Local Lodge No. 1620 v TDY Industries LLC
Plaintiff: Local Lodge No. 1620 of the International Brotherhood of Boilermakers, Iron Ship Builders, Blacksmiths, Forgers and Helpers
Defendant: TDY Industries, LLC d/b/a ATI Forged Products, a California Corporation and TDY Industries, LLC
Case Number: 1:2019cv00297
Filed: July 2, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Holly A Brady
Referring Judge: Susan L Collins
Nature of Suit: Labor: Labor/Mgt. Relations
Cause of Action: 29:185
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 29, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 29, 2019 Filing 31 AMENDED COMPLAINT (SECOND) against TDY Industries, LLC, filed by Local Lodge No. 1620 of the International Brotherhood of Boilermakers, Iron Ship Builders, Blacksmiths, Forgers and Helpers. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-10)(McClitis PHV, Jason)
August 20, 2019 ***Set hearings. (jat)
August 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER GRANTING #29 Joint Motion to Vacate and VACATES the evidentiary hearing scheduled for 08/20/2019 at 1:00 PM. The Court DEEMS the Motion for Preliminary Injunction #2 and Request for Oral Argument #4 to be WITHDRAWN. and TERMS the Combined Proposed Stipulations of Fact and Agreed upon Joint Exhibits #25 as a pending motion. The Court DENIES AS MOOT the Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to Amend and File Plaintiff's First Amended Complaint #28 and GRANTS Plaintiff to file a Second Amended Complaint. The Court STAYS the proceedings for the parties to engage in the mediation process and SETS a telephonic status conference for 11/12/2019 at 11:00 AM (Eastern time). Signed by Judge Holly A Brady on 08/20/2019. (jat)
August 20, 2019 Filing 29 Joint MOTION to Vacate JOINT MOTION TO VACATE HEARING AND WITHDRAWAL OF MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION by Plaintiff Local Lodge No. 1620 of the International Brotherhood of Boilermakers, Iron Ship Builders, Blacksmiths, Forgers and Helpers. (McClitis PHV, Jason)
August 16, 2019 Filing 28 MOTION to Amend/Correct PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR LEAVE TO AMEND AND FILE PLAINTIFFS FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT by Plaintiff Local Lodge No. 1620 of the International Brotherhood of Boilermakers, Iron Ship Builders, Blacksmiths, Forgers and Helpers. (Attachments: #1 First Amended Complaint, #2 Exhibits to First Amended Complaint)(McClitis PHV, Jason)
August 14, 2019 Filing 27 BRIEF Plaintiff's Pre-Hearing Brief. (McClitis PHV, Jason)
August 14, 2019 Filing 26 BRIEF Defendant TDY Industries, LLC's Pre-Hearing Brief. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit - Attachment 1)(Kelley, Matthew)
August 7, 2019 Filing 25 JOINT STIPULATION PLAINTIFFS AND DEFENDANTS COMBINED PROPOSED STIPULATIONS OF FACT AND AGREED UPON JOINT EXHIBITS by Plaintiff Local Lodge No. 1620 of the International Brotherhood of Boilermakers, Iron Ship Builders, Blacksmiths, Forgers and Helpers. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Joint Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit Joint Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit Joint Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit Joint Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit Joint Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit Joint Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit Joint Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit Joint Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit Joint Exhibit 9)(McClitis PHV, Jason)
July 29, 2019 Filing 24 Sealed Document re #23 Brief in Opposition,,,,. (Kelley, Matthew)
July 29, 2019 Filing 23 BRIEF in Opposition to #2 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction and to Compel Expedited Arbitration filed by TDY Industries, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit CBA 2017 2021, #2 Exhibit CBA ATI Forged Products Portland Machinists CBA 2017 2021, #3 Exhibit May 2, 2019 Board of Director's Resolution regarding Sale, #4 Exhibit Heartland APA Asset Purchase Agreement 5-17-19, #5 Exhibit Wire Transfer of Funds 6-3-19, #6 Exhibit TSA Transition Services Agreement 6-3-19, #7 Exhibit CEO_s Announcement of Sale and Press Release, #8 Exhibit TDY Deed, #9 Exhibit 2019-06-03 Letter to Boilermakers regarding acquisition of Portland IN Plant by Wynnchurch Capital, #10 Exhibit 2019-07-26 Letter to Attorney Jason R. McClitis regarding meeting dates, #11 Exhibit TDY000428 - CONF PARTIALLY REDACTED June 2019 Wynchurch Invoice, #12 Exhibit Final copy of the Blacksmiths CBA - DOCS-#69209-v1-ATI Forged Products Blacksmiths CBA 2017 2021, #13 Exhibit Excerpt pages from ATI Flat Rolled CBA)(Kelley, Matthew) Modified dkt text on 7/30/2019 (kjp).
