Davis v. City of Fort Wayne
Defendant: KAREN DAVIS and CITY OF FORT WAYNE
Not Classified By Court: C Erik Chickedantz
Case Number: 1:2021cv00233
Filed: June 17, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Holly A Brady
Referring Judge: Susan L Collins
Nature of Suit: Labor: Family and Medical Leave Act
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1441 fml
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 4, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 4, 2021 Filing 13 ANSWER to Complaint by City of Fort Wayne.(Torres, Megan)
August 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 SCHEDULING ORDER AND MEMORANDUM OF PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL CONFERENCE:The Court sets the following deadlines pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b): The parties will exchange the information required by Fed. R. Civ. P. 26(a)(1) by 8/20/2021.The last date for the completion of all fact and expert discovery is 3/25/2022. The serving of reports from retained experts under Rule 26(a)(2) are due from Plaintiff by 12/31/2021; and from Defendant by 1/28/2022. Supplementation under Rule 26(e) due every six weeks until trial. The last date to seek leave of Court to amend the pleadings as to Plaintiff is 2/11/2022; as to Defendant is 2/25/2022. The deadline to file any dispositive motions is 4/25/2022 with any response due 28 days thereafter and any reply due 14 days after the filing of a response, consistent with Local Rule 56-1(b) and (c). The parties have agreed upon Erik Chickedantz as mediator. Signed by Magistrate Judge Susan L Collins on 8/2/2021. (bas)
August 2, 2021 Filing 11 TELEPHONIC RULE 16 PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL CONFERENCE held on 8/2/2021 before Magistrate Judge Susan L Collins. Pla appeared by atty Nathaniel Hubley. Dft appeared by attys Megan Torres and Gary Johnson. The #9 Report of the Parties Planning Meeting is approved in all respects (except establishment of a trial date). Erik Chickedantz appointed as Mediator. Atty Torres to notify Mediator by letter, copy to atty Hubley. Magistrate Consent forms due by 8/23/2021. (FTR 1st floor.) (mr)
July 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER for Magistrate Judge Susan Collins: Due to a scheduling conflict, the Court on its own motion, VACATES the telephonic Rule 16 Preliminary Pretrial Conference set for 7/21/2021 at 11:00 am and RESETS it for 8/2/2021 at 11:00 am. Court to initiate call. Text entry order.(mr)
July 15, 2021 Filing 9 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Hubley, Nathaniel)
July 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER for Magistrate Judge Susan Collins: Due to a conflict on the Court's calendar, the telephonic Rule 16 Preliminary Pretrial Conference set for 7/20/2021 at 10:30 am is VACATED and RESET for 7/21/2021 at 11:00 am. Court to initiate call. Text entry order.(mr)
July 2, 2021 Reset Answer Deadlines to 8/4/2021. (shk)
July 1, 2021 Filing 7 AGREED NOTICE to extend time to file answer filed by City of Fort Wayne ; answer due by August 4, 2021. (Torres, Megan)
June 23, 2021 Filing 6 MAGISTRATE JUDGE CONSENT FORMS sent to all parties. (mr)
June 23, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE of Hearing: Telephonic Rule 16 Preliminary Pretrial Conference set for 7/20/2021 at 10:30 AM in US District Court - Fort Wayne before Magistrate Judge Susan L Collins. Court to initiate call. (mr)
June 21, 2021 Judge Holly A Brady and Magistrate Judge Susan L Collins added. (NEW CASE) (rmc)
June 17, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Megan M Torres on behalf of CITY OF FORT WAYNE (Torres, Megan)
June 17, 2021 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Gary D Johnson on behalf of CITY OF FORT WAYNE (Johnson, Gary)
June 17, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0755-4604786.) from Allen Superior Court, Cause No. 02D09-2106-PL-000236, filed by CITY OF FORT WAYNE. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit E, #6 Civil Cover Sheet)(Johnson, Gary)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Davis v. City of Fort Wayne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: KAREN DAVIS
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CITY OF FORT WAYNE
Represented By: Gary D Johnson
Represented By: Megan M Torres
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: C Erik Chickedantz
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?