: June 10, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Holly A Brady
Referring Judge: Susan L Collins
Nature of Suit: Personal Injury: Health Care/Pharmaceutical Personal Injury Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 21, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 7, 2019 Filing 17 MAGISTRATE JUDGE CONSENT FORMS sent to all parties. (mr)
August 7, 2019 Filing 16 NOTICE of Hearing: Telephonic Rule 16 Preliminary Pretrial Conference set for 9/10/2019 at 11:00 AM in US District Court - Fort Wayne before Magistrate Judge Susan L Collins. Court to initiate call.(mr)
August 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER for Magistrate Judge Susan Collins: #14 Dfts' Notice of Initial Extension of Time to Respond to Plas' First Amended Complaint is granted. Dfts granted to and including 9/3/2019 to file an Answer to #9 Amended Complaint. (mr)
August 5, 2019 Filing 14 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #9 Amended Complaint, by Defendants American Medical Systems Holdings, Inc., American Medical Systems, Inc., Endo Health Solutions, Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals Holdings Inc, Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. (Molter, Derek)
August 5, 2019 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Derek R Molter on behalf of All Defendants (Molter, Derek)
July 16, 2019 Filing 12 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Cynthia Ann Warner-Borkenstein, David Borkenstein. American Medical Systems Holdings, Inc. served on 7/16/2019, answer due 8/6/2019; American Medical Systems, Inc. served on 7/16/2019, answer due 8/6/2019; Endo Health Solutions, Inc. served on 7/16/2019, answer due 8/6/2019; Endo Pharmaceuticals Holdings Inc served on 7/16/2019, answer due 8/6/2019; Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc. served on 7/16/2019, answer due 8/6/2019. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service, #2 Proof of Service, #3 Proof of Service, #4 Proof of Service)(Przybysz PHV, Eric)
July 3, 2019 Filing 11 Summons Issued as to Endo Health Solutions, Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals Holdings Inc, Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. NOTE:The attached document is accessible by court personnel only. Summons forms that were electronically submitted to the court for issuance will be returned to counsel via e-mail. (jss)
July 2, 2019 Filing 10 Proposed Summons filed by David Borkenstein, Cynthia Ann Warner-Borkenstein. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Summons, #2 Proposed Summons)(Przybysz PHV, Eric)
June 28, 2019 ***Amended Pleadings Deadline terminated as per filing of Amended Complaint DE #9 (sct)
June 28, 2019 Filing 9 AMENDED COMPLAINT against American Medical Systems Holdings, Inc., American Medical Systems, Inc., Endo Health Solutions, Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals Holdings Inc, Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc., filed by Cynthia Ann Warner-Borkenstein, David Borkenstein.(Przybysz PHV, Eric)
June 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER AFFORDING Plaintiffs to and including 7/1/2019 to file an amended complaint properly alleging a basis for the Court's jurisdiction. Signed by Magistrate Judge Susan L Collins on 6/24/2019. (bas)
June 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #3 Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Eric M Przybysz PHV for David Borkenstein and Cynthia Ann Warner-Borkenstein. Signed by Magistrate Judge Susan L Collins on 06/11/2019. (ace)
June 11, 2019 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to American Medical Systems Holdings, Inc., American Medical Systems, Inc., Endo Health Solutions, Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals Holdings Inc, Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc.. NOTE:The attached document is accessible by court personnel only. Summons forms that were electronically submitted to the court for issuance will be returned to counsel via e-mail. (sct)
June 11, 2019 Filing 5 Proposed Summons filed by David Borkenstein, Cynthia Ann Warner-Borkenstein. (Przybysz PHV, Eric)
June 11, 2019 Filing 4 Proposed Summons filed by David Borkenstein, Cynthia Ann Warner-Borkenstein. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Summons, #2 Proposed Summons, #3 Proposed Summons)(Przybysz PHV, Eric)
June 11, 2019 Filing 3 Application for Attorney Eric M. Przybysz to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Cynthia Ann Warner-Borkenstein & David Borkenstein. Pro Hac Vice fee of $ 96 has been received, receipt number 0755-3919155(Przybysz PHV, Eric)
June 11, 2019 Judge Holly A Brady and Magistrate Judge Susan L Collins added. (New Case) (sct)
June 11, 2019 Filing 2 No Proposed Summons or Request for Waiver of Service received. (sct)
June 10, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND against American Medical Systems Holdings, Inc., American Medical Systems, Inc., Endo Health Solutions, Inc., Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc.,Endo Pharmaceuticals Holdings Inc( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0755-3918474.), filed by Cynthia Ann Warner-Borkenstein. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Przybysz PHV, Eric) Modified on 6/11/2019 to add dft(sct).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Warner-Borkenstein et al v. American Medical Systems Inc et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Cynthia Ann Warner-Borkenstein
Represented By: Eric M Przybysz PHV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Borkenstein
Represented By: Eric M Przybysz PHV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Endo Health Solutions, Inc.
Represented By: Derek R Molter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Endo Pharmaceuticals, Inc.
Represented By: Derek R Molter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Medical Systems, Inc.
Represented By: Derek R Molter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: American Medical Systems Holdings, Inc.
Represented By: Derek R Molter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Endo Pharmaceuticals Holdings Inc
Represented By: Derek R Molter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?