Vang v. Singh et al
Plaintiff: Paul A Vang
Defendant: Uttamjeet Singh, Sukhraj Singh and Uttamjeet Singh doing business as UR Trucking
Not Classified By Court: Kevin Fitzharris
Case Number: 1:2020cv00248
Filed: July 1, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Holly A Brady
Referring Judge: Susan L Collins
Nature of Suit: Motor Vehicle
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 5, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 SCHEDULING ORDER AND MEMORANDUM OF PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL CONFERENCE:The Court sets the following deadlines pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b): The parties will exchange the information required by Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(a)(1) by 9/14/2020.The last date for the completion of all fact and expert discovery is 8/15/2021. The serving of reports from retained experts under Rule 26(a)(2) are due from plaintiff by 5/15/2021; and from defendant(s) by 7/14/2021.The last date for the Plaintiff to seek leave of Court to amend the pleadings is 10/15/2020; and for Defendant is 11/16/2020.The deadline to file any dispositive motions is 9/20/2021, with any response due 28 days thereafter and any reply due 14 days after the filing of a response, consistent with Local Rule 56-1(b) and (c). The parties have agreed upon Kevin Fitzharris as mediator. Signed by Magistrate Judge Susan L Collins on 8/5/2020. (bas)
August 5, 2020 Filing 12 TELEPHONIC RULE 16 PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL CONFERENCE held on 8/5/2020 before Magistrate Judge Susan L Collins. Pla appeared by atty David Farnbauch. Dfts appeared by atty Lesley Pfleging. The #11 Report of the Parties Planning Meeting is approved in all respects (except establishment of a trial date). Kevin Fitzharris appointed as Mediator. Atty Farnbauch to notify Mediator by letter, copy to atty Pfleging. Magistrate Consent forms due by 8/26/2020. (FTR 1st floor.) (mr)
July 27, 2020 Filing 11 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Farnbauch, David)
July 8, 2020 Filing 10 ANSWER to Complaint and Affirmative Defenses by Uttamjeet Singh, Sukhraj Singh, Uttamjeet Singh.(Pfleging, Lesley)
July 8, 2020 Filing 9 MAGISTRATE JUDGE CONSENT FORMS sent to all parties. (mr)
July 8, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE of Hearing: Telephonic Rule 16 Preliminary Pretrial Conference set for 8/5/2020 at 10:00 AM in US District Court - Fort Wayne before Magistrate Judge Susan L Collins. Court to initiate call. At the hearing, the parties should be prepared to discuss the amount in controversy for purposes of establishing diversity jurisdiction. (mr)
July 2, 2020 Judge Holly A Brady and Magistrate Judge Susan L Collins added. (NEW CASE) (rmc)
July 1, 2020 Filing 4 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Uttamjeet Singh, Sukhraj Singh, Uttamjeet Singh. (Pfleging, Lesley)
July 1, 2020 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Uttamjeet Singh. (Pfleging, Lesley)
July 1, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Lesley A Pfleging on behalf of All Defendants (Pfleging, Lesley)
July 1, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0755-4270105.) from Allen County Superior Court, Cause No. 02D09-2004-CT-000220, filed by Uttamjeet Singh, Uttamjeet Singh, Sukhraj Singh. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 State Court Record (Plaintiffs Appearance, Complaint, Summons, Certificate of Issuance of Summons, Order for Case Management Conference, Notice of Dismissal, First Amended Complaint, Summons, Order of Dismissal of Defendant Royal King Logistics, LLC., Certificate of Issuance of Summons, Motion to Dismiss Defendants, Royal King Logistics, Inc. UR Trucking, Inc. and Devs Trans, Second Amended Complaint, and Summons to Uttamjeet Singh d/b/a UR Trucking.))(Pfleging, Lesley)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Vang v. Singh et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Uttamjeet Singh
Represented By: Lesley A Pfleging
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sukhraj Singh
Represented By: Lesley A Pfleging
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Uttamjeet Singh doing business as UR Trucking
Represented By: Lesley A Pfleging
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Paul A Vang
Represented By: David L Farnbauch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: Kevin Fitzharris
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?