Great American Insurance Company of New York v. Melt Solutions, LLC
Plaintiff: Great American Insurance Company of New York
Defendant: Melt Solutions, LLC
Case Number: 1:2019cv00321
Filed: July 19, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Susan L Collins
Referring Judge: Damon R Leichty
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 16, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 16, 2019 Filing 19 Defendant Melt Solutions, LLC's ANSWER to #1 Complaint, Affirmative Defenses, First COUNTERCLAIM against Great American Insurance Company of New York by Melt Solutions, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13)(Ashford, C)
September 16, 2019 Filing 18 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Gumbiner, Krysta)
August 23, 2019 Filing 17 STATEMENT Supplemental Jurisdictional filed by Great American Insurance Company of New York. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Gumbiner, Krysta)
August 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER Plaintiff is afforded to and including August 23, 2019, to file a supplemental jurisdictional statement that properly alleges the citizenship of the parties. Signed by Magistrate Judge Susan L Collins on 8/16/19. (kjp)
August 15, 2019 Filing 15 STATEMENT Supplemental Jurisdictional. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B)(Gumbiner, Krysta)
August 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE. Case reassigned to Judge Damon R Leichty for all further proceedings. Judge Holly A Brady no longer assigned to case. Signed by Chief Judge Theresa L Springmann on 8/14/19. (ksc)
August 13, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER: Plaintiff is afforded to and including 8/20/19 to file a supplemental jurisdictional statement that properly alleges the citizenship of Defendant. Signed by Magistrate Judge Susan L Collins on 8/13/19. (nal)
August 12, 2019 Filing 12 MAGISTRATE JUDGE CONSENT FORMS sent to all parties. (mr)
August 12, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Hearing: Telephonic Rule 16 Preliminary Pretrial Conference set for 9/18/2019 at 10:30 am (EST) in US District Court - Fort Wayne before Magistrate Judge Susan L Collins. Court to initiate call.(mr)
August 12, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER for Magistrate Judge Susan Collins: The #9 Unopposed Motion for Extension of Time to File Responsive Pleading is granted. Dft granted to and including 9/16/2019 to file Answer to #1 Complaint. Text entry order.(mr)
August 8, 2019 Filing 9 First MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint, by Defendant Melt Solutions, LLC. (Ashford, C)
August 8, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by C Anthony Ashford on behalf of All Defendants (Ashford, C)
August 6, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Great American Insurance Company of New York. Melt Solutions, LLC served on 7/31/2019, answer due 8/21/2019. (Gumbiner, Krysta)
July 30, 2019 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Melt Solutions, LLC. c/o Shirley Dunn at Normangee Texas address NOTE:The attached document is accessible by court personnel only. Summons forms that were electronically submitted to the court for issuance will be returned to counsel via e-mail., SUMMONS REISSUED as to Melt Solutions, LLC. NOTE: The attached document is accessible by court personnel only. Summons forms that were electronically submitted to the court for issuance will be returned to counsel via e-mail. (kjp)
July 29, 2019 Filing 5 Proposed Summons filed by Great American Insurance Company of New York. (Gumbiner, Krysta)
July 22, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Melt Solutions, LLC. NOTE:The attached document is accessible by court personnel only. Summons forms that were electronically submitted to the court for issuance will be returned to counsel via e-mail. (sct)
July 22, 2019 Judge Holly A Brady and Magistrate Judge Susan L Collins added. (New Case) (sct)
July 19, 2019 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Great American Insurance Company of New York identifying Corporate Parent American Financial Group Inc for Great American Insurance Company of New York.. (Gumbiner, Krysta)
July 19, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Krysta K Gumbiner on behalf of Great American Insurance Company of New York (Gumbiner, Krysta)
July 19, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Declaratory Judgment against Melt Solutions, LLC( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0755-3955784.), filed by Great American Insurance Company of New York. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Civil Cover Sheet, #6 Proposed Summons)(Gumbiner, Krysta)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Great American Insurance Company of New York v. Melt Solutions, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Melt Solutions, LLC
Represented By: C Anthony Ashford
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Great American Insurance Company of New York
Represented By: Krysta K Gumbiner
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?