Baker v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: BRYAN S. BAKER and Bryan S Baker
Defendant: COMM'R of SOC S ANDREW M. SAUL and Commissioner of Social Security
Not Yet Classified: SSA (Court Use Only)
Case Number: 1:2019cv00392
Filed: September 10, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Michael G Gotsch
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42:205
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 12, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 6, 2019 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by David M Mansfield on behalf of Commissioner of Social Security (Mansfield, David)
November 5, 2019 Filing 9 MAGISTRATE JUDGE CONSENT FORMS IN A SOCIAL SECURITY APPEAL CASE sent to all parties. Magistrate Consent forms due by 11/19/2019. (slm)
November 4, 2019 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Sharon Jefferson - AUSA on behalf of Commissioner of Social Security (Jefferson - AUSA, Sharon)
October 23, 2019 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Bryan S Baker. Commissioner of Social Security served on 10/1/2019, US Attorney's Office served 10/1/2019 - answer due 12/2/2019. (mrm)
September 16, 2019 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Commissioner of Social Security, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. NOTE: The attached document is accessible by court personnel only. (rmf)
September 16, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER: The Court GRANTS the Plaintiff leave to proceed in forma pauperis #2 , WAIVES payment of the filing fee, and DIRECTS the United States Marshals Service to effect service of process on the Defendant. (Copy sent to USM) Signed by Chief Judge Theresa L Springmann on 9/16/2019. (rmf)
September 11, 2019 Magistrate Judge Michael G Gotsch, Sr added. NEW CASE. IFP PENDING. (kjp)
September 10, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Joseph R Wambach on behalf of BRYAN S. BAKER (Wambach, Joseph)
September 10, 2019 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew F Richter on behalf of BRYAN S. BAKER (Richter, Matthew)
September 10, 2019 Filing 2 First MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff BRYAN S. BAKER. (Richter, Matthew)
September 10, 2019 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against ANDREW M. SAUL, filed by BRYAN S. BAKER. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons U.S. Attorney General, #3 USM 285- U.S. Attorney General, #4 Proposed Summons U.S. Attorney N.D. IND, #5 USM 285- U.S. Attorney N.D. IND, #6 Proposed Summons SSA OGC, #7 USM 285- SSA OGC)(Richter, Matthew)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Baker v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: BRYAN S. BAKER
Represented By: Joseph R Wambach
Represented By: Matthew F Richter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bryan S Baker
Represented By: Joseph R Wambach
Represented By: Matthew F Richter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: COMM'R of SOC S ANDREW M. SAUL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Represented By: David M Mansfield
Represented By: Sharon Jefferson - AUSA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: SSA (Court Use Only)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?