Klaassen et al v. The Trustees of Indiana University
Plaintiff: MACEY POLICKA, ASHLEE MORRIS, JAIME CARINI, RYAN KLAASSEN, D. J. B., SETH CROWDER, MARGARET ROTH and NATALIE SPERAZZA
Defendant: The Trustees of Indiana University
Case Number: 1:2021cv00238
Filed: June 21, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Susan L Collins
Referring Judge: Damon R Leichty
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 17, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 43 ORDER for Magistrate Judge Susan Collins: The #42 IU's Unopposed Motion For Second Extension Of Time To Respond To Complaint is granted. The Trustees of Indiana University answer due 9/27/2021. Text entry order.(lhc)
August 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 42 Second MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint,,,,, Unopposed by Defendant The Trustees of Indiana University. (Gutwein, Stephanie)
July 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 41 TRANSCRIPT of PRELIMINARY INJUNCTION HEARING held on JULY 13, 2021, before Judge Damon R Leichty. Court Reporter Debra Bonk, Telephone 574-246-8039, E-mail debra_bonk@innd.uscourts.gov. Transcript may be viewed at the court public terminal or purchased through the Court Reporter/Transcriber before the deadline for Release of Transcript Restriction. After that date it may be obtained through PACER. IMPORTANT: Notice is hereby given that an official transcript of a proceeding has been filed by the court reporter in the above matter. The parties have 7 calendar days to file with the Court a Notice of Intent to Request Redaction of this transcript. Within 21 days of the filing of the transcript, a Redaction Request - Transcript shall be e-filed with the Court. Access to this request will be restricted to the Court and attorneys of record in the case. If no such Notice and Redaction Request are filed, the transcript may be made remotely, electronically available to the public without redaction. Any party needing a copy of the transcript to review for redaction purposes may purchase a copy from the Court Reporter. Counsel are strongly urged to share this notice with all clients so that an informed decision about the inclusion of certain materials may be made. The responsibility for redacting these personal identifiers rests solely with counsel and the parties. The Clerk and Court Reporter will not review each transcript for compliance with this rule. Notice of Intent to Redact due 8/2/2021. Redaction Request due 8/12/2021. Redacted Transcript Deadline set for 8/23/2021. Release of Transcript Restriction set for 10/20/2021. (db)
July 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER denying #37 motion for an injunction pending appeal. Signed by Judge Damon R Leichty on 7/21/2021. (dk)
July 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 39 USCA Case Number 21-2326 for #35 Notice of Appeal, filed by Seth Crowder, D. J. B., Macey Policka, Ashlee Morris, Ryan Klaassen, Jaime Carini, Natalie Sperazza, Margaret Roth. (bas)
July 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 38 Short Record Sent to US Court of Appeals re #35 Notice of Appeal. Appeal filing fees paid in the amount of $505 - Receipt # 0755-4633319. (bas)
July 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 37 MOTION for Injunction Pending Appeal by Plaintiffs D. J. B., Jaime Carini, Seth Crowder, Ryan Klaassen, Ashlee Morris, Macey Policka, Margaret Roth, Natalie Sperazza. (Milbank, Courtney)
July 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 36 Docketing Statement re: #35 Notice of Appeal, filed by Seth Crowder, D. J. B., Macey Policka, Ashlee Morris, Ryan Klaassen, Jaime Carini, Natalie Sperazza, Margaret Roth. (Milbank, Courtney)
July 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 35 NOTICE OF APPEAL as to #34 Opinion and Order, Terminate Motions, filed by Plaintiffs D. J. B., Jaime Carini, Seth Crowder, Ryan Klaassen, Ashlee Morris, Macey Policka, Margaret Roth, Natalie Sperazza. Filing fee $ 505, receipt number 0755-4633319. (Milbank, Courtney)
