Estabrook v. Commercial Warehouse & Cartage, Inc.
Plaintiff: Gail Estabrook
Defendant: Commercial Warehouse & Cartage, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv00290
Filed: June 28, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Holly A Brady
Referring Judge: Susan L Collins
Nature of Suit: Labor: Family and Medical Leave Act
Cause of Action: 28:1441fml
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 29, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 29, 2019 CASE DISMISSED WITH PREJUDICE pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(ii) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure re #9 Joint Stipulation of Dismissal With Prejudice. (cer)
July 29, 2019 Filing 9 Joint MOTION to Dismiss with Prejudice by Defendant Commercial Warehouse & Cartage, Inc.. (Suarez PHV, Nelson)
July 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER granting #6 Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Nelson H Suarez PHV for Commercial Warehouse & Cartage, Inc.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Susan L Collins on 07/11/2019. (ace)
July 3, 2019 Filing 7 ANSWER to Complaint by Commercial Warehouse & Cartage, Inc..(Wilson, Amy)
July 2, 2019 Filing 6 Application for Attorney Nelson H. Suarez to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Commercial Warehouse & Cartage, Inc.. Pro Hac Vice fee of $ 96 has been received, receipt number 0755-3940920(Pro Hac Vice Temporary login, ) (Additional attachment(s) added on 7/10/2019: #1 TN Certificate of Good Standing) (ace).
July 1, 2019 Judge Holly A Brady and Magistrate Judge Susan L Collins added. NEW CASE. (shk)
June 28, 2019 Filing 4 AFFIDAVIT of Service of Notice to All Adverse Parties and to the State Court Clerk by Commercial Warehouse & Cartage, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A: State Court Filings)(Wilson, Amy)
June 28, 2019 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Commercial Warehouse & Cartage, Inc.. (Wilson, Amy)
June 28, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Amy S Wilson on behalf of Commercial Warehouse & Cartage, Inc. (Wilson, Amy)
June 28, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0755-3937741.) from Allen Superior Court, Cause No. 02D01-1906-CT-000318, filed by Commercial Warehouse & Cartage, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A: State Court Docket, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Wilson, Amy)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Estabrook v. Commercial Warehouse & Cartage, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Gail Estabrook
Represented By: Jennifer L Hitchcock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commercial Warehouse & Cartage, Inc.
Represented By: Amy S Wilson
Represented By: Nelson H Suarez PHV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?