United States of America v. Rich et al
Plaintiff: United States of America
Defendant: Lynn A. Rich, I. Christine Rich, LIR LP, LAUX/ARNOLD INC., Fifth Third Bank, William Royce, Allen County Treasurer, Laux/Arnold Inc, Ingrid Christine Rich, L A Electric and William Royce
Case Number: 1:2021cv00365
Filed: September 23, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Holly A Brady
Referring Judge: Susan L Collins
Nature of Suit: Taxes
Cause of Action: 26 U.S.C. ยง 7401
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 30, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
November 30, 2021 Filing 21 STIPULATION Regarding Defendant Allen County Treasurer's Involvement in the Case by Plaintiff United States of America. (Primeaux, Samantha)
November 24, 2021 Filing 20 NOTICE of Appearance by Thomas A Hardin on behalf of William Royce (Hardin, Thomas)
November 18, 2021 Filing 19 AMENDED ANSWER to #10 Amended Complaint by LIR LP, I. Christine Rich, Lynn A. Rich. (Bolinger, Samuel)
November 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER: Defendants are ORDERED to file on or before 11/29/2021, an amended answer that is in compliance with L.R. 10-1. Signed by Magistrate Judge Susan L Collins on 11/15/2021. (lhc)
November 11, 2021 Filing 17 ANSWER to #10 Amended Complaint by LIR LP, I. Christine Rich, Lynn A. Rich.(Bolinger, Samuel)
November 11, 2021 Filing 16 NOTICE of Appearance by Samuel L Bolinger on behalf of LIR LP, I. Christine Rich, Lynn A. Rich (Bolinger, Samuel)
November 4, 2021 Filing 15 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by LIR LP. LIR LP waiver sent on 11/4/2021, answer due 1/3/2022. (Bolinger, Samuel)
November 4, 2021 Filing 14 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by I. Christine Rich. I. Christine Rich waiver sent on 11/4/2021, answer due 1/3/2022. (Bolinger, Samuel)
November 4, 2021 Filing 13 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by Lynn A. Rich. Lynn A. Rich waiver sent on 11/4/2021, answer due 1/3/2022. (Bolinger, Samuel)
November 4, 2021 Filing 12 NOTICE of Appearance by Samuel L Bolinger on behalf of LIR LP, I. Christine Rich, Lynn A. Rich (Bolinger, Samuel)
November 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER FOR JUDGE HOLLY A BRADY: In light of Pla filing an #10 Amended Complaint, the Court DEEMS MOOT #6 Stipulation of Dismissal and Disclaimer of Interest of Dft Laux/Arnold Inc a/k/a L A Electric and #9 Disclaimer of Interest and Motion to Dismiss Without Prejudice Dft Fifth Third Bank, National Association. (cer)
November 2, 2021 Filing 10 AMENDED COMPLAINT against LIR LP, I. Christine Rich, Lynn A. Rich, William Royce, filed by United States of America.(Primeaux, Samantha)
November 2, 2021 Filing 9 MOTION to Dismiss Without Prejudice and Disclaimer of Interest by Defendant Fifth Third Bank. (Patton, David)
October 27, 2021 Filing 8 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by United States of America. William Royce waiver sent on 10/6/2021, answer due 12/6/2021. (Primeaux, Samantha)
October 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER: The Court will sua sponte GRANT the Plaintiff leave to amend its Complaint for the limited purpose of revising it to reflect the dismissal of Laux/Arnold Inc., AKA, L A Electric as outlined in the Stipulation. The Court DIRECTS the Plaintiff to file the amendment by 11/2/2021. Once the Plaintiff's amended complaint has been filed, the Stipulation will be deemed moot because an amended complaint controls once it is filed, and the prior pleading will be withdrawn by operation of law. Signed by Judge Holly A Brady on 10/21/2021. (lhc)
October 20, 2021 Filing 6 STIPULATION to Dismiss Defendant Laux/Arnold Inc., aka L A Electric from case and Disclaimer of Interest by Plaintiff United States of America. (Primeaux, Samantha)
October 20, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE of Appearance by Lisa D Starks on behalf of Laux/Arnold Inc (Starks, Lisa)
October 12, 2021 Filing 4 WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by United States of America. Fifth Third Bank waiver sent on 10/6/2021, answer due 12/6/2021. (Primeaux, Samantha)
October 12, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE of Appearance by David W Patton on behalf of Fifth Third Bank (Patton, David)
September 24, 2021 Filing 2 Summons Issued as to Fifth Third Bank, LAUX/ARNOLD INC., LIR LP, I. Christine Rich, Lynn A. Rich, William Royce. NOTE:The attached document is accessible by court personnel only. Summons forms that were electronically submitted to the court for issuance will be returned to counsel via e-mail. (jdb)
September 24, 2021 **NEW CASE** Judge Holly A Brady and Magistrate Judge Susan L Collins added. (jdb)
September 23, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by United States of America. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons Lynn A. Rich, #3 Proposed Summons I. Christine Rich, #4 Proposed Summons LIR LP, #5 Proposed Summons Laux/Arnold Inc., #6 Proposed Summons Fifth Third Bank, #7 Proposed Summons Allen County Treasurer)(Primeaux, Samantha)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: United States of America v. Rich et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: United States of America
Represented By: Samantha S Primeaux
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Lynn A. Rich
Represented By: Samuel L Bolinger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: I. Christine Rich
Represented By: Samuel L Bolinger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LIR LP
Represented By: Samuel L Bolinger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LAUX/ARNOLD INC.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fifth Third Bank
Represented By: David W Patton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William Royce, Allen County Treasurer
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Laux/Arnold Inc
Represented By: Lisa D Starks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ingrid Christine Rich
Represented By: Samuel L Bolinger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: L A Electric
Represented By: Lisa D Starks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: William Royce
Represented By: Thomas A Hardin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?