Padgett v. Norfolk Southern Corporation
Plaintiff: Terry Padgett
Defendant: Norfolk Southern Corporation
Not Classified By Court: Daniel Sigler
Case Number: 1:2020cv00233
Filed: June 23, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Holly A Brady
Referring Judge: Susan L Collins
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Employment
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 12101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 14, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 20 SCHEDULING ORDER AND MEMORANDUM OF PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: The Court sets the following deadlines pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b): The parties will exchange the information required by Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(a)(1) by 8/26/2020. The last date for the completion of all fact and expert discovery is 2/12/2021. The serving of reports from retained experts under Rule 26(a)(2) are due from plaintiff by 11/10/2020; and from defendant by 12/10/2020. The last date for the Plaintiff to amend the pleadings without leave of court is 10/12/2020 and for Defendant is 11/10/2020. The deadline to file any dispositive motions is 4/12/2021. Parties have agreed upon Daniel Sigler as mediator. Signed by Magistrate Judge Susan L Collins on 8/12/2020. (mrm)
August 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 19 TELEPHONIC RULE 16 PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL CONFERENCE held on 8/12/2020 before Magistrate Judge Susan L Collins. Pla appeared by atty Keenan Wilson. Dft appeared by attys Bridget Daley and Matthew Humble. The #16 Report of the Parties Planning Meeting is approved in all respects (except establishment of a trial date). Daniel Sigler appointed as Mediator. Atty Wilson to notify Mediator by letter, copy to attys Daley and Humble. Magistrate Consent forms due by 9/2/2020. (FTR 1st floor.) (mr)
August 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER granting #14 Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Bridget J Daley PHV for Norfolk Southern Corporation. Signed by Magistrate Judge Susan L Collins on 8/12/2020. (ace)
August 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER granting #15 Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Kathleen J Goldman PHV for Norfolk Southern Corporation. Signed by Magistrate Judge Susan L Collins on 8/12/2020. (ace)
August 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 16 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Humble, Matthew)
August 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 15 Application for Attorney Kathleen Jones Goldman to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Norfolk Southern Corporation. Pro Hac Vice fee of $96 has been received, receipt number 0755-4305348. Modified payment information on 8/7/2020 (Pro Hac Vice Temporary login, ) Modified on 8/7/2020 (ace). (Main Document 15 replaced on 8/12/2020 to include years admitted to federal courts) (ace). Modified on 8/12/2020 (ace).
August 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 14 Application for Attorney Bridget Joyce Daley to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Norfolk Southern Corporation. Pro Hac Vice fee of $ 96 has been received, receipt number 0755-4305322(Pro Hac Vice Temporary login, )
August 4, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Norfolk Southern Corporation. (Duffey, John)
August 3, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Norfolk Southern Corporation.(Humble, Matthew)
July 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 MAGISTRATE JUDGE CONSENT FORMS sent to all parties. (mr)
July 21, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 NOTICE of Hearing: Telephonic Rule 16 Preliminary Pretrial Conference set for 8/12/2020 at 10:00 AM in US District Court - Fort Wayne before Magistrate Judge Susan L Collins. Court to initiate call.(mr)
July 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 AGREED NOTICE to extend time to file answer filed by Norfolk Southern Corporation ; answer due by August 3, 2020. (Humble, Matthew)
July 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Matthew M Humble on behalf of Norfolk Southern Corporation (Humble, Matthew)
July 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by John C Duffey on behalf of Norfolk Southern Corporation (Duffey, John)
July 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Terry Padgett. Norfolk Southern Corporation served on 6/29/2020, answer due 7/20/2020. (Haskin, John)
June 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Norfolk Southern Corporation. NOTE:The attached document is accessible by court personnel only. Summons forms that were electronically submitted to the court for issuance will be returned to counsel via e-mail. (rmc)
June 24, 2020 Opinion or Order Judge Holly A Brady and Magistrate Judge Susan L Collins added. (NEW CASE) (rmc)
June 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Keenan D Wilson on behalf of Terry Padgett (Wilson, Keenan)
June 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by John H Haskin on behalf of Terry Padgett (Haskin, John)
June 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND against Norfolk Southern Corporation( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0755-4260657.), filed by Terry Padgett. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons)(Haskin, John)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Padgett v. Norfolk Southern Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Norfolk Southern Corporation
Represented By: Bridget J Daley PHV
Represented By: John C Duffey
Represented By: Matthew M Humble
Represented By: Kathleen J Goldman PHV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Terry Padgett
Represented By: Keenan D Wilson
Represented By: John H Haskin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: Daniel Sigler
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?