Morris v. North American Manufacturing, Inc
Plaintiff: ISIAH MORRIS
Defendant: NORTH AMERICAN MANUFACTURING, INC. d/b/a AMERICAN MOBILE POWER CO. and North American Manufacturing, Inc
Case Number: 1:2019cv00328
Filed: July 24, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Susan L Collins
Referring Judge: William C Lee
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42:1981
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 19, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 19, 2019 Filing 12 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Wolcott, Christopher)
September 17, 2019 Filing 11 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by North American Manufacturing, Inc.(Shockley, Scott)
August 29, 2019 Set Deadlines/Hearings: North American Manufacturing, Inc answer due 9/18/2019. (mlc)
August 29, 2019 Waiver of Service Deadlines/Hearings terminated. (mlc)
August 28, 2019 Filing 10 MAGISTRATE JUDGE CONSENT FORMS sent to all parties. (mr)
August 28, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Hearing: Rule 16 Preliminary Pretrial Conference set for 9/25/2019 at 10:00 AM in US District Court - Fort Wayne before Magistrate Judge Susan L Collins. (mr)
August 27, 2019 Filing 8 Corporate Disclosure Statement by North American Manufacturing, Inc. (Shockley, Scott)
August 27, 2019 Filing 7 AGREED NOTICE to extend time to file answer filed by North American Manufacturing, Inc ; answer due by September 18, 2019. (Shockley, Scott)
August 27, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Scott E Shockley on behalf of North American Manufacturing, Inc (Shockley, Scott)
August 5, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of a Lawsuit and Request to Waive Service of Summons sent to North America Manufacturing, Inc, d/b/a American Mobile Power Company. (Copy mailed to defendant). Waiver of Service due by 9/4/2019. (Attachments: #1 Order, #2 Complaint) (nal)
August 5, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER granting #3 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. The Court DEFERS payment of the filing fee, ORDERS the plaintiff to pay the $350.00 filing fee from the proceeds of any recovery received in this case and DIRECTS, pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915(d), the clerk and the United States Marshals Service to issue and serve process at North America Manufacturing, Inc. d/b/a American Mobile Power Company, Attn: Katherine White, 201 East JacksonStreet, 5th Floor, Muncie, IN 47305. Signed by Judge William C Lee on 8/5/19. (nal)
July 30, 2019 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Isiah Morris. (Wolcott, Christopher)
July 25, 2019 Judge William C Lee and Magistrate Judge Susan L Collins added. Filing fee not paid. (kjp)
July 24, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Christopher S Wolcott on behalf of ISIAH MORRIS (Wolcott, Christopher)
July 24, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND against NORTH AMERICAN MANUFACTURING, INC. d/b/a AMERICAN MOBILE POWER CO., filed by ISIAH MORRIS. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Summons, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Wolcott, Christopher)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Morris v. North American Manufacturing, Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ISIAH MORRIS
Represented By: Christopher S Wolcott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: NORTH AMERICAN MANUFACTURING, INC. d/b/a AMERICAN MOBILE POWER CO.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: North American Manufacturing, Inc
Represented By: Scott E Shockley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?