Grange Property and Casualty Insurance Company v. Zahner et al
Plaintiff: Grange Property and Casualty Insurance Company
Defendant: Thomas Daley, Ramona D. Zahner and Craig E. Zahner
Case Number: 1:2019cv00309
Filed: July 12, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Susan L Collins
Referring Judge: William C Lee
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 15, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 15, 2019 Filing 11 SUPPLEMENT Jurisdictional Statement filed by Grange Property and Casualty Insurance Company. (Smith, Charles)
August 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER: Plaintiff is AFFORDED to and including August 20, 2019, to file a supplemental jurisdictional statement in an effort to establish diversity jurisdiction. Signed by Magistrate Judge Susan L Collins on 8/14/19. (ksp) (cc: copy mailed to pro se party)
August 6, 2019 Filing 9 Letter from Thomas Daley requesting additional time to find representation. (bas)
July 30, 2019 Filing 8 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Grange Property and Casualty Insurance Company. (Smith, Charles)
July 15, 2019 Filing 7 Summons Issued as to Thomas Daley, Craig E. Zahner, Ramona D. Zahner. NOTE:The attached document is accessible by court personnel only. Summons forms that were electronically submitted to the court for issuance will be returned to counsel via e-mail. (sct)
July 15, 2019 Judge William C Lee and Magistrate Judge Susan L Collins added. (New Case) (sct)
July 12, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Jeffrey M Kraft on behalf of Grange Property and Casualty Insurance Company (Kraft, Jeffrey)
July 12, 2019 Filing 5 Proposed Summons filed by Grange Property and Casualty Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Smith, Charles)
July 12, 2019 Filing 4 Proposed Summons filed by Grange Property and Casualty Insurance Company. (Smith, Charles)
July 12, 2019 Filing 3 Proposed Summons filed by Grange Property and Casualty Insurance Company. (Smith, Charles)
July 12, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Charles S Smith on behalf of Grange Property and Casualty Insurance Company (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Smith, Charles)
July 12, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Declaratory Relief against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0755-3948432.), filed by Grange Property and Casualty Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit)(Smith, Charles) (Additional attachment(s) added on 7/16/2019: #3 Civil Cover Sheet) (ksc).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Grange Property and Casualty Insurance Company v. Zahner et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomas Daley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ramona D. Zahner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Craig E. Zahner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Grange Property and Casualty Insurance Company
Represented By: Charles S Smith
Represented By: Jeffrey M Kraft
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?