Birch REA Partners Inc v. Brombacher et al
Plaintiff: Birch REA Partners Inc
Defendant: Randolph Brombacher, Saavedra Goodwin, Andrew Palmison and Rothberg Logan & Warsco LLP
Case Number: 1:2019cv00387
Filed: September 6, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Holly A Brady
Referring Judge: Susan L Collins
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 11, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 23, 2019 Filing 18 MAGISTRATE JUDGE CONSENT FORMS sent to all parties. (mr)
October 23, 2019 Filing 17 NOTICE of Hearing: Telephonic Rule 16 Preliminary Pretrial Conference set for 11/13/2019 at 10:00 AM in US District Court - Fort Wayne before Magistrate Judge Susan L Collins. Court to initiate call. (mr)
October 15, 2019 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael E Brown on behalf of Randolph Brombacher, Saavedra Goodwin (Brown, Michael)
October 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER granting #6 Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Brett A Datto PHV for Birch REA Partners Inc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Susan L Collins on 10/8/2019. (ace)
October 8, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER for Magistrate Judge Susan Collins: Attorney Brett A. Datto's application to appear pro hac vice #6 is GRANTED. Dft's objection #7 to the application advances arguments outside the scope of the application criteria and are more appropriately raised in a motion to disqualify. Therefore, Dft's objection to Attorney Datto's application is overruled without prejudice. Text entry order. (mr)
October 2, 2019 Filing 13 RESPONSE by Birch REA Partners Inc to #7 Objection, . (Vegeler, Robert)
October 2, 2019 Filing 12 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Birch REA Partners Inc. Andrew Palmison waiver sent on 9/9/2019, answer due 11/8/2019. (Vegeler, Robert)
October 2, 2019 Filing 11 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Birch REA Partners Inc. Rothberg Logan & Warsco LLP waiver sent on 9/9/2019, answer due 11/8/2019. (Vegeler, Robert)
September 30, 2019 Filing 10 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Birch REA Partners Inc. Saavedra Goodwin waiver sent on 9/9/2019, answer due 11/8/2019. (Vegeler, Robert)
September 30, 2019 Filing 9 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Birch REA Partners Inc. Randolph Brombacher waiver sent on 9/9/2019, answer due 11/8/2019. (Vegeler, Robert)
September 26, 2019 Filing 8 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Birch REA Partners Inc. (Vegeler, Robert)
September 25, 2019 Filing 7 OBJECTION by Rothberg Logan & Warsco LLP to #6 Application for Attorney Brett A. Datto to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Birch RAE Partners, Inc.. Pro Hac Vice fee of $ 96 has been received, receipt number 0755-4015751 . (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(O'Neill, Michael)
September 24, 2019 Filing 6 Application for Attorney Brett A. Datto to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Birch RAE Partners, Inc.. Pro Hac Vice fee of $ 96 has been received, receipt number 0755-4015751(Datto PHV, Brett)
September 18, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Jessica L Mullen on behalf of Rothberg Logan & Warsco LLP and Andrew Palmison (Mullen, Jessica) Modified on 9/26/2019 TO INCLUDE ANDREW PALMISON(ace).
September 18, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Michael E O'Neill on behalf of Rothberg Logan & Warsco LLP and Andrew Palmison (O'Neill, Michael) Modified on 9/26/2019 TO INCLUDE ANDREW PALMISON (ace).
September 11, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Robert Owen Vegeler on behalf of Birch REA Partners Inc (Vegeler, Robert)
September 9, 2019 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Randolph Brombacher, Andrew Palmison, Rothberg Logan & Warsco LLP, Saavedra Goodwin. NOTE:The attached document is accessible by court personnel only. Summons forms that were electronically submitted to the court for issuance will be returned to counsel via e-mail. (mlc)
September 9, 2019 Judge Holly A Brady and Magistrate Judge Susan L Collins added. (NEW CASE) (mlc)
September 6, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0755-3999702.), filed by Birch REA Partners Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, part I, #5 Exhibit D, part II, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G, #9 Exhibit H, #10 Exhibit I, #11 Exhibit J, #12 Exhibit K, #13 Civil Cover Sheet, #14 Proposed Summons to Randolph Brombacher, #15 Proposed Summons to Andrew Palmison, #16 Proposed Summons to Saavedra Goodwin, #17 Proposed Summons to Rothberg Logan & Warsco LLP)(Vegeler, Robert)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Birch REA Partners Inc v. Brombacher et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Randolph Brombacher
Represented By: Michael E Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Saavedra Goodwin
Represented By: Michael E Brown
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew Palmison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rothberg Logan & Warsco LLP
Represented By: Michael E O'Neill
Represented By: Jessica L Mullen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Birch REA Partners Inc
Represented By: Robert Owen Vegeler
Represented By: Brett A Datto PHV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?