Starkey et al v. Nissan North America Inc
Plaintiff: D Anthony Starkey and Lori Starkey
Defendant: Nissan North America Inc
Not Yet Classified: Eric Chickedantz and C Erik Chickedantz
Case Number: 1:2019cv00431
Filed: October 9, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Susan L Collins
Referring Judge: William C Lee
Nature of Suit: Personal Inj. Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 12, 2019. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 12, 2019 Filing 16 RULE 16 PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL CONFERENCE held on 11/12/2019 before Magistrate Judge Susan L Collins. Plas appeared with atty John Theisen. Atty Jessica Williams Schnelker appeared on behalf of Dft. Ruth Gates, Sr. Counsel, appeared telephonically on behalf of Dft. The #11 Report of the Parties Planning Meeting is approved in all respects (except dispositive motion deadlines and trial dates) and is hereby made an ORDER of the Court. The Summary Judgment deadline in Fed.R.Civ.P. 56(b) SHALL NOT control. Any dispositive motion SHALL brief out in accordance with L.R. 56-1. DISCOVERY DEADLINE is 11/2/2020. Following the close of discovery, unless otherwise ordered by the Court, the assigned District Judge will establish all further deadlines and dates. Erik Chickedantz appointed as Mediator. Atty Theisen to notify Mediator by letter, copy to Atty Williams Schnelker. Results of the Mediation shall be filed with the Court no later than 10 days before the Final Pretrial Conference. Magistrate Consent forms due by 12/3/2019. (FTR 1st floor.) (mr)
November 6, 2019 Filing 15 CERTIFICATE Attorney Certification- D. Anthony Starkey. (Theisen, John)
November 6, 2019 Filing 14 CERTIFICATE Attorney Certification- Lori Starkey. (Theisen, John)
November 4, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER for Magistrate Judge Susan Collins: At the Rule 16 Preliminary Pretrial Conference on 11/12/2019, the Parties should be prepared to discuss the amount in controversy for purposes of diversity jurisdiction. Text entry order.(mr)
October 29, 2019 Filing 12 CERTIFICATE of Attorneys re ADR Options. (Williams Schnelker, Jessica)
October 25, 2019 Filing 11 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Williams Schnelker, Jessica)
October 23, 2019 Filing 10 MAGISTRATE JUDGE CONSENT FORMS sent to all parties. (mr)
October 23, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Hearing: Rule 16 Preliminary Pretrial Conference set for 11/12/2019 at 9:30 AM in US District Court - Fort Wayne before Magistrate Judge Susan L Collins. Counsel, Plaintiff, and Dft rep. to attend.(mr)
October 14, 2019 Filing 8 Defendant Nissan North America, Inc.'s ANSWER to Complaint and Demand for Trial by Jury by Nissan North America Inc.(Williams Schnelker, Jessica)
October 10, 2019 Judge William C Lee and Magistrate Judge Susan L Collins added. (NEW CASE) (mlc)
October 9, 2019 Filing 6 AMENDED NOTICE OF REMOVAL by Nissan North America Inc re #1 Notice of Removal, Amended Notice of Removal (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet (Amended))(Williams Schnelker, Jessica) Modified on 10/10/2019 to edit title of pdf (mlc).
October 9, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Kevin C Schiferl on behalf of Nissan North America Inc (Schiferl, Kevin)
October 9, 2019 Filing 4 NOTICE by Nissan North America Inc re #1 Notice of Removal, Declaration of Service to All Adverse Parties and to the State Court Clerk (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, State Court Notice of Filing Notice of Removal)(Williams Schnelker, Jessica)
October 9, 2019 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Nissan North America Inc identifying Corporate Parent Nissan Motor Company Ltd for Nissan North America Inc.. (Williams Schnelker, Jessica)
October 9, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Jessica Williams Schnelker on behalf of Nissan North America Inc (Williams Schnelker, Jessica)
October 9, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0755-4030569.) from Allen County Superior Court, Cause No. 02D02-1909-T-000515, filed by Nissan North America Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A: State Court Complaint, Demand for Jury Trial, E-Filing Appearance by Attorney in Civil Case, Summons, Order Setting Case Management Conference, Notice of Order Setting Case Management Conference, Affidavit of Service, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Williams Schnelker, Jessica)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Starkey et al v. Nissan North America Inc
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: D Anthony Starkey
Represented By: John C Theisen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lori Starkey
Represented By: John C Theisen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Nissan North America Inc
Represented By: Jessica Williams Schnelker
Represented By: Kevin C Schiferl
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: Eric Chickedantz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: C Erik Chickedantz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?