Ramos v. Parkview Health System, Inc.
Plaintiff: Rebecca Ramos
Defendant: Parkview Health System, Inc., d/b/a Parkview Physicians Group and Parkview Health System, Inc.
Not Yet Classified: Anthony Stites
Case Number: 1:2019cv00329
Filed: July 25, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Holly A Brady
Referring Judge: Susan L Collins
Nature of Suit: Labor: Family and Medical Leave Act
Cause of Action: 28:1441fml
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 11, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 11, 2019 Filing 12 TELEPHONIC RULE 16 PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL CONFERENCE held on 9/11/2019 before Magistrate Judge Susan L Collins. Pla appeared by atty Jennifer Hitchcock. Dft appeared by attys Martha Lemert and Marie Kolp. The #10 Report of the Parties Planning Meeting is approved in all respects (except dispositive motions deadline and establishment of a trial date) and is hereby made an ORDER of the Court. The Summary Judgment deadline in Fed.R.Civ.P. 56(b) SHALL NOT control. Any dispositive motion SHALL brief out in accordance with L.R. 56-1. DISCOVERY DEADLINE is 5/15/2020. Following the close of discovery, unless otherwise ordered by the Court, the assigned District Judge will establish all further deadlines and dates. Anthony Stites appointed as Mediator. Atty Hitchcock to notify Mediator by letter, copy to Atty Lemert. Results of the Mediation shall be filed with the Court no later than 10 days before the Final Pretrial Conference. Magistrate Consent forms due by 10/2/2019. (FTR 1st floor.) (mr)
August 29, 2019 Filing 11 Defendant's ANSWER to Complaint by Parkview Health System, Inc..(Lemert, Martha)
August 26, 2019 Filing 10 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Lemert, Martha)
August 14, 2019 Filing 9 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Parkview Health System, Inc. identifying Corporate Parent Parkview Health System, Inc. for Parkview Health System, Inc... (Lemert, Martha)
August 7, 2019 Filing 8 MAGISTRATE JUDGE CONSENT FORMS sent to all parties. (mr)
August 7, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Hearing: Telephonic Rule 16 Preliminary Pretrial Conference set for 9/11/2019 at 10:00 AM in US District Court - Fort Wayne before Magistrate Judge Susan L Collins. Court to initiate call. (mr)
August 5, 2019 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Shane C Mulholland on behalf of Parkview Health System, Inc. (Mulholland, Shane)
August 2, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Shane C Mulholland on behalf of Parkview Health System, Inc. (Mulholland, Shane) ***FILING ERROR - ATTORNEY INSTRUCTED TO REFILE; ATTORNEY RE-FILED DOCUMENT AT DE#6 *** Modified on 8/5/2019 (ace). Modified on 8/6/2019 (ace).
July 26, 2019 Answer due date RESET to 8/30/2019 pursuant to #3 Agreed Notice. (mrm)
July 26, 2019 Judge Holly A Brady and Magistrate Judge Susan L Collins added. (NEW CASE) (mrm)
July 25, 2019 Filing 3 AGREED NOTICE to extend time to file answer filed by Parkview Health System, Inc., d/b/a Parkview Physicians Group ; answer due by August 30, 2019. (Lemert, Martha)
July 25, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Martha M Lemert on behalf of Parkview Health System, Inc., d/b/a Parkview Physicians Group (Lemert, Martha)
July 25, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0755-3960414.) from Allen Superior Court, Cause No. 02D02-1907-CT-000382, filed by Parkview Health System, Inc., d/b/a Parkview Physicians Group. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Lemert, Martha)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ramos v. Parkview Health System, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Parkview Health System, Inc., d/b/a Parkview Physicians Group
Represented By: Martha M Lemert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Parkview Health System, Inc.
Represented By: Martha M Lemert
Represented By: Shane C Mulholland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rebecca Ramos
Represented By: Jennifer L Hitchcock
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: Anthony Stites
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?