Beiswenger v. Red Wing Brands of America, Inc.
Plaintiff: Michael Beiswenger
Defendant: Red Wing Brands of America, Inc.
Not Classified By Court: Anthony Stites
Case Number: 1:2020cv00003
Filed: January 2, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Holly A Brady
Referring Judge: Susan L Collins
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 5, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 SCHEDULING ORDER AND MEMORANDUM OF PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: The Court sets the following deadlines pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b): The parties will exchange the information required by Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(a)(1) by 3/6/2020.The last date for the completion of all fact and expert discovery is 11/20/2020. The serving of reports from retained experts under Rule 26(a)(2) are due from plaintiff by 12/18/2020; and from defendant(s) by 1/19/2021. The last date for the Plaintiff to amend the pleadings without leave of court is 4/14/2020 and for Defendant is 4/17/2020. The deadline to file any dispositive motions is 1/8/2021. The parties have agreed upon Anthony Stites as mediator. The presiding judge will hold a status conference to set a final pretrial conference and trail. Signed by Magistrate Judge Susan L Collins on 2/5/2020. (mrm)
February 4, 2020 Filing 14 TELEPHONIC RULE 16 PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL CONFERENCE held on 2/4/2020 before Magistrate Judge Susan L Collins. Pla appeared by atty Cathy Serrano. Dft appeared by attys Drew Ambrose and Brian McDermott. The #11 Report of the Parties Planning Meeting is approved in all respects (except establishment of a trial date). Anthony Stites appointed as Mediator. Atty Serrano to notify Mediator by letter, copy to attys Ambrose and McDermott. Magistrate Consent forms due by 2/25/2020. Court to issue Scheduling Order.(FTR 1st floor.) (mr)
February 3, 2020 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Cathy T Serrano on behalf of Michael Beiswenger (Serrano, Cathy)
January 31, 2020 Filing 12 ANSWER to Complaint , Defenses and Affirmative Defenses by Red Wing Brands of America, Inc..(McDermott, Brian)
January 30, 2020 Filing 11 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (McDermott, Brian)
January 6, 2020 Answer due date as to Red Wings Brands of America, Inc. reset to 02/06/2020 per #10 Agreed Notice. (jat)
January 6, 2020 Filing 10 AGREED NOTICE to extend time to file answer filed by Red Wing Brands of America, Inc. ; answer due by February 6, 2020. (McDermott, Brian)
January 3, 2020 Filing 9 MAGISTRATE JUDGE CONSENT FORMS sent to all parties. (mr)
January 3, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE of Hearing: Telephonic Rule 16 Preliminary Pretrial Conference set for 2/4/2020 at 9:30 AM in US District Court - Fort Wayne before Magistrate Judge Susan L Collins. Court to initiate call.(mr)
January 3, 2020 Judge Holly A Brady and Magistrate Judge Susan L Collins added. NEW CASE. (nal)
January 3, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Brian L McDermott on behalf of Red Wing Brands of America, Inc. (McDermott, Brian)
January 3, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Drew C Ambrose on behalf of Red Wing Brands of America, Inc. (Ambrose, Drew)
January 2, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE by Red Wing Brands of America, Inc. of Proof of Service and Notice of Filing Notice of Removal in State Court (Ambrose, Drew)
January 2, 2020 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Red Wing Brands of America, Inc.. (Ambrose, Drew)
January 2, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Drew C Ambrose on behalf of Red Wing Brands of America, Inc. (Ambrose, Drew) ***FILING ERROR - ATTORNEY INSTRUCTED TO RE-FILE; ATTORNEY RE-FILED AT #5 *** Modified on 1/3/2020 (ace). Modified on 1/3/2020 (ace).
January 2, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0755-4105424.) from Allen County Superior Court, Cause No. 02D02-1912-CT-000633, filed by Red Wing Brands of America, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Summons and Complaint, #2 Exhibit B - State Court Documents, #3 Civil Cover Sheet)(Ambrose, Drew)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Beiswenger v. Red Wing Brands of America, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Red Wing Brands of America, Inc.
Represented By: Drew C Ambrose
Represented By: Brian L McDermott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Michael Beiswenger
Represented By: Christopher C Myers
Represented By: Cathy T Serrano
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: Anthony Stites
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?