Ledger v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: Josiah T Ledger
Defendant: Andrew M Saul and Commissioner of Social Security
Not Classified By Court: SSA (Court Use Only)
Case Number: 1:2021cv00226
Filed: June 7, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Susan L Collins
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 22, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 22, 2021 Filing 10 SUMMONS Returned Executed by USMS obo Josiah T Ledger. Commissioner of Social Security, U.S. Attorney General and U.S. Attorney served on 6/29/2021, answer due 8/30/2021. (mrm)
July 1, 2021 Filing 9 NOTICE OF REASSIGNMENT OF CASE TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE: The parties having consented pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c), this case is referred to Magistrate Judge Susan L Collins for all purposes and is reassigned pursuant to General Order 2020-27. (bas)
June 30, 2021 Filing 8 MAGISTRATE JUDGE CONSENT FORMS IN A SOCIAL SECURITY APPEAL CASE sent to all parties. Magistrate Consent forms due by 7/14/2021. (mr)
June 30, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Kathleen T Trzyna - AUSA on behalf of Commissioner of Social Security (Trzyna - AUSA, Kathleen)
June 9, 2021 Filing 6 Summons Issued as to Commissioner of Social Security, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. NOTE: The attached document is accessible by court personnel only. (cc: USMS)(mrm)
June 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER GRANTING #2 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis and WAIVING the filing fee. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915(d), the United States Marshals Service is directed to effect service of process on the defendant.. Signed by Judge Philip P Simon on 6/9/2021. (cc: USMS)(mrm)
June 8, 2021 **NEW CASE, MOTION PENDING** Judge Philip P Simon and Magistrate Judge Susan L Collins added. (shk)
June 7, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Audrey M Van Gilder on behalf of Josiah T Ledger (Van Gilder, Audrey)
June 7, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Lindsay Davenport Solon on behalf of Josiah T Ledger (Solon, Lindsay)
June 7, 2021 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff Josiah T Ledger. (Attachments: #1 Service by USM Office Regional Chief, #2 Service by USM USAG, #3 Service by USM USAO)(Van Gilder, Audrey)
June 7, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Andrew M Saul, filed by Josiah T Ledger. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons Office Regional Chief, #3 Proposed Summons US AG, #4 Proposed Summons USAO)(Van Gilder, Audrey)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Ledger v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Josiah T Ledger
Represented By: Lindsay Davenport Solon
Represented By: Audrey M Van Gilder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Andrew M Saul
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Represented By: Kathleen T Trzyna - AUSA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: SSA (Court Use Only)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?