Muslic v. Pizza Hut of Fort Wayne, Inc.
Plaintiff: Vedad Muslic
Defendant: Pizza Hut of Fort Wayne, Inc.
Not Yet Classified: C Erik Chickedantz
Case Number: 1:2019cv00266
Filed: June 18, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Susan L Collins
Referring Judge: Damon R Leichty
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 14, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Damon R Leichty for all further proceedings. Judge Holly A Brady no longer assigned to case. Signed by Chief Judge Theresa L Springmann on 8/14/19. (ksc)
July 24, 2019 Filing 11 TELEPHONIC RULE 16 PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL CONFERENCE held on 7/24/2019 before Magistrate Judge Susan L Collins. Pla appeared by atty Christopher Myers. Dft appeared by atty Zachary Ahonen. The #9 Report of the Parties Planning Meeting is approved in all respects (except dispositive motions deadline and establishment of a trial date) and is hereby made an ORDER of the Court. The Summary Judgment deadline in Fed.R.Civ.P. 56(b) SHALL NOT control. Any dispositive motion SHALL brief out in accordance with L.R. 56-1. DISCOVERY DEADLINE is 8/14/2020. Following the close of discovery, unless otherwise ordered by the Court, the assigned District Judge will establish all further deadlines and dates. Erik Chickedantz appointed as Mediator. Atty Ahonen to notify Mediator by letter, copy to Atty Myers. Results of the Mediation shall be filed with the Court no later than 10 days before the Final Pretrial Conference. Magistrate Consent forms due by 8/14/2019. (FTR 1st floor.) (mr)
July 23, 2019 Filing 10 ANSWER to Complaint and Affirmative and Other Defenses by Pizza Hut of Fort Wayne, Inc..(McDermott, Brian)
July 17, 2019 Filing 9 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (McDermott, Brian)
June 21, 2019 Reset Deadlines: Answer due 7/23/2019 per #6 Agreed Notice. (jld)
June 20, 2019 Filing 8 MAGISTRATE JUDGE CONSENT FORMS sent to all parties. (mr)
June 20, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Hearing: Telephonic Rule 16 Preliminary Pretrial Conference set for 7/24/2019 at 9:30 AM in US District Court - Fort Wayne before Magistrate Judge Susan L Collins. Court to initiate call.(mr)
June 20, 2019 Filing 6 AGREED NOTICE to extend time to file answer filed by Pizza Hut of Fort Wayne, Inc. ; answer due by July 23, 2019. (Ahonen, Zachary)
June 19, 2019 Judge Holly A Brady and Magistrate Judge Susan L Collins added. (NEW CASE) (ksp)
June 18, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Zachary A Ahonen on behalf of Pizza Hut of Fort Wayne, Inc. (Ahonen, Zachary)
June 18, 2019 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Pizza Hut of Fort Wayne, Inc.. (McDermott, Brian)
June 18, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Brian L McDermott on behalf of Pizza Hut of Fort Wayne, Inc. (McDermott, Brian)
June 18, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0755-3925645.) from Allen County, Cause No. 02D09-1905-CT-000293, filed by Pizza Hut of Fort Wayne, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A-Summons and Complaint, #2 Exhibit B-State Court Pleadings, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(McDermott, Brian)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Muslic v. Pizza Hut of Fort Wayne, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vedad Muslic
Represented By: Christopher C Myers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pizza Hut of Fort Wayne, Inc.
Represented By: Zachary A Ahonen
Represented By: Brian L McDermott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: C Erik Chickedantz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?