Pena v Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: Mary Pena o/b/o E.I.P and Mary Pena
Defendant: ANDREW M. SAUL and Commissioner of Social Security
Not Classified By Court: SSA (Court Use Only)
Case Number: 1:2020cv00335
Filed: September 25, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Susan L Collins
Referring Judge: Damon R Leichty
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42:405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 30, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 30, 2020 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Mary Pena. Commissioner of Social Security served on 10/7/2020, answer due 12/7/2020. (Wold, Kirsten)
October 9, 2020 Filing 7 MAGISTRATE JUDGE CONSENT FORMS IN A SOCIAL SECURITY APPEAL CASE sent to all parties. Magistrate Consent forms due by 10/23/2020. (mr)
October 9, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Kathleen T Trzyna - AUSA on behalf of Commissioner of Social Security (Trzyna - AUSA, Kathleen)
October 6, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER: The court ORDERS its referral #4 REVISED to apply only to non-dispositive motions and not for a report and recommendation on the plaintiff's appeal from the final administrative decision of the Commissioner of Social Security. Signed by Judge Damon R Leichty on 10/6/2020. (lhc)
October 5, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER OF REFERRAL: Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b), Fed. R. Civ. P. 72(b), and General Order 2020-16, this case is referred to Magistrate Judge Susan Collins for all non-dispositive motions and for a report and recommendation on the plaintiff's appeal from the final administrative decision of the Commissioner of Social Security. Signed by Judge Damon R Leichty on 10/5/2020. (bas)
September 28, 2020 Magistrate Judge Susan L Collins added. (NEW CASE) (rmf)
September 28, 2020 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Commissioner of Social Security, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. NOTE: The attached document is accessible by court personnel only. (rmf)
September 28, 2020 Judge Damon R Leichty added. (NEW CASE) (rmf)
September 25, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Kirsten E Wold on behalf of Mary Pena o/b/o E.I.P (Wold, Kirsten)
September 25, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against ANDREW M. SAUL( Filing fee $ 400 receipt number 0755-4352870.), filed by Mary Pena o/b/o E.I.P. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons, #3 Proposed Summons, #4 Proposed Summons)(Wold, Kirsten)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pena v Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: ANDREW M. SAUL
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Represented By: Kathleen T Trzyna - AUSA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mary Pena o/b/o E.I.P
Represented By: Kirsten E Wold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Mary Pena
Represented By: Kirsten E Wold
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: SSA (Court Use Only)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?