July 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 34 OPINION AND ORDER: The court DENIES the #7 preliminary injunction motion. Signed by Judge Damon R Leichty on 7/18/2021. (dk)
July 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 33 MOTION HEARING held on 7/13/2021 before Judge Damon R Leichty. Pla appeared by attys Bopp, Siebert. Dft appeared by attys Ricchiuto, Gutwein re #7 First MOTION for Preliminary Injunction. Arguments heard. For reasons stated, the court takes the matter under advisement. Written order to follow. (Court Reporter D. Bonk.) (dk)
July 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 32 IU's Exhibit List for Preliminary Injunction Hearing by The Trustees of Indiana University.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 300 Fall 2021 Restart Report, #2 Exhibit 301 Decl. of Dr. Aaron Carroll, #3 Exhibit 302 Dec. 8, 2020 COVID-19 Vaccine Plan PowerPoint, #4 Exhibit 303 Jan 26, 2021 COVID-19 Vaccine Plan PowerPoint, #5 Exhibit 304 Feb. 2, 2021 COVID-19 Vaccine Plan PowerPoint, #6 Exhibit 305 Mar. 9, 2021 COVID-19 Vaccine Plan PowerPoint, #7 Exhibit 306 Apr. 20, 2021 COVID-19 Vaccine Plan PowerPoint, #8 Exhibit 307 May 24, 2021 COVID-19 Vaccine Plan PowerPoint, #9 Exhibit 308 June 21, 2021 COVID-19 Vaccine Plan PowerPoint, #10 Exhibit 309 Feb. 23, 2021 Surveillance and Mitigation PowerPoint, #11 Exhibit 310 Mar. 16, 2021 Surveillance and Mitigation PowerPoint, #12 Exhibit 311 Apr. 21, 2021 Surveillance and Mitigation PowerPoint, #13 Exhibit 312 Feb. 2, 2021 Medical Response Team PowerPoint, #14 Exhibit 313 Mar. 9, 2021 Medical Response Team PowerPoint, #15 Exhibit 314 Apr. 27, 2021 Medical Response Team PowerPoint, #16 Exhibit 315 Mar. 10, 2021 Contact Tracing PowerPoint, #17 Exhibit 316 Mar. 16, 2021 Contact Tracing PowerPoint, #18 Exhibit 317 Apr. 6, 2021 Contact Tracing PowerPoint, #19 Exhibit 318 Feb. 2021 Emails between Policka and Reilly, #20 Exhibit 319 Rebuttal Decl. of Dr. Cole Beeler, #21 Exhibit 320 Demonstrative Exhibit Citations to IU Witness Testimony, #22 Exhibit 321 Demonstrative Exhibit Citations to Plaintiffs Deposition Testimony)(Gutwein, Stephanie)
July 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 31 Parties' Joint Exhibit List for Preliminary Injunction Hearing by The Trustees of Indiana University.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 100 - Complaint, #2 Exhibit 101 - New COVID-19 Vaccine Requirement, #3 Exhibit 102 - Fall 2021 Restart Guidance, #4 Exhibit 103 - Exemption Criteria, #5 Exhibit 104 - IU Restart Committee Recommendations for Fall 2021, #6 Exhibit 105 - COVID-19 Cases Continue to Decline, #7 Exhibit 106 - Students Comprise a Very Low Risk Population, #8 Exhibit 107 - Klaassen Verification, #9 Exhibit 108 - Carini Verification, #10 Exhibit 109 - Baumgartner Verification, #11 Exhibit 110 - Morris Verification, #12 Exhibit 111 - Crowder Verification, #13 Exhibit 112 - Policka Verification, #14 Exhibit 113 - Roth Verification, #15 Exhibit 114 - Sperazza Verification, #16 Exhibit 115 Decl. of Dr. Cole Beeler, #17 Exhibit 116 Decl. of Dr. Aaron Carroll, #18 Exhibit 117 Decl. of Dr. Peter McCullough, #19 Exhibit 118 IU COVID FAQ, #20 Exhibit 119 Baumgartner Verification, #21 Exhibit 120 Klaassen Dep., #22 Exhibit 121 Carini Dep., #23 Exhibit 122 DJB Dep., #24 Exhibit 123 Morris Dep., #25 Exhibit 124 Crowder Dep., #26 Exhibit 125 Policka Dep., #27 Exhibit 126 Roth Dep., #28 Exhibit 127 Sperazza Dep., #29 Exhibit 128 Dr. Cole Beeler Dep., #30 Exhibit 129 IU 30(b)(6) Dep.)(Gutwein, Stephanie)
July 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 30 Plaintiffs' Amended Exhibit List for Preliminary Injunction Hearing by D. J. B., Jaime Carini, Seth Crowder, Ryan Klaassen, Ashlee Morris, Macey Policka, Margaret Roth, Natalie Sperazza.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit)(Bopp, James)
