Grady v. JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. et al
Plaintiff: Edward A Grady, Jr.
Defendant: Dean Kruse, The Dekko Foundation and The Board of Directors, Attorney Michael A Yoder, Tad Dekko, Phil Salsbery, The Kendallville Bank & Trust, The Kruse Foundation, Erica Dekko, JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A., Judge Robert E Kirsch, Michael A Yoder and Robert E Kirsch
Case Number: 1:2020cv00045
Filed: January 27, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Susan L Collins
Referring Judge: William C Lee
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 10, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 10, 2020 Filing 18 PROOF OF SERVICE Executed as to Edward A Grady, Jr. re #14 Order Dismissing Case, #15 Clerks Judgment. (lhc)
February 10, 2020 Filing 17 Plaintiff's RESPONSE to Defendants #11 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by Edward A Grady, Jr. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Plaintiff Memorandum in Support of his Reply to Deny Defendants Motion to Dismiss)(nae)
February 6, 2020 Filing 16 Plaintiff's NOTICE of Consent for Removal to Federal Court by Edward A Grady, Jr (nae)
February 4, 2020 Filing 15 CLERK'S ENTRY OF JUDGMENT. (Copy mailed to pro se party, cert 7000 0600 0028 2819 6944 & Noble Co Superior Court) (lhc)
February 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER: The Court DISMISSES WITH PREJUDICE the plaintiff's federal claims and REMANDS this case to the Noble County Superior Court for further proceedings on the State law claims. Signed by Judge William C Lee on 2/3/2020. (Copy mailed to pro se party, cert 7000 0600 0028 2819 6944 & Noble Co Superior Court) (lhc)
February 3, 2020 Filing 13 NOTICE by Robert E Kirsch of Filing of Motion to Dismiss in State Court Case (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Motion to Dismiss, #2 Exhibit Memorandum in Support of Motion to Dismiss)(Slinker, Mollie)
February 3, 2020 Filing 12 BRIEF in Support of #11 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM filed by JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Complaint)(Underwood, Apryl)
February 3, 2020 Filing 11 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM by Defendant JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.. (Underwood, Apryl)
January 31, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Mollie A Slinker on behalf of Robert E Kirsch (Slinker, Mollie)
January 28, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER: Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 455, the undersigned recuses herself from this case. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 137 and Local Rule 40-1(f)(2)(A), the Clerk of this Court is directed to reassign this matter to Judge William C. Lee for all further proceedings. Judge Judge Holly A Brady recused. Case reassigned to Judge William C Lee for all further proceedings. Signed by Judge Holly A Brady on 1/28/2020. (lhc)
January 28, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Apryl Elizabeth Underwood on behalf of JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. (Underwood, Apryl)
January 28, 2020 Filing 6 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE OF NOTICE TO ADVERSE PARTY OF REMOVAL TO FEDERAL COURT. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Notice to Adverse Party of Removal to Federal Court)(Underwood, Apryl)
January 28, 2020 Judge Holly A Brady and Magistrate Judge Susan L Collins added. (NEW CASE) (Sent copy of docket sheet w/case # to plt) (rmc)
January 27, 2020 Filing 5 CERTIFICATE of Interest Parties. (Underwood, Apryl)
January 27, 2020 Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement by JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. identifying Corporate Parent JPMorgan Chase & Co. for JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A... (Underwood, Apryl)
January 27, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE by JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. of Unanimous Consent (Underwood, Apryl)
January 27, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Apryl Elizabeth Underwood on behalf of JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. (Underwood, Apryl) ***FILING ERROR ATTORNEY INSTRUCTED TO RE-RILE; REFILED AT #8 *** Modified on 1/29/2020 (ace).
January 27, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL By Defendant JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0755-4127154.) from Noble County Circuit Court, Cause No. 57C01-2001-CT-001, filed by JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit State Court Complaint, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Underwood, Apryl)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Grady v. JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dean Kruse
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Dekko Foundation and The Board of Directors
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Attorney Michael A Yoder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tad Dekko
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Phil Salsbery
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Kendallville Bank & Trust
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Kruse Foundation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Erica Dekko
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: JPMorgan Chase Bank, N.A.
Represented By: Apryl Elizabeth Underwood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Judge Robert E Kirsch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Michael A Yoder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Robert E Kirsch
Represented By: Mollie A Slinker
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Edward A Grady, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?