Rose v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: Tonia J. Rose
Defendant: Andrew M. Saul and Commissioner of Social Security
Not Classified By Court: SSA (Court Use Only)
Case Number: 1:2021cv00087
Filed: March 2, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Susan L Collins
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 5, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 5, 2021 Filing 9 NOTICE OF REASSIGNMENT OF CASE TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE: The parties having consented pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c), this case is referred to Magistrate Judge Susan L Collins for all purposes and is reassigned pursuant to General Order 2020-27. (bas)
April 5, 2021 Filing 8 SUMMONS Returned Executed by USMS obo Tonia J. Rose. Commissioner of Social Security served on 3/23/2021, Attorney General on 3/22/2021 and United States Attorneys Office on 3/23/2021, answer due 5/24/2021. (mrm) Modified on 4/5/2021 to update (mrm).
March 25, 2021 Filing 7 MAGISTRATE JUDGE CONSENT FORMS IN A SOCIAL SECURITY APPEAL CASE sent to all parties. Magistrate Consent forms due by 4/8/2021. (mr)
March 25, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Kathleen T Trzyna - AUSA on behalf of Commissioner of Social Security (Trzyna - AUSA, Kathleen)
March 5, 2021 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Commissioner of Social Security, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. NOTE: The attached document is accessible by court personnel only. (cc: USMS) (mlc)
March 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER GRANTING #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis. The filing fee is WAIVED. The US Marshals Service to effect service of process on the defendant. (cc: USMS) Signed by Judge Damon R Leichty on 3/4/21. (mlc)
March 3, 2021 Judge Damon R Leichty and Magistrate Judge Susan L Collins added. *NEW CASE; MOTION PENDING* (lhc) Modified on 3/3/2021 to edit text (lhc).
March 2, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Ann M Trzynka on behalf of Tonia J. Rose (Trzynka, Ann)
March 2, 2021 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Tonia J. Rose. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Summons, #2 USM 285)(Trzynka, Ann)
March 2, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Andrew M. Saul, filed by Tonia J. Rose. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons)(Trzynka, Ann)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Rose v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew M. Saul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Represented By: Kathleen T Trzyna - AUSA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tonia J. Rose
Represented By: Ann M Trzynka
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: SSA (Court Use Only)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?