Harradon v. Chase Bank
Plaintiff: David Harradon
Defendant: Chase Bank
Case Number: 1:2021cv00415
Filed: November 8, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Holly A Brady
Referring Judge: Susan L Collins
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 28, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 28, 2021 Filing 11 MAGISTRATE JUDGE CONSENT FORMS sent to all parties. (copy mailed to pro se Plaintiff) (mr)
December 28, 2021 Filing 10 NOTICE of Hearing: Telephonic Rule 16 Preliminary Pretrial Conference set for 1/20/2022 at 11:00 AM in US District Court - Fort Wayne before Magistrate Judge Susan L Collins. Court to initiate call. (copy mailed to pro se Plaintiff) (mr)
December 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER: In response to pro se Plaintiff's 11/22/2021 letter #6 requesting discovery assistance, the Court notes that any discovery requests at this time would be premature and improper. Once discovery in this matter begins, Plaintiff is directed to the Federal Rules of Civil Procedure governing discovery - specifically Rules 26 and 34. Further, because he is proceeding pro se, Plaintiff is reminded of the Local Rule 26-2(a)(2)(A) filing requirement. Signed by Magistrate Judge Susan L Collins on 12/21/2021. (Copy mailed to pro se party)(bas)
December 13, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE of Initial Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Pro Se Complaint by Defendant Chase Bank. (Underwood, Apryl) Modified on 12/14/2021 (kms).
December 13, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE of Appearance by Apryl Elizabeth Underwood on behalf of Chase Bank (Underwood, Apryl)
November 22, 2021 Filing 6 Letter from David Harradon requesting advice on how to get video surveillance and voice recording calls from Chase. (bas)
November 16, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE of a Lawsuit and Request to Waive Service of Summons sent to Chase Bank. (Copy mailed to Dft as directed in Order) Waiver of Service due by 12/16/2021. (Attachments: #1 Order, #2 Complaint) (lhc)
November 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER GRANTING #3 Motion for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis; DEFERRING payment of the filing fee; ORDERING the Plaintiff to pay the filing fee from any proceeds recovered in this case; and DIRECTING the Clerk to request Waiver of Service from (and, if necessary, the United States Marshal to serve process on) the Defendant at the address provided by Plaintiff on the Summons forms filed with his Complaint, with a copy of this Order and the Complaint, pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 1915(d). Signed by Judge Holly A Brady on 11/16/2021. (Copy mailed to pro se party)(lhc)
November 15, 2021 Filing 3 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by Plaintiff David Harradon. (bas)
November 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 ORDER: Plaintiff is DIRECTED to either pay the civil action filing fee or file a motion for leave to proceed in forma pauperis on or before 12/10/2021. The Clerk is DIRECTED to mail Plaintiff a copy of Form AO 239 to assist Plaintiff in his filing. Plaintiff is advised that, should he fail to comply with this order, this suit will be subject to dismissal without further proceedings. Signed by Judge Holly A Brady on 11/9/2021. (Copy mailed to pro se party with form as directed in Order)(mrm)
November 8, 2021 Filing 1 PRO SE COMPLAINT against Chase Bank, filed by David Harradon. (Copy of complaint mailed to Plt)(bas)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Harradon v. Chase Bank
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David Harradon
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Chase Bank
Represented By: Apryl Elizabeth Underwood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?