Mohler v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: KIMBERLY K. MOHLER and Kimberly K Mohler
Defendant: ANDREW M. SAUL and Commissioner of Social Security
Not Classified By Court: SSA (Court Use Only)
Case Number: 1:2020cv00297
Filed: August 20, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: William C Lee
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 25, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 25, 2020 Filing 7 SUMMONS Returned Executed by USMS obo Kimberly K Mohler. Commissioner of Social Security (AUSA) served on 9/10/2020, answer due 11/9/2020. (lhc)
September 17, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Kathleen T Trzyna - AUSA on behalf of Commissioner of Social Security (Trzyna - AUSA, Kathleen)
August 26, 2020 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Commissioner of Social Security, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. NOTE: The attached document is accessible by court personnel only. (cc: USMS) (mrm)
August 26, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER GRANTING #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis; WAIVING the filing fee; and pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915(d), the United States Marshals Service is directed to effect service of summons on the Defendant(s) at the addresses provided by Plaintiff on the USM-285 forms submitted with her motion and Complaint, together with a copy of the Complaint and a copy of this Order. Signed by Judge William C Lee on 8/26/2020.(cc: USMS) (mrm)
August 21, 2020 Judge William C Lee added. (NEW CASE, MOTION PENDING) (rmc)
August 20, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Ann M Trzynka on behalf of KIMBERLY K. MOHLER (Trzynka, Ann)
August 20, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff KIMBERLY K. MOHLER. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Summons, #2 USM 285)(Trzynka, Ann)
August 20, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against ANDREW M. SAUL, filed by KIMBERLY K. MOHLER. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons)(Trzynka, Ann)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mohler v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: KIMBERLY K. MOHLER
Represented By: Ann M Trzynka
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Kimberly K Mohler
Represented By: Ann M Trzynka
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ANDREW M. SAUL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Represented By: Kathleen T Trzyna - AUSA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: SSA (Court Use Only)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?