July 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 29 Plaintiffs' Exhibit List for Preliminary Injunction Hearing by D. J. B., Jaime Carini, Seth Crowder, Ryan Klaassen, Ashlee Morris, Macey Policka, Margaret Roth, Natalie Sperazza.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit, #9 Exhibit, #10 Exhibit, #11 Exhibit, #12 Exhibit, #13 Exhibit, #14 Exhibit, #15 Exhibit, #16 Exhibit, #17 Exhibit, #18 Exhibit, #19 Exhibit, #20 Exhibit, #21 Exhibit, #22 Exhibit, #23 Exhibit, #24 Exhibit, #25 Exhibit, #26 Exhibit, #27 Exhibit, #28 Exhibit, #29 Exhibit, #30 Exhibit, #31 Exhibit, #32 Exhibit, #33 Exhibit, #34 Exhibit, #35 Exhibit, #36 Exhibit, #37 Exhibit, #38 Exhibit, #39 Exhibit, #40 Exhibit, #41 Exhibit, #42 Exhibit, #43 Exhibit, #44 Exhibit, #45 Exhibit, #46 Exhibit, #47 Exhibit, #48 Exhibit, #49 Exhibit, #50 Exhibit, #51 Exhibit, #52 Exhibit, #53 Exhibit, #54 Exhibit, #55 Exhibit, #56 Exhibit, #57 Exhibit, #58 Exhibit)(Bopp, James)
July 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 28 Consent MOTION to Substitute Party Daniel J. Baumgartner by Plaintiff D. J. B.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Verification)(Bopp, James) Modified on 7/14/2021 (dk).
July 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 27 Joint Submission on Necessity of Evidentiary Hearing on Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Injunction by Defendant The Trustees of Indiana University. (Ricchiuto, Anne) Modified on 7/9/2021 to term as a motion (bas).
July 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 26 NOTICE of Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint (Unopposed) by Defendant The Trustees of Indiana University. (Gutwein, Stephanie) Modified on 7/8/2021 to term as it is not a motion (lhc).
July 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Set/Reset Deadlines: Trustees of Indiana University; answer due 8/11/2021. (lhc)
July 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 24 TELEPHONE CONFERENCE to resolve discovery disputes held on 7/7/2021 before Judge Damon R Leichty. Pla appeared by atty M. Siebert, and J. Bopp, Jr. Dft appeared by atty A. Ricchiuto. The Court established deadlines at the hearing. (Court Reporter J. Hoffman.) (nae)
July 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER DIRECTING the Clerk to return all letters received to Mr. Christenson and to refrain from docketing them. They will not be considered by the court. No amicus brief will be accepted without prior approval from the court as outlined in Order. Signed by Judge Damon R Leichty on 7/7/2021. (Copy mailed to Mr. Christenson with return of all letters as directed in Order)(mrm)
July 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 22 REPLY to Response to Motion re #7 First MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by D. J. B., Jaime Carini, Seth Crowder, Ryan Klaassen, Ashlee Morris, Macey Policka, Margaret Roth, Natalie Sperazza. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibits Index, #2 Exhibit IU COVID FAQ, #3 Exhibit Roth Dep, #4 Exhibit Carini Dep, #5 Exhibit Policka Dep, #6 Exhibit Sperazza Dep, #7 Exhibit Klaassen Dep)(Bopp, James)
July 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 21 RESPONSE to Motion re #7 First MOTION for Preliminary Injunction filed by The Trustees of Indiana University. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A Beeler Decl., #2 Exhibit B Carroll Decl., #3 Exhibit C Roth Dep., #4 Exhibit D Sperazza Dep., #5 Exhibit E McCullough Decl., #6 Exhibit F Klaassen Dep., #7 Exhibit G Carini Dep, #8 Exhibit H DJP Dep., #9 Exhibit I Morris Dep., #10 Exhibit J Crowder Dep., #11 Exhibit K Policka Dep.)(Ricchiuto, Anne)
June 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 25 MOTION HEARING held on 6/25/2021 before Judge Damon R Leichty. Pla appeared by attys Bopp, Siebert. Dft appeared by attys Gutwein, Ricchiuto. The court held a hearing to schedule the preliminary injunction motion for hearing and established future deadlines and hearings as outlined in the #20 order. (Court Reporter D. Bonk.) (dk)
June 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER: The court GRANTED plaintiffs' motion for leave to file excess pages (ECF #8 ), while also giving the defendant the same courtesy of an additional ten pages for its response and the plaintiffs an additional five pages for their reply; GRANTED plaintiffs' motion to expedite in accordance with the discussion held on the record (ECF #9 ); and DENIED the request for the third party subpoena (ECF #9 ). The motion to consolidate was WITHDRAWN (ECF #10 ). On July 13, 2021 at 1:30 p.m., the court will hold oral argument on the #7 preliminary injunction motion in the South Bend courtroom. Signed by Judge Damon R Leichty on 6/25/21. (dk)
