Winfrey v. LaGrange County Sheriff
Plaintiff: Mary E Winfrey
Defendant: LaGrange County Sheriff
Not Yet Classified: Anthony Stites
Case Number: 1:2019cv00471
Filed: November 5, 2019
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Holly A Brady
Referring Judge: Susan L Collins
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 18, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 4, 2019 Filing 10 TELEPHONIC RULE 16 PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL CONFERENCE held on 12/4/2019 before Magistrate Judge Susan L Collins. Pla appeared by atty Cathy Serrano. Dft appeared by atty Daniel Witte. The #8 Report of the Parties Planning Meeting is approved in all respects (except trial dates) and is hereby made an ORDER of the Court. Discovery deadline is 10/12/2020. Deadline for filing dispositive motions is 11/13/2020. Following the close of discovery, unless otherwise ordered by the Court, the assigned District Judge will establish all further deadlines and dates. Anthony Stites appointed as Mediator. Atty Serrano to notify Mediator by letter, copy to Atty Witte. Results of the Mediation shall be filed with the Court no later than 10 days before the Final Pretrial Conference. Magistrate Consent forms due by 12/26/2019. (FTR 1st floor.) (mr)
December 3, 2019 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Cathy T Serrano on behalf of Mary E Winfrey (Serrano, Cathy)
November 25, 2019 Filing 8 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Cole, Aimee)
November 20, 2019 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Daniel M Witte on behalf of LaGrange County Sheriff (Witte, Daniel)
November 8, 2019 Filing 6 MAGISTRATE JUDGE CONSENT FORMS sent to all parties. (mr)
November 8, 2019 Filing 5 NOTICE of Hearing: Telephonic Rule 16 Preliminary Pretrial Conference set for 12/4/2019 at 10:00 AM in US District Court - Fort Wayne before Magistrate Judge Susan L Collins. Court to initiate call. (mr)
November 6, 2019 Filing 3 ANSWER to Complaint by LaGrange County Sheriff.(Cole, Aimee)
November 5, 2019 Judge Holly A Brady and Magistrate Judge Susan L Collins added. (NEW CASE) (mrm)
November 5, 2019 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Aimee Rivera Cole on behalf of LaGrange County Sheriff (Cole, Aimee)
November 5, 2019 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0755-4056672.) from LaGrange Superior, Cause No. 44D01-1910-CT-000028, filed by LaGrange County Sheriff. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A- State Court filings)(Cole, Aimee)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Winfrey v. LaGrange County Sheriff
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mary E Winfrey
Represented By: Christopher C Myers
Represented By: Cathy T Serrano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LaGrange County Sheriff
Represented By: Aimee Rivera Cole
Represented By: Daniel M Witte
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not yet classified: Anthony Stites
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?