Ward v. St. Anne Home of the Diocese of Fort Wayne-South Bend, Inc.
Plaintiff: Donitha A. Ward and Donitha A Ward
Defendant: St. Anne Home of the Diocese of Fort Wayne-South Bend, Inc. d/b/a St. Anne Home & Retirement Community and St Anne Home of the Diocese of Fort Wayne-South Bend, Inc
Case Number: 1:2020cv00001
Filed: January 2, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Holly A Brady
Referring Judge: Michael G Gotsch
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 18, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 18, 2020 Filing 9 MAGISTRATE JUDGE CONSENT FORMS sent to all parties.. (slm)
February 18, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER Joint Proposed Discovery due by 3/6/2020. Rule 16 Preliminary Pretrial Conference set for 3/19/2020 11:00 AM in US District Court - South Bend before Magistrate Judge Michael G Gotsch Sr.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Michael G Gotsch, Sr on 2/18/20. (slm)
February 5, 2020 Filing 7 ANSWER to Complaint with Affirmative Defenses by St Anne Home of the Diocese of Fort Wayne-South Bend, Inc.(Hall, M)
January 8, 2020 Set Deadlines/Hearings: per #6 St Anne Home of the Diocese of Fort Wayne-South Bend, Inc answer due 2/6/2020. (rmc)
January 7, 2020 Filing 6 AGREED NOTICE to extend time to file answer filed by St Anne Home of the Diocese of Fort Wayne-South Bend, Inc ; answer due by February 6, 2020. (Hall, M)
January 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER OF RECUSAL. The undersigned Magistrate Judge of the District Court hereby recuses herself from these proceedings. The Clerk is directed to randomly reassign this case to a Magistrate Judge within the District for the purpose of conducting all non-dispositive pretrial proceedings, pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(A); FED. R. CIV. P. 72(a) and Local Rule 40-1. Case reassigned to Magistrate Judge Michael G Gotsch, Sr for all further proceedings. Magistrate Judge Susan L Collins no longer assigned to case. Signed by Magistrate Judge Susan L Collins on 1/6/2020. (lhc)
January 2, 2020 Judge Holly A Brady and Magistrate Judge Susan L Collins added. (NEW CASE) (bas)
January 2, 2020 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by St. Anne Home of the Diocese of Fort Wayne-South Bend, Inc. d/b/a St. Anne Home & Retirement Community. (Hall, M)
January 2, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by M Scott Hall on behalf of St. Anne Home of the Diocese of Fort Wayne-South Bend, Inc. d/b/a St. Anne Home & Retirement Community (Hall, M)
January 2, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0755-4104921.) from Allen Superior Court, Cause No. 02D01-1912-CT-000655, filed by St. Anne Home of the Diocese of Fort Wayne-South Bend, Inc. d/b/a St. Anne Home & Retirement Community. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Exhibit A)(Hall, M)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ward v. St. Anne Home of the Diocese of Fort Wayne-South Bend, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donitha A. Ward
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Donitha A Ward
Represented By: Christopher C Myers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: St. Anne Home of the Diocese of Fort Wayne-South Bend, Inc. d/b/a St. Anne Home & Retirement Community
Represented By: M Scott Hall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: St Anne Home of the Diocese of Fort Wayne-South Bend, Inc
Represented By: M Scott Hall
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?