Brotherhood Mutual Insurance Company v. Church Mutual Insurance Company, S.I.
Plaintiff: Brotherhood Mutual Insurance Company
Defendant: Church Mutual Insurance Company, S.I.
Case Number: 1:2021cv00007
Filed: January 7, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Holly A Brady
Referring Judge: Susan L Collins
Nature of Suit: Other Statutes: Arbitration
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 2, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 22 MOTION for Leave to File Sur-Reply Brief in Opposition by Defendant Church Mutual Insurance Company, S.I.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A)(Wilkins, Eric)
February 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 21 REPLY to Response to Motion re #9 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Brotherhood Mutual Insurance Company. (Ruesch, Meghan)
February 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 20 RESPONSE to Motion re #9 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Church Mutual Insurance Company, S.I.. (Wilkins, Eric)
February 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 19 SCHEDULING ORDER AND MEMORANDUM OF PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: The Court sets the following deadlines pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b): Initial Disclosures to be exchanged by 2/19/2021. All Fact and Expert Discovery deadline is 8/4/2021. Supplementation under Rule 26(e) due every six weeks until trial. The last date to seek leave of Court to amend the pleadings as to Plaintiff is March 8, 2021; as to Defendant is 4/6/2021. Dispositive motions to be filed by 7/19/2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Susan L Collins on 2/10/2021. (lhc)
February 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 18 TELEPHONIC RULE 16 PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL CONFERENCE held on 2/10/2021 before Magistrate Judge Susan L Collins. Pla appeared by atty John Trimble. Dft appeared by attys Kendall Harrison and Eric Wilkins. The #16 Report of the Parties Planning Meeting is approved in all respects (except trial dates) and is hereby made an ORDER of the Court. Discovery deadline is 8/4/2021. Dispositive motions to be filed by 7/19/2021. Magistrate Consent forms due by 3/3/2021. (FTR 1st Floor) (lhc)
February 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 17 NOTICE of Appearance by Kendall W Harrison on behalf of Church Mutual Insurance Company, S.I. (Harrison, Kendall)
February 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Ruesch, Meghan)
February 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by Kendall W Harrison on behalf of Church Mutual Insurance Company, S.I. (Harrison, Kendall) ***FILING ERROR; ATTORNEY REFILED AT #17 *** Modified on 2/10/2021 (ace).
February 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by David R Konkel on behalf of Church Mutual Insurance Company, S.I. (Konkel, David)
February 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ANSWER to Complaint by Church Mutual Insurance Company, S.I..(Wilkins, Eric)
February 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Todd G Smith on behalf of Church Mutual Insurance Company, S.I. (Smith, Todd)
February 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 NOTICE of Appearance by Kendall W Harrison on behalf of Church Mutual Insurance Company, S.I. (Harrison, Kendall) ***FILING ERROR; REFILED AT #15 *** Modified on 2/5/2021 (ace).
January 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 BRIEF in Support of #9 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Brotherhood Mutual Insurance Company. (Ruesch, Meghan)
January 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 MOTION to Remand to State Court by Plaintiff Brotherhood Mutual Insurance Company. (Ruesch, Meghan)
January 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Set/Reset Deadlines: Per DE #7 Church Mutual Insurance Company answer due 2/4/2021 (nae)
January 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Brotherhood Mutual Insurance Company. (Trimble, John)
January 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 AGREED NOTICE to extend time to file answer filed by Church Mutual Insurance Company, S.I. ; answer due by 2/4/21. (Wilkins, Eric)
January 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 MAGISTRATE JUDGE CONSENT FORMS sent to all parties. (mr)
January 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 NOTICE of Hearing: Telephonic Rule 16 Preliminary Pretrial Conference set for 2/10/2021 at 10:00 AM in US District Court - Fort Wayne before Magistrate Judge Susan L Collins. Court to initiate call. (mr)
January 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Church Mutual Insurance Company, S.I. identifying Corporate Parent Church Mutual Holding Company, Inc. for Church Mutual Insurance Company, S.I... (Wilkins, Eric)
January 8, 2021 Opinion or Order **NEW CASE** Judge Holly A Brady and Magistrate Judge Susan L Collins added. (nae)
January 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Eric M Wilkins on behalf of Church Mutual Insurance Company, S.I. (Wilkins, Eric)
January 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0755-4445166.) from Allen Superior, Cause No. 02D02-2012-CT-000597, filed by Church Mutual Insurance Company, S.I.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D)(Wilkins, Eric)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Brotherhood Mutual Insurance Company v. Church Mutual Insurance Company, S.I.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Church Mutual Insurance Company, S.I.
Represented By: Eric M Wilkins
Represented By: Kendall W Harrison
Represented By: Todd G Smith
Represented By: David R Konkel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brotherhood Mutual Insurance Company
Represented By: John C Trimble
Represented By: Meghan E Ruesch
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?