June 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 19 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons in a Civil Action served on The Trustees of Indiana University on 06/23/2021, filed by D. J. B., Jaime Carini, Seth Crowder, Ryan Klaassen, Ashlee Morris, Macey Policka, Margaret Roth, Natalie Sperazza. (Milbank, Courtney)
June 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 18 NOTICE of Hearing on Motion #10 First MOTION Consolidate Hearing on Preliminary Injunction and Merits of Case: Zoom Motion Hearing set for 6/25/2021 01:00 PM (EDT) in US District Court - South Bend before Judge Damon R Leichty. Connection link to be forwarded by email. (dk)
June 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 17 REPLY to Response to Motion re #9 First MOTION to Expedite filed by D. J. B., Jaime Carini, Seth Crowder, Ryan Klaassen, Ashlee Morris, Macey Policka, Margaret Roth, Natalie Sperazza. (Milbank, Courtney)
June 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER: Pursuant to Local Rule 40-1(f)(2)(A), this action is reassigned to Judge Damon R. Leichty for all further proceedings. Signed by Chief Judge Jon E DeGuilio 6/22/2021. (mrm)
June 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 RESPONSE to Motion re #9 First MOTION to Expedite filed by Trustees of Indiana University. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1-Bopp Press Release)(Ricchiuto, Anne)
June 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Stephanie L Gutwein on behalf of Trustees of Indiana University (Gutwein, Stephanie)
June 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Anne K Ricchiuto on behalf of Trustees of Indiana University (Ricchiuto, Anne)
June 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER: Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 455, the undersigned recuses herself from this case. Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 137 and Local Rule 40-1(f)(2)(A), Chief Judge Jon E. DeGuilio will re-assign this matter to another Article III Judge for all further proceedings. Signed by Judge Holly A Brady on 6/22/2021. (shk) (cc: Chief Judge DeGuilio)
June 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 Summons Issued as to The Trustees of Indiana University. NOTE:The attached document is accessible by court personnel only. Summons forms that were electronically submitted to the court for issuance will be returned to counsel via e-mail. (mlc)
June 22, 2021 Opinion or Order **NEW CASE; MOTIONS PENDING** Judge Holly A Brady and Magistrate Judge Susan L Collins added. (mlc)
June 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 First MOTION Consolidate Hearing on Preliminary Injunction and Merits of Case re #8 First MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages , #7 First MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Plaintiffs D. J. B., JAIME CARINI, SETH CROWDER, RYAN KLAASSEN, ASHLEE MORRIS, MACEY POLICKA, MARGARET ROTH, NATALIE SPERAZZA. (Bopp, James)
June 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 First MOTION to Expedite by Plaintiffs D. J. B., JAIME CARINI, SETH CROWDER, RYAN KLAASSEN, ASHLEE MORRIS, MACEY POLICKA, MARGARET ROTH, NATALIE SPERAZZA. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit IU Public Records Request, #2 Exhibit IU Public Records Request 2, #3 Exhibit State Dept of Health Records Request)(Bopp, James)
June 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 First MOTION for Leave to File Excess Pages by Plaintiffs D. J. B., JAIME CARINI, SETH CROWDER, RYAN KLAASSEN, ASHLEE MORRIS, MACEY POLICKA, MARGARET ROTH, NATALIE SPERAZZA. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Memorandum in Support of Preliminary Injunction)(Bopp, James)
June 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 First MOTION for Preliminary Injunction by Plaintiffs D. J. B., JAIME CARINI, SETH CROWDER, RYAN KLAASSEN, ASHLEE MORRIS, MACEY POLICKA, MARGARET ROTH, NATALIE SPERAZZA. (Bopp, James)
