Indiana Farm Bureau Insurance v. Homan, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Indiana Farm Bureau Insurance
Defendant: Homan, Inc. and Mr. Jonas Hilty
Case Number: 1:2021cv00248
Filed: June 28, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Susan L Collins
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 23, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER GRANTING #18 MOTION to Remand to State Court by Plaintiff Indiana Farm Bureau Insurance and REMANDING this case to the Noble County Circuit Court. The preliminary pretrial conference set for July 27, 2021, is VACATED. Signed by Magistrate Judge Susan L Collins on 7/23/2021. (Copy mailed to Noble County Circuit Court)(lhc)
July 20, 2021 Filing 22 RESPONSE to Motion re #18 MOTION to Remand to State Court filed by Homan, Inc.. (Beeman, Alexander)
July 18, 2021 Filing 21 Joint Supplemental Jurisdictional Statement STIPULATION re #11 Order, Set Deadlines by Defendant Homan, Inc.. (Beeman, Alexander)
July 18, 2021 Filing 20 NOTICE by Homan, Inc. (Attorney Certification) (Beeman, Alexander)
July 16, 2021 Filing 19 Summons Issued as to Jonas Hilty. NOTE:The attached document is accessible by court personnel only. Summons forms that were electronically submitted to the court for issuance will be returned to counsel via e-mail. (kms)
July 15, 2021 Filing 18 MOTION to Remand to State Court by Plaintiff Indiana Farm Bureau Insurance. (Attachments: #1 proposed Order Granting Motion to Remand)(Cobourn-Baurley, Michelle)
July 15, 2021 Filing 17 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Jonas Hilty, filed by Indiana Farm Bureau Insurance. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Summons Jonas Hilty)(Cobourn-Baurley, Michelle)
July 14, 2021 Filing 16 NOTICE OF REASSIGNMENT OF CASE TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Pursuant to DE #14 , the parties having consented pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c), this case is referred to Magistrate Judge Susan L Collins for all purposes and is reassigned pursuant to General Order 2018-2. (bas)
July 14, 2021 Filing 15 NOTICE of Appearance by Brett Thomas Clayton on behalf of All Defendants (Clayton, Brett)
July 14, 2021 Filing 14 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Cobourn-Baurley, Michelle)
July 12, 2021 Filing 13 CERTIFICATE Attorney Certification and Client Certification filed on behalf of Plaintiff. (Cobourn-Baurley, Michelle)
July 11, 2021 Filing 12 DEMAND for Trial by Jury by Homan, Inc.. (Beeman, Alexander)
July 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER: Defendant is ORDERED to file a supplemental jurisdictional statement on or before 7/21/21. Signed by Magistrate Judge Susan L Collins on 7/7/21. (nal)
July 2, 2021 Filing 10 MAGISTRATE JUDGE CONSENT FORMS sent to all parties. (mr)
July 2, 2021 Filing 9 NOTICE of Hearing: Rule 16 Preliminary Pretrial Conference set for 7/27/2021 at 11:00 AM in US District Court - Fort Wayne before Magistrate Judge Susan L Collins. (mr)
June 29, 2021 Judge William C Lee and Magistrate Judge Susan L Collins added. *NEW CASE; MOTION PENDING* (lhc) Modified on 7/1/2021 to add text (lhc).
June 28, 2021 Filing 7 BRIEF in Support of #6 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM (Partial) filed by Homan, Inc.. (Beeman, Alexander)
June 28, 2021 Filing 6 MOTION TO DISMISS FOR FAILURE TO STATE A CLAIM (Partial) by Defendant Homan, Inc.. (Beeman, Alexander)
June 28, 2021 Filing 5 CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE by Homan, Inc. re #1 Notice of Removal, #4 Corporate Disclosure Statement, #3 Notice (Other), #2 Notice of Appearance (Beeman, Alexander)
June 28, 2021 Filing 4 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Homan, Inc.. (Beeman, Alexander)
June 28, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE by Homan, Inc. (of Motions That Remain Pending in State Court) (Beeman, Alexander)
June 28, 2021 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Alexander M Beeman on behalf of Homan, Inc. (Beeman, Alexander)
June 28, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE OF REMOVAL (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0755-4613722.) from Circuit Court of Noble County, Indiana, Cause No. 57C01-2106-PL-000018, filed by Homan, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Ex. A - State Court Complaint and Record, #2 Ex. B - Chronological Case Summary, #3 Ex. C - Proof of Service of Summons, #4 Ex. D - Affidavit of Eric Homan, #5 Ex. E - Notice of Filing Notice of Removal (State Court), #6 Civil Cover Sheet)(Beeman, Alexander)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Indiana Farm Bureau Insurance v. Homan, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Homan, Inc.
Represented By: Alexander M Beeman
Represented By: Brett Thomas Clayton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mr. Jonas Hilty
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Indiana Farm Bureau Insurance
Represented By: Michelle A Cobourn-Baurley
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?