Shield Exteriors Inc v. 4Ever Metal Roofing LLC et al
Plaintiff: Shield Exteriors Inc
Defendant: John Estabrook, John Estabrook dba Local2Online, Travis Sliger, 4Ever Metal Roofing LLC and John Estabrook dba Roof Genius Pro
Case Number: 1:2020cv00064
Filed: February 7, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Holly A Brady
Referring Judge: Susan L Collins
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15:1125
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 10, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 10, 2020 Filing 16 ALIAS SUMMONS ISSUED as to John Estabrook, John Estabrook, John Estabrook. NOTE: The attached document is accessible by court personnel only. Summons forms that were electronically submitted to the court for issuance will be returned to counsel via e-mail. (lhc)
March 9, 2020 Filing 15 Proposed Summons filed by Shield Exteriors Inc. (Landis, Amanda)
March 9, 2020 Filing 14 Proposed Summons filed by Shield Exteriors Inc. (Landis, Amanda)
March 9, 2020 Filing 13 Proposed Summons filed by Shield Exteriors Inc. (Landis, Amanda)
February 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER for Magistrate Judge Susan Collins: #11 Dfts' Motion for Extension of Time is granted. Dfts, 4Ever Metal Roofing LLC and Travis Sliger are granted to and including 3/18/2020 to file an Answer to the #1 Complaint. Text entry order.(mr)
February 26, 2020 Filing 11 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Defendant 4Ever Metal Roofing LLC. (Hursh, Nicholas)
February 26, 2020 Filing 10 NOTICE of Appearance by Nicholas J Hursh on behalf of Travis Sliger (Hursh, Nicholas)
February 26, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE of Appearance by Nicholas J Hursh on behalf of 4Ever Metal Roofing LLC (Hursh, Nicholas)
February 21, 2020 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Shield Exteriors Inc. Travis Sliger served on 2/14/2020, answer due 3/6/2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Landis, Amanda)
February 21, 2020 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Shield Exteriors Inc. 4Ever Metal Roofing LLC served on 2/14/2020, answer due 3/6/2020. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Landis, Amanda)
February 11, 2020 Filing 6 SUPPLEMENT to #1 Complaint,, Form AO 120 filed by Shield Exteriors Inc. (Landis, Amanda)
February 11, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by J Blake Hike on behalf of Shield Exteriors Inc (Hike, J)
February 11, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Jon A Bragalone on behalf of Shield Exteriors Inc (Bragalone, Jon)
February 11, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Amanda K Landis on behalf of Shield Exteriors Inc (Landis, Amanda)
February 10, 2020 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to 4Ever Metal Roofing LLC, John Estabrook, John Estabrook, John Estabrook, Travis Sliger. NOTE:The attached document is accessible by court personnel only. Summons forms that were electronically submitted to the court for issuance will be returned to counsel via e-mail. (bas)
February 7, 2020 Judge Holly A Brady and Magistrate Judge Susan L Collins added. (NEW CASE) (bas)
February 7, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0755-4140936.), filed by Shield Exteriors Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit Exhibit H, #9 Proposed Summons, #10 Proposed Summons, #11 Proposed Summons, #12 Proposed Summons, #13 Proposed Summons, #14 Civil Cover Sheet)(Landis, Amanda)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Shield Exteriors Inc v. 4Ever Metal Roofing LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Estabrook
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Estabrook dba Local2Online
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Travis Sliger
Represented By: Nicholas J Hursh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: 4Ever Metal Roofing LLC
Represented By: Nicholas J Hursh
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Estabrook dba Roof Genius Pro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Shield Exteriors Inc
Represented By: Amanda K Landis
Represented By: J Blake Hike
Represented By: Jon A Bragalone
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?