Hurd v. P.A.M. Transport, Inc.
Plaintiff: Terrance Hurd
Defendant: P.A.M. Transport, Inc.
Not Classified By Court: C Erik Chickedantz
Case Number: 1:2020cv00276
Filed: August 4, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Holly A Brady
Referring Judge: Susan L Collins
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 27, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 27, 2020 Set Deadlines/Hearings: Dispositive motions to be filed by 8/30/2021, (mlc)
August 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 SCHEDULING ORDER AND MEMORANDUM OF PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: Initial Disclosures to be exchanged by 10/30/2020. Discovery deadline is 7/30/2021. Plaintiff expert witness disclosures and reports to be delivered to the defendant by 1/15/2021. Defendant expert witness disclosures and reports to be delivered to the plaintiff by 2/15/2021. Dispositive Motion deadline 8/30/21. Any amendments to the pleadings to be filed by 12/14/2020. Signed by Magistrate Judge Susan L Collins on 8/27/20. (mlc) Modified on 8/27/2020 to edit text (mlc).
August 27, 2020 Filing 10 TELEPHONIC RULE 16 PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL CONFERENCE held on 8/27/2020 before Magistrate Judge Susan L Collins. Pla appeared by atty Christopher Myers. Dft appeared by atty Anthony Stites. The #9 Report of the Parties Planning Meeting is approved in all respects (except establishment of a trial date). Erik Chickedantz appointed as Mediator. Atty Stites to notify Mediator by letter, copy to atty Myers. Magistrate Consent forms due by 9/17/2020. (FTR 1st floor.) (mr)
August 21, 2020 Filing 9 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Myers, Christopher)
August 20, 2020 Filing 8 ANSWER to Complaint by P.A.M. Transport, Inc..(Stites, Anthony)
August 13, 2020 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Taliesin P Anglin on behalf of P.A.M. Transport, Inc. (Anglin, Taliesin)
August 6, 2020 Filing 6 MAGISTRATE JUDGE CONSENT FORMS sent to all parties. (mr)
August 6, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Hearing: Telephonic Rule 16 Preliminary Pretrial Conference set for 8/27/2020 at 10:30 AM in US District Court - Fort Wayne before Magistrate Judge Susan L Collins. Court to initiate call.(mr)
August 5, 2020 Judge Holly A Brady and Magistrate Judge Susan L Collins added. (NEW CASE) (rmc)
August 4, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Rachel K Steinhofer on behalf of P.A.M. Transport, Inc. (Steinhofer, Rachel)
August 4, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Anthony M Stites on behalf of P.A.M. Transport, Inc. (Stites, Anthony)
August 4, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL (Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0755-4301468.) from Allen Superior Court, Cause No. 02D02-2007-CT-000374, filed by P.A.M. Transport, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit State Court Complaint, #2 Civil Cover Sheet)(Stites, Anthony)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hurd v. P.A.M. Transport, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: P.A.M. Transport, Inc.
Represented By: Anthony M Stites
Represented By: Rachel K Steinhofer
Represented By: Taliesin P Anglin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Terrance Hurd
Represented By: Christopher C Myers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: C Erik Chickedantz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?