Freshwater v. Nevels et al
Plaintiff: Otis Freshwater
Defendant: Corporal Sugar, Reggie Nevels and Todd Fleece
Case Number: 1:2019cv00408
Filed: September 25, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Holly A Brady
Referring Judge: Susan L Collins
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 15, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 15, 2019 Filing 6 CLERK'S ENTRY OF JUDGMENT. (Copy mailed to pro se party by certified mail 7019 0700 0000 3512 4276) (bas)
November 14, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER DISMISSING CASE WITHOUT PREJUDICE and WAIVING the filing fee. Otis Freshwater is CAUTIONED that if he (or anyone acting at his direction) attempts to reinstate this case, he will be obliged to pay the filing fee as required by 28 U.S.C. 1915(b). Signed by Judge Holly A Brady on 11/14/2019. (Copy mailed to pro se party by certified mail 7019 0700 0000 3512 4276)(bas)
October 10, 2019 Filing 4 Mail Returned from Otis Freshwater as Undeliverable - Recipient Not at This Address - #3 Order. (nal)
September 30, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER: The Court DENIES the motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis without prejudice ECF No. #2 , DIRECTS the Clerk to write this cause number on a blank Prisoner Motion to Proceed In Forma Pauperis AO 240 (Rev. 7/10) (INND Rev. 8/16) and send it to Otis Freshwater, GRANTS Otis Freshwater until 10/30/19 to either pay the filing fee or file an in forma pauperis motion accompanied by his trust fund ledgers for the past six months and CAUTIONS Otis Freshwater that, if he does not respond by the deadline this case may be dismissed without further notice. Signed by Judge Holly A Brady on 9/30/19. (Copy mailed as directed in Order). (nal)
September 25, 2019 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Otis Freshwater. (mrm)
September 25, 2019 Filing 1 PRO SE COMPLAINT with 2 copies of summons forms and 0 copies of USM-285 forms against Todd Fleece, Reggie Nevels, Corporal Sugar, filed by Otis Freshwater. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Summons, #2 Envelope) (copy sent to Plaintiff with case #.)(mrm) Modified on 9/27/2019 (mrm).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Freshwater v. Nevels et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Corporal Sugar
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Reggie Nevels
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Todd Fleece
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Otis Freshwater
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?