July 29, 2019 Filing 22 ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by TDY Industries, LLC.(Kelley, Matthew)
July 26, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER The #16 motion seeking the entry of an agreed protective order is GRANTED to the extent set forth in this Order. The agreed protective order submitted on July 24, 2019 (DE 16-1), is APPROVED and ADOPTED as an Order of this Court. Signed by Magistrate Judge Susan L Collins on 7/26/19. (kjp)
July 25, 2019 Filing 20 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Local Lodge No. 1620 of the International Brotherhood of Boilermakers, Iron Ship Builders, Blacksmiths, Forgers and Helpers. TDY Industries, LLC served on 7/17/2019, answer due 8/7/2019. (McClitis PHV, Jason)
July 25, 2019 Filing 19 TELEPHONIC STATUS CONFERENCE held on 7/25/2019 before Judge Holly A Brady. Pla appeared by atty Jason McClitis. Dft appeared by atty Matthew Kelley. Parties advise as to case status. Court GRANTS Dft's #15 Motion to Reschedule August 1, 2019 Hearing Date or Schedule Status Conference to Discuss the Same. Evidentiary Hearing set for 8/1/2019 is VACATED and RESET for 8/20/2019 at 01:00 PM in US District Court - Fort Wayne before Judge Holly A Brady. Dft's Response to the Motion for Preliminary Injunction and Supplement REAFFIRMED to be filed by 7/29/2019. Any Stipulations as to facts and as to any exhibits to be filed by 8/7/2019. Court to be provided with a copy of the exhibits. Pre-Hearing Briefs to be filed by 8/14/2019. (Court Reporter Tina Gallucci.) (cer)
July 24, 2019 Filing 18 SUPPLEMENT to #2 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction SUPPLEMENTAL BRIEF TO PLAINTIFFS MOTION FOR PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION filed by Local Lodge No. 1620 of the International Brotherhood of Boilermakers, Iron Ship Builders, Blacksmiths, Forgers and Helpers. (McClitis PHV, Jason)
July 24, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER FOR JUDGE HOLLY A BRADY: Telephonic Status Conference SET for 7/25/2019 at 11:30 AM in US District Court - Fort Wayne before Judge Holly A Brady re #15 Motion to Reschedule August 1, 2019 Hearing Date or Schedule Status Conference to Discuss the Same. Court will initiate call. (cer)
July 24, 2019 Filing 16 MOTION for Protective Order (Unopposed) by Defendant TDY Industries, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Ex. 1- Jointly Proposed Stipulated Protective Order)(Maloney, Andrew)
July 23, 2019 Filing 15 MOTION to Continue August 1, 2019 Hearing Date or Schedule Status Conference to Discuss the Same by Defendant TDY Industries, LLC. (Kelley, Matthew)
July 22, 2019 Filing 14 TELEPHONIC STATUS CONFERENCE held on 7/22/2019 before Judge Holly A Brady. Pla appeared by atty Jason McClitis. Dft appeared by attys Matthew Kelley and Andrew Maloney. Parties advise as to case status. Pla to file a Supplement to its #2 Motion for Preliminary Injunction by 7/24/2019. Dft's Response to the Motion and Supplement to be filed by 7/29/2019. Any Stipulations to be filed by 7/31/2019. The #3 Memorandum in Support of Plaintiff's Motion for Preliminary Injunction, Supplement to Motion for Preliminary Injunction and Response to Supplement and Motion for Preliminary Injunction to be e-mailed to chambers in Word format. Evidentiary Hearing SET for 8/1/2019 at 10:00 AM in US District Court - Fort Wayne before Judge Holly A Brady. (Court Reporter Tina Gallucci.) (cer)