June 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Courtney Turner Milbank on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Milbank, Courtney)
June 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Corporate Disclosure Statement by D. J. B., JAIME CARINI, SETH CROWDER, RYAN KLAASSEN, ASHLEE MORRIS, MACEY POLICKA, MARGARET ROTH, NATALIE SPERAZZA. (Bopp, James)
June 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Melena S Siebert on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Siebert, Melena)
June 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by Richard E Coleson on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Coleson, Richard)
June 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by James Bopp, Jr on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Bopp, James)
June 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Declaratory and Injunctive Relief against The Trustees of Indiana University( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0755-4606158.), filed by MACEY POLICKA, D. J. B., MARGARET ROTH, NATALIE SPERAZZA, JAIME CARINI, RYAN KLAASSEN, ASHLEE MORRIS, SETH CROWDER. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Index, #2 Exhibit 1 New COVID-19 vaccine requirement, #3 Exhibit 2 Fall 2021 Restart Guidance, #4 Exhibit 3 Exemption Criteria, #5 Exhibit 4 Indiana University Restart Committee Recommendations For Fall 2021, #6 Exhibit 5 State of Indiana Office of the Attorney General, Official Opinion 2021-1 on University Policies on COVID-19 Vaccination, #7 Exhibit 6 Table B. COVID-19 Cases Continue to Decline after Indy 500, #8 Exhibit 7 Table C. College/Graduate Students Comprise A Very Low Risk Population For Serious Covid-19 Illness, #9 Affidavit Verification of Klaassen, #10 Affidavit Verification of Carini, #11 Affidavit Verification of Baumgartner, #12 Affidavit Verification of Morris, #13 Affidavit Verification of Crowder, #14 Affidavit Verification of Policka, #15 Affidavit Verification of Roth, #16 Affidavit Verification of Sperazza, #17 Civil Cover Sheet, #18 Proposed Summons)(Bopp, James)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Klaassen et al v. The Trustees of Indiana University
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MACEY POLICKA
Represented By: Richard E Coleson
Represented By: Courtney Turner Milbank
Represented By: James Bopp, Jr
Represented By: Melena S Siebert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: ASHLEE MORRIS
Represented By: Richard E Coleson
Represented By: Courtney Turner Milbank
Represented By: James Bopp, Jr
Represented By: Melena S Siebert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: JAIME CARINI
Represented By: Richard E Coleson
Represented By: Courtney Turner Milbank
Represented By: James Bopp, Jr
Represented By: Melena S Siebert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: RYAN KLAASSEN
Represented By: Richard E Coleson
Represented By: Courtney Turner Milbank
Represented By: James Bopp, Jr
Represented By: Melena S Siebert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: D. J. B.
Represented By: Richard E Coleson
Represented By: Courtney Turner Milbank
Represented By: James Bopp, Jr
Represented By: Melena S Siebert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: SETH CROWDER
Represented By: Richard E Coleson
Represented By: Courtney Turner Milbank
Represented By: James Bopp, Jr
Represented By: Melena S Siebert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: MARGARET ROTH
Represented By: Richard E Coleson
Represented By: Courtney Turner Milbank
Represented By: James Bopp, Jr
Represented By: Melena S Siebert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: NATALIE SPERAZZA
Represented By: Richard E Coleson
Represented By: Courtney Turner Milbank
Represented By: James Bopp, Jr
Represented By: Melena S Siebert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: The Trustees of Indiana University
Represented By: Anne K Ricchiuto
Represented By: Stephanie L Gutwein
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?