Phoenix Intangibles Holding Company et al v. Get 2 Go et al
Plaintiff: Phoenix Intangibles Holding Company and Giant Eagle, Inc.
Defendant: Get 2 Go, Virk Brothers, LLC and Charanjit Singh
Not Classified By Court: Anthony Stites
Case Number: 1:2021cv00263
Filed: July 9, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Holly A Brady
Referring Judge: Susan L Collins
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1114
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 2, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 2, 2021 Filing 24 ANSWER to #6 Amended Complaint by Charanjit Singh, Virk Brothers, LLC.(Barnard, Larry)
September 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 23 SCHEDULING ORDER AND MEMORANDUM OF PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL CONFERENCE: The Court sets the following deadlines pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b): Initial Disclosures to be exchanged by 10/4/2021. All Fact and Expert Discovery deadline is 7/16/2022. Plaintiff expert witness disclosures and reports to be delivered to the defendant by 5/2/2022. Defendant expert witness disclosures and reports to be delivered to the plaintiff by 6/2/2022. Any amendments to the pleadings to be filed by 10/4/2021. Supplementation under Rule 26(e) due every six weeks until trial. Dispositive motions to be filed by 7/18/2022. The parties have agreed upon Anthony Stites as mediator. Signed by Magistrate Judge Susan L Collins on 9/2/2021. (lhc)
September 2, 2021 Filing 22 TELEPHONIC RULE 16 PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL CONFERENCE held on 9/2/2021 before Magistrate Judge Susan L Collins. Plas appeared by attys Christopher Opalinski and Anthony Eleftheri. Dfts appeared by atty Larry Barnard. The #21 Report of the Parties Planning Meeting is approved in all respects (except establishment of a trial date). Anthony Stites appointed as Mediator. Atty Barnard to notify Mediator by letter, copy to attys Opalinski and Eleftheri. Magistrate Consent forms due by 9/23/2021. (FTR 1st floor.) (mr)
August 30, 2021 Filing 21 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Eleftheri, Anthony)
August 13, 2021 Filing 20 NOTICE by Giant Eagle, Inc., Phoenix Intangibles Holding Company (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A, Report on the Filing or Determination of an Action Regarding a Patent or Trademark)(Eleftheri, Anthony)
August 12, 2021 Filing 19 MAGISTRATE JUDGE CONSENT FORMS sent to all parties. (mr)
August 12, 2021 Filing 18 NOTICE of Hearing: Telephonic Rule 16 Preliminary Pretrial Conference set for 9/2/2021 at 10:30 AM in US District Court - Fort Wayne before Magistrate Judge Susan L Collins. Court to initiate call.(mr)
August 3, 2021 Filing 17 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Phoenix Intangibles Holding Company, Giant Eagle, Inc.. Virk Brothers, LLC served on 7/26/2021, answer due 9/2/2021. (Eleftheri, Anthony)
August 3, 2021 Filing 16 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Phoenix Intangibles Holding Company, Giant Eagle, Inc.. Charanjit Singh served on 7/22/2021, answer due 9/2/2021. (Eleftheri, Anthony)
August 2, 2021 Set/Reset Deadlines: Dfts Virk Brothers, LLC and Charanjit Singh answers due 9/2/2021. (lhc)
July 30, 2021 Filing 15 NOTICE of Extension of Time to File Answer /Notice of Extension of Time to Respond to Plaintiffs' Complaint by Defendants Charanjit Singh, Virk Brothers, LLC. (Barnard, Larry) Modified on 8/2/2021 to term as it is not a motion (lhc).
July 30, 2021 Filing 14 NOTICE of Appearance by Larry L Barnard on behalf of Charanjit Singh, Virk Brothers, LLC (Barnard, Larry)
July 30, 2021 Filing 13 NOTICE of Appearance by Karl J Veracco on behalf of Charanjit Singh, Virk Brothers, LLC (Veracco, Karl)
July 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER granting #10 Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Jenna P Torres PHV for Giant Eagle, Inc. and Phoenix Intangibles Holding Company. Signed by Magistrate Judge Susan L Collins on 7/27/2021. (ace)
July 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #8 Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Audrey K Kwak PHV for Giant Eagle, Inc. and Phoenix Intangibles Holding Company. Signed by Magistrate Judge Susan L Collins on 7/27/2021. (ace)
July 19, 2021 Filing 10 Application for Attorney Jenna P. Torres to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Phoenix Intangibles Holding Company & Giant Eagle, Inc.. Pro Hac Vice fee of $ 96 has been received, receipt number 0755-4632530(Pro Hac Vice Temporary login, )
July 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER granting #7 Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Christopher R Opalinski PHV for Giant Eagle, Inc. and Phoenix Intangibles Holding Company. Signed by Magistrate Judge Susan L Collins on 7/19/2021. (ace)
July 16, 2021 Filing 8 Application for Attorney Audrey K. Kwak to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Phoenix Intangibles Holding Company & Giant Eagle, Inc. Pro Hac Vice fee of $ 96 has been received, receipt number 0755-4630844(Pro Hac Vice Temporary login, )
July 16, 2021 Filing 7 Application for Attorney Christopher R. Opalinski to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Phoenix Intangibles Holding Company & Giant Eagle, Inc.. Pro Hac Vice fee of $ 96 has been received, receipt number 0755-4630807(Pro Hac Vice Temporary login, ) (Additional attachment(s) added on 7/16/2021: #1 OH Certificate) (ace).
July 14, 2021 Filing 6 AMENDED COMPLAINT against Charanjit Singh, Virk Brothers, LLC, filed by Phoenix Intangibles Holding Company, Giant Eagle, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A)(Eleftheri, Anthony)
July 12, 2021 Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Charanjit Singh, Virk Brothers, LLC. NOTE:The attached document is accessible by court personnel only. Summons forms that were electronically submitted to the court for issuance will be returned to counsel via e-mail. (bas)
July 12, 2021 Filing 4 AO 120 form and Summons for Defendant Get 2 Go were not provided with the Complaint. (bas)
July 9, 2021 Judge Holly A Brady and Magistrate Judge Susan L Collins added. (NEW CASE) (bas)
July 9, 2021 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Giant Eagle, Inc., Phoenix Intangibles Holding Company. (Eleftheri, Anthony)
July 9, 2021 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Anthony M Eleftheri on behalf of All Plaintiffs (Eleftheri, Anthony)
July 9, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Get 2 Go, Virk Brothers, LLC, and Charanjit Singh ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number 0755-4624224.), filed by Phoenix Intangibles Holding Company and Giant Eagle, Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet, #3 Proposed Summons Summons to Virk Brothers, LLC, #4 Proposed Summons Summons to Charanjit Singh)(Eleftheri, Anthony) Modified on 7/12/2021 (bas).

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Phoenix Intangibles Holding Company et al v. Get 2 Go et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Phoenix Intangibles Holding Company
Represented By: Anthony M Eleftheri
Represented By: Audrey K Kwak PHV
Represented By: Christopher R Opalinski PHV
Represented By: Jenna P Torres PHV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Giant Eagle, Inc.
Represented By: Anthony M Eleftheri
Represented By: Audrey K Kwak PHV
Represented By: Christopher R Opalinski PHV
Represented By: Jenna P Torres PHV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Get 2 Go
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Virk Brothers, LLC
Represented By: Karl J Veracco
Represented By: Larry L Barnard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Charanjit Singh
Represented By: Karl J Veracco
Represented By: Larry L Barnard
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: Anthony Stites
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?