July 22, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER FOR JUDGE HOLLY A BRADY: Telephonic Status Conference SET for 7/22/2019 at 04:00 PM in US District Court - Fort Wayne before Judge Holly A Brady re #2 Motion for Preliminary Injunction. Court will initiate call. (cer)
July 17, 2019 Filing 12 Corporate Disclosure Statement by TDY Industries, LLC identifying Corporate Parent TDY Industries, LLC for TDY Industries, LLC.. (Kelley, Matthew)
July 15, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew J Kelley on behalf of TDY Industries, LLC (Kelley, Matthew)
July 15, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Andrew J Maloney on behalf of TDY Industries, LLC (Maloney, Andrew)
July 11, 2019 Filing 9 Summons Issued as to TDY Industries, LLC. NOTE:The attached document is accessible by court personnel only. Summons forms that were electronically submitted to the court for issuance will be returned to counsel via e-mail. (kjp)
July 10, 2019 Filing 8 Proposed Summons filed by Local Lodge No. 1620 of the International Brotherhood of Boilermakers, Iron Ship Builders, Blacksmiths, Forgers and Helpers. (McClitis PHV, Jason)
July 9, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER granting #5 Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Jason R. McClitis PHV for Local Lodge No. 1620 of the International Brotherhood of Boilermakers, Iron Ship Builders, Blacksmiths, Forgers and Helpers. Signed by Magistrate Judge Susan L Collins on 07/09/2019. (ace)
July 3, 2019 Filing 6 No proposed summons or request for waiver of service received. (bas)
July 2, 2019 Filing 5 APPLICATION for Attorney Jason McClitis to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Plaintiff Local Lodge No. 1620 of the International Brotherhood of Boilermakers, Iron Ship Builders, Blacksmithes, Forgers and Helpers. (Fee of $96.00 paid, Receipt #INN1010235) (bas)
July 2, 2019 Filing 4 Request for Oral Argument re #2 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Plaintiff Local Lodge No. 1620 of the International Brotherhood of Boilermakers, Iron Ship Builders, Blacksmiths, Forgers and Helpers. (bas)
July 2, 2019 Filing 3 MEMORANDUM in Support of #2 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by Local Lodge No. 1620 of the International Brotherhood of Boilermakers, Iron Ship Builders, Blacksmiths, Forgers and Helpers. (bas)
July 2, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Plaintiff Local Lodge No. 1620 of the International Brotherhood of Boilermakers, Iron Ship Builders, Blacksmiths, Forgers and Helpers. (bas)
July 2, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against TDY Industries, LLC d/b/a ATI Forged Products, a California Corporation filed by Local Lodge No. 1620 of the International Brotherhood of Boilermakers, Iron Ship Builders, Blacksmiths, Forgers and Helpers. (Filing fee $ 400.00 paid 7/2/2019 Receipt #INN1010234)(bas) (Additional attachment(s) added on 7/3/2019: #1 Cover Letter, #2 Civil Cover Sheet) (bas).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Local Lodge No. 1620 v TDY Industries LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Local Lodge No. 1620 of the International Brotherhood of Boilermakers, Iron Ship Builders, Blacksmiths, Forgers and Helpers
Represented By: Jason McClitis PHV
Represented By: Jason R McClitis PHV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TDY Industries, LLC d/b/a ATI Forged Products, a California Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: TDY Industries, LLC
Represented By: Matthew J Kelley
Represented By: Andrew J Maloney
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?