Miller v. Queen Nails of Fort Wayne, LLC
Plaintiff: Ukena D. Miller
Defendant: Queen Nails of Fort Wayne, LLC
Not Yet Classified: John C Theisen
Case Number: 1:2019cv00308
Filed: July 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Holly A Brady
Referring Judge: Susan L Collins
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 21, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 21, 2019 Filing 11 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Queen Nails of Fort Wayne, LLC. (Lemert, Martha)
August 19, 2019 Filing 10 TELEPHONIC RULE 16 PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL CONFERENCE held on 8/19/2019 before Magistrate Judge Susan L Collins. Pla appeared by atty Christopher Myers. Dft appeared by atty Martha Lemert. The #7 Report of the Parties Planning Meeting is approved in all respects (except dispositive motions deadline and establishment of a trial date) and is hereby made an ORDER of the Court. The Summary Judgment deadline in Fed.R.Civ.P. 56(b) SHALL NOT control. Any dispositive motion SHALL brief out in accordance with L.R. 56-1. DISCOVERY DEADLINE is 3/27/2020. Following the close of discovery, unless otherwise ordered by the Court, the assigned District Judge will establish all further deadlines and dates. John Theisen appointed as Mediator. Atty Lemert to notify Mediator by letter, copy to atty Myers. Results of the Mediation shall be filed with the Court no later than 10 days before the Final Pretrial Conference. Magistrate Consent forms due by 9/9/2019. (FTR 1st floor.) (mr)
August 15, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Cathy T Serrano on behalf of Ukena D. Miller (Serrano, Cathy)
August 12, 2019 Filing 8 Defendant's ANSWER to Complaint by Queen Nails of Fort Wayne, LLC.(Lemert, Martha)
August 6, 2019 Filing 7 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Lemert, Martha)
July 24, 2019 Filing 6 MAGISTRATE JUDGE CONSENT FORMS sent to all parties. (mr)
July 24, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Hearing: Telephonic Rule 16 Preliminary Pretrial Conference set for 8/19/2019 at 9:45 AM in US District Court - Fort Wayne before Magistrate Judge Susan L Collins. Court to initiate call.(mr)
July 15, 2019 Judge Holly A Brady and Magistrate Judge Susan L Collins added. NEW CASE (kjp)
July 12, 2019 Filing 3 AGREED NOTICE to extend time to file answer filed by Queen Nails of Fort Wayne, LLC ; answer due by August 16, 2019. (Lemert, Martha)
July 12, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Martha M Lemert on behalf of Queen Nails of Fort Wayne, LLC (Lemert, Martha)
July 12, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0755-3948430.) from Allen Superior Court No. 3, Cause No. 02D03-1906-CT-000365, filed by Queen Nails of Fort Wayne, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A - State Court pleadings, orders and docket)(Lemert, Martha)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Miller v. Queen Nails of Fort Wayne, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Queen Nails of Fort Wayne, LLC
Represented By: Martha M Lemert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ukena D. Miller
Represented By: Christopher C Myers
Represented By: Cathy T Serrano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: John C Theisen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?