American Family Mutual Insurance Company, S.I. v. Whirlpool Corporation
Plaintiff: American Family Mutual Insurance Company, S.I.
Defendant: Whirlpool Corporation
Case Number: 1:2020cv00302
Filed: August 25, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Susan L Collins
Referring Judge: William C Lee
Nature of Suit: Prop. Damage Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 19, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 19, 2020 Filing 10 MAGISTRATE JUDGE CONSENT FORMS sent to all parties. (mr)
October 19, 2020 Filing 9 NOTICE of Hearing: Rule 16 Preliminary Pretrial Conference set for 11/10/2020 at 11:00 AM in US District Court - Fort Wayne before Magistrate Judge Susan L Collins. (mr)
October 2, 2020 Filing 8 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Whirlpool Corporation. (LeClere, Kyle)
October 2, 2020 Filing 7 ANSWER to #2 Complaint, by Whirlpool Corporation.(LeClere, Kyle)
October 2, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Kyle William LeClere on behalf of Whirlpool Corporation (LeClere, Kyle)
September 23, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER granting #4 Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Ronald W Harmeyer PHV for American Family Mutual Insurance Company, S.I.. Signed by Magistrate Judge Susan L Collins on 9/23/2020. (ace)
September 22, 2020 Filing 4 Application for Attorney Ronald W Harmeyer to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of American Family. Pro Hac Vice fee of $ 96 has been received, receipt number 0755-4349149(Pro Hac Vice Temporary login, )
August 27, 2020 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Whirlpool Corporation. NOTE:The attached document is accessible by court personnel only. Summons forms that were electronically submitted to the court for issuance will be returned to counsel via e-mail. (nae)
August 27, 2020 **NEW CASE** Judge William C Lee and Magistrate Judge Susan L Collins added. (nae)
August 26, 2020 Filing 2 COMPLAINT against Whirlpool Corporation (Filing fee $400 receipt number 0755-4321707), filed by American Family Mutual Insurance Company, S.I.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons)(Smith, Jeffrey) Modified on 8/26/2020 to add receipt number (lns).
August 25, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE of Appearance by Jeffrey P Smith on behalf of American Family Mutual Insurance Company, S.I. (Smith, Jeffrey)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: American Family Mutual Insurance Company, S.I. v. Whirlpool Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Whirlpool Corporation
Represented By: Kyle W LeClere
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: American Family Mutual Insurance Company, S.I.
Represented By: Jeffrey P Smith
Represented By: Ronald W Harmeyer PHV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?