Ridderheim v. Parkview Health System Inc.
Plaintiff: Elgerine Monique Ridderheim
Defendant: Parkview Health System Inc.
Not Classified By Court: Anthony Stites
Case Number: 1:2020cv00421
Filed: November 20, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Holly A Brady
Referring Judge: Susan L Collins
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 12, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 SCHEDULING ORDER AND MEMORANDUM OF PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL CONFERENCE:The Court sets the following deadlines pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b): The parties will exchange the information required by Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(a)(1) by 2/5/2021.The last date for the completion of all fact and expert discovery is 8/6/2021. The serving of reports from retained experts under Rule 26(a)(2) are due from plaintiff by 6/7/2021; and from defendant(s) by 7/9/2021.The last date to seek leave of Court to amend the pleadings as to Plaintiff is 3/8/2021; as to Defendant is 3/29/2021.The deadline to file any dispositive motions is 9/10/2021, with any response due 28 days thereafter and any reply due 14 days after the filing of a response, consistent with Local Rule 56-1(b) and (c). The parties have agreed upon Anthony Stites as mediator. Signed by Magistrate Judge Susan L Collins on 1/12/2021. (bas)
January 12, 2021 Filing 13 TELEPHONIC RULE 16 PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL CONFERENCE held on 1/12/2021 before Magistrate Judge Susan L Collins. Pla appeared by atty Christopher Myers. Dft appeared by atty Martha Lemert. The #11 Report of the Parties Planning Meeting is approved in all respects (except establishment of a trial date). Anthony Stites appointed as Mediator. Atty Myers to notify Mediator by letter, copy to atty Lemert. Magistrate Consent forms due by 2/2/2021. (FTR 1st floor.) (mr)
December 29, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER for Magistrate Judge Susan Collins: #8 Defendant's Motion for Extension to Answer Plaintiff's Complaint is granted. #9 Defendant's Answer to Plaintiff's Complaint is deemed timely filed. Text entry order.(mr)
December 22, 2020 Filing 11 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Lemert, Martha)
December 22, 2020 Filing 10 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Parkview Health System Inc.. (Lemert, Martha)
December 22, 2020 Filing 9 DEFENDANT'S ANSWER to Complaint by Parkview Health System Inc..(Lemert, Martha)
December 18, 2020 Filing 8 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Defendant Parkview Health System Inc.. (Lemert, Martha)
November 24, 2020 Filing 7 MAGISTRATE JUDGE CONSENT FORMS sent to all parties. (mr)
November 24, 2020 Filing 6 NOTICE of Hearing: Telephonic Rule 16 Preliminary Pretrial Conference set for 1/12/2021 at 10:30 AM in US District Court - Fort Wayne before Magistrate Judge Susan L Collins. Court to initiate call.(mr)
November 23, 2020 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Shane C Mulholland on behalf of Parkview Health System Inc. (Mulholland, Shane)
November 23, 2020 Judge Holly A Brady and Magistrate Judge Susan L Collins added. NEW CASE. (nal)
November 20, 2020 Filing 3 AGREED NOTICE to extend time to file answer filed by Parkview Health System Inc. ; answer due by 12/18/20. (Lemert, Martha)
November 20, 2020 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Martha M Lemert on behalf of Parkview Health System Inc. (Lemert, Martha)
November 20, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL from Allen Superior Court (Filing fee $400, receipt number 0755-4405841) filed by Parkview Health System Inc. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit Complaint and Exhibits). (Lemert, Martha)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ridderheim v. Parkview Health System Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elgerine Monique Ridderheim
Represented By: Christopher C Myers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Parkview Health System Inc.
Represented By: Martha M Lemert
Represented By: Shane C Mulholland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: Anthony Stites
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?