Bazile Bey v. Fort Wayne Police Department et al
Defendant: Allen County Jail, Allen Superior Court, Fort Wayne Police Department, Karen E Richards, John C Bohdan and Indiana State of
Petitioner: Aatazaz Bazile Bey
Case Number: 1:2020cv00292
Filed: August 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Holly A Brady
Referring Judge: Susan L Collins
2 Judge: William C Lee
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 9, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER: Plaintiff Aatazaz Bazile Bey must pay to the Clerk of the Court the required filing fee of $400.00 or, if Plaintiff cannot afford to pay the fee, file a motion to proceed in forma pauperis; Plaintiff Aatazaz Bazile Bey must pay the filing fee or file a motion to proceed in forma pauperis within sixty (60) days of the date of this Order; and The Clerk of the Court is instructed to send to Plaintiff the Court's standard form petition to proceed in forma pauperis, together with a copy of this Order. If Plaintiff fails to pay the full filing fee or file a motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis within 60 days the Complaint will be dismissed. Signed by Judge William C Lee on 10/9/2020. (Copy mailed to pro se party)(mrm)
October 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER: Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 455, the undersigned recuses herself from this case. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 137 and Local Rule 40-1(f)(2)(A), the Clerk of this Court is hereby directed to reassign this matter to Judge William C. Lee for all further proceedings. Signed by Judge Holly A Brady on 10/7/2020. (Copy mailed to pro se party) (lhc)
August 17, 2020 Filing 1 PRO SE COMPLAINT with Jury Demand against Allen County Jail, Allen Superior Court, John C Bohdan, Fort Wayne Police Department, Karen E Richards, State of Indiana, filed by Aatazaz Bazile Bey. (No filing fee, IFP Motion, or Summons received) (Attachments: #1 Envelope)(bas) Modified on 8/17/2020 (bas).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Bazile Bey v. Fort Wayne Police Department et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Aatazaz Bazile Bey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allen County Jail
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Allen Superior Court
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fort Wayne Police Department
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Karen E Richards
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John C Bohdan
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Indiana State of
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?