Wallace v. Powerclean, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Lloyd Wallace
Defendant: Powerclean, Inc., Staff Finders, Inc. and Shane Kousma
Not Yet Classified: Anthony Stites
Case Number: 1:2019cv00273
Filed: June 21, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Susan L Collins
Referring Judge: Damon R Leichty
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 15, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 15, 2019 Filing 18 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Staff Finders, Inc.. (Hall, M)
August 15, 2019 Filing 17 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Powerclean, Inc.. (Hall, M)
August 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Damon R Leichty for all further proceedings. Judge Holly A Brady no longer assigned to case. Signed by Chief Judge Theresa L Springmann on 8/14/19. (ksc)
August 6, 2019 Filing 15 TELEPHONIC RULE 16 PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL CONFERENCE held on 8/6/2019 before Magistrate Judge Susan L Collins. Pla appeared by atty Christopher Myers. Dfts appeared by attys Scott Hall and John Theisen. The #10 Report of the Parties Planning Meeting is approved in all respects (except dispositive motions deadline and establishment of a trial date) and is hereby made an ORDER of the Court. The Summary Judgment deadline in Fed.R.Civ.P. 56(b) SHALL NOT control. Any dispositive motion SHALL brief out in accordance with L.R. 56-1. DISCOVERY DEADLINE is 2/28/2020. Following the close of discovery, unless otherwise ordered by the Court, the assigned District Judge will establish all further deadlines and dates. Anthony Stites appointed as Mediator. Atty Myers to notify Mediator by letter, copy to attys Hall and Theisen. Results of the Mediation shall be filed with the Court no later than 10 days before the Final Pretrial Conference. Magistrate Consent forms due by 8/27/2019. (FTR 1st floor.) (mr)
July 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER for Magistrate Judge Susan Collins: The Court on its own motion VACATES the telephonic Rule 16 Preliminary Pretrial Conference set for 7/30/2019 at 10:30 am and RESETS it for 8/6/2019 at 10:30 am. Court to initiate call. Text entry order.(mr)
July 24, 2019 Filing 13 ANSWER to #5 STATE COURT Complaint by Powerclean, Inc..(Hall, M) Modified on 7/29/2019 (jss).
July 24, 2019 Filing 12 ANSWER to #5 STATE COURT Complaint by Staff Finders, Inc..(Hall, M) Modified on 7/29/2019 (jss).
July 24, 2019 Filing 11 ANSWER to #5 STATE COURT Complaint by Shane Kousma.(Theisen, John) Modified on 7/29/2019 (jss).
July 23, 2019 Filing 10 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Theisen, John)
June 26, 2019 Set/Reset Deadlines: Per DE #9 Powerclean, Inc. and Staff Finders, Inc. answer due 7/26/2019 (nae)
June 25, 2019 Filing 9 AGREED NOTICE to extend time to file answer filed by Powerclean, Inc., Staff Finders, Inc. ; answer due by July 26, 2019. (Hall, M)
June 25, 2019 Filing 8 AGREED NOTICE to extend time to file answer filed by Shane Kousma ; answer due by July 26, 2019. (Theisen, John)
June 25, 2019 Filing 7 MAGISTRATE JUDGE CONSENT FORMS sent to all parties. (mr)
June 25, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Hearing: Telephonic Rule 16 Preliminary Pretrial Conference set for 7/30/2019 at 10:30 AM in US District Court - Fort Wayne before Magistrate Judge Susan L Collins. Court to initiate call.(mr)
June 24, 2019 Judge Holly A Brady and Magistrate Judge Susan L Collins added. (NEW CASE) (ksp)
June 21, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE by Powerclean, Inc., Staff Finders, Inc. re #1 Notice of Removal, (Hall, M)
June 21, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by John C Theisen on behalf of Shane Kousma (Theisen, John)
June 21, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by M Scott Hall on behalf of Powerclean, Inc., Staff Finders, Inc. (Hall, M)
June 21, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0755-3930419.) from Allen Superior Court, Cause No. 02D02-1905-ct-000297, filed by Shane Kousma, Staff Finders, Inc., Powerclean, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil cover sheet, #2 Exhibit A - State Court Documents)(Hall, M)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Wallace v. Powerclean, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Powerclean, Inc.
Represented By: M Scott Hall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Staff Finders, Inc.
Represented By: M Scott Hall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shane Kousma
Represented By: John C Theisen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lloyd Wallace
Represented By: Christopher C Myers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: Anthony Stites
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?