Hinchman v. General Motors, LLC
Plaintiff: Timothy R. Hinchman
Defendant: General Motors, LLC
Not Yet Classified: Anthony Stites
Case Number: 1:2019cv00324
Filed: July 23, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Holly A Brady
Referring Judge: Susan L Collins
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:12101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 18, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 18, 2019 Filing 16 TELEPHONIC RULE 16 PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL CONFERENCE held on 9/18/2019 before Magistrate Judge Susan L Collins. Pla appeared by atty John Theisen. Dft appeared by atty Tiffany Gooden. The #14 Report of the Parties Planning Meeting is approved in all respects (except dispositive motions deadline and establishment of a trial date) and is hereby made an ORDER of the Court. The Summary Judgment deadline in Fed.R.Civ.P. 56(b) SHALL NOT control. Any dispositive motion SHALL brief out in accordance with L.R. 56-1. A maximum of 8 depositions by Pla and 8 by Dft. DISCOVERY DEADLINE is 6/5/2020. Following the close of discovery, unless otherwise ordered by the Court, the assigned District Judge will establish all further deadlines and dates. Anthony Stites appointed as Mediator. Atty Theisen to notify Mediator by letter, copy to Atty Gooden. Results of the Mediation shall be filed with the Court no later than 10 days before the Final Pretrial Conference. Magistrate Consent forms due by 10/9/2019. (FTR 1st floor.) (mr)
September 18, 2019 Filing 15 CERTIFICATE Attorney Certification. (Gooden, Tiffany)
September 13, 2019 Filing 14 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Theisen, John)
September 13, 2019 Filing 13 Defendant's ANSWER to #1 Complaint, by General Motors, LLC.(Gooden, Tiffany)
August 19, 2019 Filing 12 MAGISTRATE JUDGE CONSENT FORMS sent to all parties. (mr)
August 19, 2019 Filing 11 NOTICE of Hearing: Telephonic Rule 16 Preliminary Pretrial Conference set for 9/18/2019 at 9:30 AM in US District Court - Fort Wayne before Magistrate Judge Susan L Collins. Court to initiate call.(mr)
August 15, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE by General Motors, LLC of Automatic Extension of Time (Gooden, Tiffany)
August 15, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Bonnie L Martin on behalf of General Motors, LLC (Martin, Bonnie)
August 15, 2019 Filing 8 Corporate Disclosure Statement by General Motors, LLC identifying Corporate Parent General Motors LLC for General Motors, LLC.. (Gooden, Tiffany)
August 15, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Tiffany L Gooden on behalf of General Motors, LLC (Gooden, Tiffany)
August 15, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Tiffany L Gooden on behalf of General Motors, LLC (Gooden, Tiffany) ***FILING ERROR - ATTORNEY REFILED DOCUMENT AT DE#7 *** Modified on 8/16/2019 (ace).
July 30, 2019 Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Timothy R. Hinchman. General Motors, LLC served on 7/26/2019, answer due 8/16/2019. (Theisen, John) (Attachment: #1 Affidavit of Service). (nal)
July 24, 2019 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to General Motors, LLC. NOTE:The attached document is accessible by court personnel only. Summons forms that were electronically submitted to the court for issuance will be returned to counsel via e-mail. (sct)
July 24, 2019 Judge Holly A Brady and Magistrate Judge Susan L Collins added. (New Case) (sct)
July 23, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Nathaniel O Hubley on behalf of Timothy R. Hinchman (Hubley, Nathaniel)
July 23, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by John C Theisen on behalf of Timothy R. Hinchman (Theisen, John)
July 23, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND against General Motors, LLC( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0755-3957078.), filed by Timothy R. Hinchman. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Charge of Discrimination, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Proposed Summons)(Theisen, John)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hinchman v. General Motors, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Timothy R. Hinchman
Represented By: Nathaniel O Hubley
Represented By: John C Theisen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: General Motors, LLC
Represented By: Bonnie L Martin
Represented By: Tiffany L Gooden
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: Anthony Stites
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?