Custom Manufacturing and Fabrication, LLC v. Nautilus Insurance Company
Plaintiff: Custom Manufacturing and Fabrication, LLC
Defendant: Nautilus Insurance Company
Case Number: 1:2019cv00285
Filed: June 26, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Susan L Collins
Referring Judge: William C Lee
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 6, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 12, 2019 Filing 12 AGREED NOTICE to extend time to file answer filed by Custom Manufacturing and Fabrication, LLC ; answer due by September 11, 2019. (Gould, Katherine)
August 7, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER for Magistrate Judge Susan Collins: The unopposed #9 Motion to Continue Pretrial Conference is granted. The Rule 16 Preliminary Pretrial Conference set for 8/15/2019 at 9:30 am is VACATED and RESET for 9/17/2019 at 10:00 am US District Court - Fort Wayne before Magistrate Judge Susan L Collins. Text entry order.(mr)
August 7, 2019 Filing 10 MOTION for Hearing re #8 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Defendant Nautilus Insurance Company. (Pijls, Hans)
August 1, 2019 Filing 9 First MOTION to Continue Pretrial Conference by Plaintiff Custom Manufacturing and Fabrication, LLC. (Gould, Katherine)
July 31, 2019 Filing 8 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Defendant Nautilus Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit 1, #2 Supplement Request for Oral Argument)(Pijls, Hans)
July 19, 2019 Filing 7 MAGISTRATE JUDGE CONSENT FORMS sent to all parties. (mr)
July 19, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Hearing: Rule 16 Preliminary Pretrial Conference set for 8/15/2019 at 9:30 AM in US District Court - Fort Wayne before Magistrate Judge Susan L Collins. Counsel, Plaintiff, and Dft rep. to attend.(mr)
July 1, 2019 Set Deadlines: Nautilus Insurance Company answer due 7/31/2019. (jat)
July 1, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Katherine R Gould on behalf of Custom Manufacturing and Fabrication, LLC (Gould, Katherine)
July 1, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Jeremy J Grogg on behalf of Custom Manufacturing and Fabrication, LLC (Grogg, Jeremy)
July 1, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE by Nautilus Insurance Company of Automatic Extension of Time (Pijls, Hans)
June 27, 2019 Judge William C Lee and Magistrate Judge Susan L Collins added. (NEW CASE) (ksp)
June 26, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0755-3934892.) from Superior Court of DeKalb County, Cause No. 17D01-1905-PL-000024, filed by Nautilus Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Exhibit A)(Pijls, Hans)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Custom Manufacturing and Fabrication, LLC v. Nautilus Insurance Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nautilus Insurance Company
Represented By: Hans HJ Pijls
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Custom Manufacturing and Fabrication, LLC
Represented By: Katherine R Gould
Represented By: Jeremy J Grogg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?