Lyon v. FXI Inc.
Plaintiff: Taylor C. Lyon
Defendant: FXI Inc.
Case Number: 1:2019cv00322
Filed: July 22, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Susan L Collins
Referring Judge: William C Lee
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 11, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 11, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER for Magistrate Judge Susan Collins: Pla's unopposed #18 Motion to Continue Rule 16 Preliminary Pretrial Conference is granted. The Rule 16 Preliminary Pretrial Conference set for 9/12/2019 at 3:30 pm is VACATED and RESET for 9/25/2019 at 9:30 am in US District Court - Fort Wayne. Text entry order. (mr)
September 11, 2019 Filing 18 MOTION to Continue Rule 16 Preliminary Pretrial Conference by Plaintiff Taylor C. Lyon. (Guin-Lowry, Rachel)
August 29, 2019 Filing 17 REPORT by Taylor C. Lyon . (Guin-Lowry, Rachel)
August 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER for Magistrate Judge Susan Collins: Due to a conflict on the Court's calendar, the Rule 16 Preliminary Pretrial Conference set for 8/26/2019 at 10:00 am is VACATED and RESET for 9/12/2019 at 3:30 pm in US District Court - Fort Wayne before Magistrate Judge Susan L Collins. Text entry order.(mr)
August 20, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER for Magistrate Judge Susan Collins: The #14 Motion to Withdraw is granted. The appearance of Attorney Christopher C Myers is hereby withdrawn on behalf of Plaintiff. Text entry order.(mr)
August 20, 2019 Filing 14 MOTION to Withdraw as Attorney by Plaintiff Taylor C. Lyon. (Myers, Christopher)
August 19, 2019 Filing 13 REPORT by FXI Inc. Attorney Certification. (Seidler, Robert)
August 19, 2019 Filing 12 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Seidler, Robert)
August 19, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Rachel J Guin-Lowry on behalf of Taylor C. Lyon (Guin-Lowry, Rachel)
August 1, 2019 Filing 10 MAGISTRATE JUDGE CONSENT FORMS sent to all parties. (mr)
August 1, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Hearing: Rule 16 Preliminary Pretrial Conference set for 8/26/2019 at 10:00 AM in US District Court - Fort Wayne before Magistrate Judge Susan L Collins. Counsel, Plaintiff, and Dft rep. to attend.(mr)
July 25, 2019 Filing 8 Filing fee: $ 400.00, receipt number INN1010320 (bas)
July 23, 2019 Judge William C Lee and Magistrate Judge Susan L Collins added. (NEW CASE) (No filing fee or IFP submitted) (rmc)
July 22, 2019 Filing 6 ANSWER to #7 State Court Complaint and Defenses by FXI Inc..(Seidler, Robert) Modified on 7/24/2019 (jss).
July 22, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE by FXI Inc. of Proof of Service and Filing of Removal in State Court (Seidler, Robert)
July 22, 2019 Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement by FXI Inc. identifying Corporate Parent FXI Holdings Inc for FXI Inc... (Seidler, Robert)
July 22, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Aaron J Williamson on behalf of FXI Inc. (Williamson, Aaron)
July 22, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Robert F Seidler on behalf of FXI Inc. (Seidler, Robert)
July 22, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL by FXI Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - State Court Summons and Complaint, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Seidler, Robert) Modified on 7/23/2019 to correct docket text, incorrect event used(rmc).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Lyon v. FXI Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FXI Inc.
Represented By: Robert F Seidler
Represented By: Aaron J Williamson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Taylor C. Lyon
Represented By: Christopher C Myers
Represented By: Rachel J Guin-Lowry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?