Cox v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: Steven Michael Cox
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Not Yet Classified: SSA (Court Use Only)
Case Number: 1:2019cv00362
Filed: August 16, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Damon R Leichty
Nature of Suit: Social Security: RSI Tax Suits
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 14, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 9, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Stacey I Cole on behalf of Commissioner of Social Security (Cole, Stacey)
September 19, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Sharon Jefferson - AUSA on behalf of Commissioner of Social Security (Jefferson - AUSA, Sharon)
September 16, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by USM's obo Steven Michael Cox. Commissioner of Social Security served on 9/10/2019, Attorney General served 9/9/2019 and US Attorney served 9/10/2019, answer due 11/12/2019. (mrm)
August 22, 2019 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Commissioner of Social Security, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. NOTE: The attached document is accessible by court personnel only. (cc: USM)(mrm)
August 21, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER GRANTING #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. The payment of the filing fee is WAIVED. The US Marshals Service is DIRECTED to effect service of process on the defendant. Signed by Judge Damon R Leichty on 8/22/2019. (cc: USM)(mrm)
August 19, 2019 Judge Damon R Leichty added. (NEW CASE; MOTION PENDING) (ksp)
August 16, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Jason S Rodman on behalf of Steven Michael Cox (Rodman, Jason)
August 16, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Randal S Forbes on behalf of Steven Michael Cox (Forbes, Randal)
August 16, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis accompanied by 3 copies of summons forms and 3 copies of USM-285 forms by Plaintiff Steven Michael Cox. (Forbes, Randal)
August 16, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT to Review Decision of Commissioner of Social Security Administration against Commissioner of Social Security, filed by Steven Michael Cox. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A Notice of Appeals Council Action, #2 Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Proposed Summons, #4 Proposed Summons)(Forbes, Randal)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Cox v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Represented By: Stacey I Cole
Represented By: Sharon Jefferson - AUSA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Steven Michael Cox
Represented By: Randal S Forbes
Represented By: Jason S Rodman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: SSA (Court Use Only)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?