Frontier North Inc v. International Brotherhood of Electrical Workers
Plaintiff: Frontier North Inc
Defendant: Local 723 International Brotherhood of Electrical Workers
Case Number: 1:2020cv00281
Filed: August 7, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Holly A Brady
Referring Judge: Susan L Collins
Nature of Suit: Labor: Labor/Mgt. Relations
Cause of Action: 29:185
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 30, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 30, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE of Change of Address/Contact Information (Vlink, David)
September 30, 2020 Filing 8 NOTICE of Hearing: Telephonic Rule 16 Preliminary Pretrial Conference set for 10/21/2020 at 11:00 AM in US District Court - Fort Wayne before Magistrate Judge Susan L Collins. Court to initiate call.(mr)
September 16, 2020 Filing 7 IBEW Local 723's ANSWER to #1 Complaint, Affirmative Defenses, COUNTERCLAIM to Enforce Arbitration Award against Frontier North Inc by Local 723 International Brotherhood of Electrical Workers. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Union's Brief, #2 Exhibit B - Company's Brief, #3 Exhibit C - Arbitrator's Award)(Vlink, David) Modified on 9/17/2020 to correct counterclaim defendant (lhc).
September 16, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by David T Vlink on behalf of Local 723 International Brotherhood of Electrical Workers (Vlink, David)
August 10, 2020 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Local 723 International Brotherhood of Electrical Workers. NOTE:The attached document is accessible by court personnel only. Summons forms that were electronically submitted to the court for issuance will be returned to counsel via e-mail. (jld)
August 10, 2020 Judge Holly A Brady and Magistrate Judge Susan L Collins added. (NEW CASE) (jld)
August 7, 2020 Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Frontier North Inc identifying Corporate Parent Frontier Communications Corporation, Corporate Parent Frontier Communications ILEC Holdings Inc. for Frontier North Inc.. (Hurka, Thomas)
August 7, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Thomas F Hurka on behalf of Frontier North Inc (Hurka, Thomas)
August 7, 2020 Filing 2 SUPPLEMENT to #1 Complaint, filed by Frontier North Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit D to Complaint, #2 Exhibit E to Complaint)(Hurka, Thomas)
August 7, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND against Local 723 International Brotherhood of Electrical Workers( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0755-4305718.), filed by Frontier North Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Civil Cover Sheet, #5 Proposed Summons)(Hurka, Thomas)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Frontier North Inc v. International Brotherhood of Electrical Workers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Local 723 International Brotherhood of Electrical Workers
Represented By: David T Vlink
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Frontier North Inc
Represented By: Thomas F Hurka
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?