Burnau v. Caravan Facilities Management, LLC
Plaintiff: Betty Burnau
Defendant: Caravan Facilities Management, LLC
Not Yet Classified: Anthony Stites
Case Number: 1:2019cv00281
Filed: June 24, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Susan L Collins
Referring Judge: Damon R Leichty
Nature of Suit: Labor: Family and Medical Leave Act
Cause of Action: 28:1441fml
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 21, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 21, 2019 Filing 11 ANSWER to Complaint by Caravan Facilities Management, LLC.(Kopaczewski, Kristy)
August 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Damon R Leichty for all further proceedings. Judge Holly A Brady no longer assigned to case. Signed by Chief Judge Theresa L Springmann on 8/14/19. (ksc)
August 6, 2019 Filing 9 TELEPHONIC RULE 16 PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL CONFERENCE held on 8/6/2019 before Magistrate Judge Susan L Collins. Pla appeared by atty Christopher Myers. Dft appeared by atty Kristy Kopaczewski. The #6 Report of the Parties Planning Meeting is approved in all respects (except dispositive motions deadline and establishment of a trial date) and is hereby made an ORDER of the Court. The Summary Judgment deadline in Fed.R.Civ.P. 56(b) SHALL NOT control. Any dispositive motion SHALL brief out in accordance with L.R. 56-1. DISCOVERY DEADLINE is 6/12/2020. Following the close of discovery, unless otherwise ordered by the Court, the assigned District Judge will establish all further deadlines and dates. Anthony Stites appointed as Mediator. Atty Myers to notify Mediator by letter, copy to atty Kopaczewski. Results of the Mediation shall be filed with the Court no later than 10 days before the Final Pretrial Conference. Magistrate Consent forms due by 8/27/2019. (FTR 1st floor.) (mr)
July 29, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER for Magistrate Judge Susan Collins: The Court on its own motion VACATES the telephonic Rule 16 Preliminary Pretrial Conference set for 7/30/2019 at 10:00 am and RESETS it for 8/6/2019 at 10:00 am. Court to initiate call. Text entry order.(mr)
July 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER for Magistrate Judge Susan Collins: Due to a conflict on the Court's calendar, the telephonic Rule 16 Preliminary Pretrial Conference set for 7/30/2019 at 11:00 am is VACATED and RESET for 7/30/2019 at 10:00 am. Change in time only. Court to initiate call. Text entry order.(mr)
July 22, 2019 Filing 6 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Myers, Christopher)
June 26, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE by Caravan Facilities Management, LLC CIVIL COVER SHEET (Kopaczewski, Kristy)
June 25, 2019 Filing 4 MAGISTRATE JUDGE CONSENT FORMS sent to all parties. (mr)
June 25, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Hearing: Telephonic Rule 16 Preliminary Pretrial Conference set for 7/30/2019 at 11:00 AM in US District Court - Fort Wayne before Magistrate Judge Susan L Collins. Court to initiate call. (mr)
June 25, 2019 Judge Holly A Brady and Magistrate Judge Susan L Collins added. (NEW CASE) (rmc)
June 24, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0755-3931711.) from Huntington Superior Court, Cause No. 35D011905CT000423, filed by Caravan Facilities Management, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Kopaczewski, Kristy)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Burnau v. Caravan Facilities Management, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Caravan Facilities Management, LLC
Represented By: Kristy M Kopaczewski
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Betty Burnau
Represented By: Christopher C Myers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: Anthony Stites
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?