JetPro Pilots, LLC v. Jet Pro, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: JetPro Pilots, LLC
Defendant: Keith A Kenneally, Jet Pro, Inc. and Keith Kenneally
Case Number: 1:2020cv00278
Filed: August 5, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Holly A Brady
Referring Judge: Susan L Collins
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 28:2201
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 11, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 11, 2020 CASE DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE pursuant to Rule 41(a)(1)(A)(i) of the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure re 11 Notice of Dismissal. (cer)
September 11, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE of Voluntary Dismissal by JetPro Pilots, LLC (Ramsey, William)
August 11, 2020 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by JetPro Pilots, LLC. Keith Kenneally served on 8/7/2020, answer due 8/28/2020. (Ramsey, William)
August 11, 2020 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by JetPro Pilots, LLC. Jet Pro, Inc. served on 8/7/2020, answer due 8/28/2020. (Ramsey, William)
August 11, 2020 Set/Reset Deadlines: Keith A Kenneally and Jet Pro, Inc. answer due 8/28/2020 per DE #5 and #6 . (nae)
August 10, 2020 Filing 6 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Complaint for Declaratory Judgment served on Keith A. Kenneally on 08/07/2020, filed by JetPro Pilots, LLC. (Ramsey, William)
August 10, 2020 Filing 5 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Complaint for Declaratory Judgment served on Jet Pro, Inc. on 08/07/2020, filed by JetPro Pilots, LLC. (Ramsey, William)
August 6, 2020 **NEW CASE** Judge Holly A Brady and Magistrate Judge Susan L Collins added. (nae)
August 6, 2020 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Jet Pro, Inc., Keith Kenneally. NOTE:The attached document is accessible by court personnel only. Summons forms that were electronically submitted to the court for issuance will be returned to counsel via e-mail. (nae)
August 5, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by George Pappas on behalf of JetPro Pilots, LLC (Pappas, George)
August 5, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by William A Ramsey on behalf of JetPro Pilots, LLC (Ramsey, William)
August 5, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Declaratory Judgment against Jet Pro, Inc., Keith A Kenneally( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0755-4303324.), filed by JetPro Pilots, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons - Jet Pro, Inc., #3 Proposed Summons - Keith A. Kenneally)(Ramsey, William) (Additional attachment(s) added on 8/11/2020: #4 AO 120 form) (nae).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: JetPro Pilots, LLC v. Jet Pro, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Keith A Kenneally
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jet Pro, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Keith Kenneally
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JetPro Pilots, LLC
Represented By: George Pappas
Represented By: William A Ramsey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?