Simerman v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: Lori A. Simerman
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Not Classified By Court: SSA (Court Use Only)
Case Number: 1:2022cv00027
Filed: January 21, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Susan L Collins
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 405 Review of HHS Decision (SSID)
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 16, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 16, 2022 Filing 7 NOTICE OF REASSIGNMENT OF CASE TO MAGISTRATE JUDGE: The parties having consented pursuant to 28 U.S.C. Section 636(c), this case is referred to Magistrate Judge Susan L Collins for all purposes and is reassigned pursuant to General Order 2018-2. (lhc)
February 1, 2022 Set/Reset Deadlines: Commissioner of Social Security Answer due 3/28/22 per DE #6 (nae)
January 31, 2022 Filing 6 SUMMONS Returned Executed by Lori A. Simerman. All Defendants. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A (Proof of Service))(de la Torre, Adriana)
January 28, 2022 Filing 5 MAGISTRATE JUDGE CONSENT FORMS IN A SOCIAL SECURITY APPEAL CASE sent to all parties. Magistrate Consent forms due by 2/11/2022. (mr)
January 27, 2022 Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Brian Irvin on behalf of Commissioner of Social Security (Irvin, Brian)
January 24, 2022 Filing 3 Summons Issued as to Commissioner of Social Security, U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General. NOTE: The attached document is accessible by court personnel only. (nhc)
January 24, 2022 **NEW CASE** Judge Damon R Leichty and Magistrate Judge Susan L Collins added. (nhc)
January 21, 2022 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Adriana M de la Torre on behalf of Lori A. Simerman (de la Torre, Adriana)
January 21, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Commissioner of Social Security( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AINNDC-4811007.), filed by Lori A. Simerman. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons)(de la Torre, Adriana)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Simerman v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lori A. Simerman
Represented By: Adriana M de la Torre
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Represented By: Brian Irvin AUSA
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Not classified by court: SSA (Court Use Only)
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?