Gabet et al v. Amazon.com, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Renee Gabet and Annie Oakley Enterprises, Inc.
Defendant: Amazon.com, Inc. and John Does 1-50
Case Number: 1:2022cv00035
Filed: January 20, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Holly A Brady
Referring Judge: Susan L Collins
Nature of Suit: Trademark
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1051
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 14, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 14, 2022 Filing 13 MAGISTRATE JUDGE CONSENT FORMS sent to all parties. (mr)
March 14, 2022 Filing 12 NOTICE of Hearing: Telephonic Rule 16 Preliminary Pretrial Conference set for 4/12/2022 at 11:00 AM in US District Court - Fort Wayne before Magistrate Judge Susan L Collins. Court to initiate call. (mr)
March 8, 2022 Set Deadline: Per #10 Defendant Amazon.com, Inc. answer due 4/4/2022. (jdb)
March 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER granting #9 Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Robert T Cruzen PHV for Amazon.com, Inc. Signed by Magistrate Judge Susan L Collins on 3/7/2022. (ace)
March 7, 2022 Filing 10 AGREED NOTICE to extend time to file answer filed by Annie Oakley Enterprises, Inc., Renee Gabet ; answer due by April 4, 2022. (Overhauser, Paul)
March 1, 2022 Filing 9 Application for Attorney Robert T. Cruzen to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Amazon.com, Inc.. Pro Hac Vice fee of $ 96 has been received, receipt number AINNDC-4845847(Cruzen PHV, Robert)
March 1, 2022 Set/Reset Deadlines: Amazon.com,Inc. answer due 3/7/2022 per DE #8 (nae)
February 28, 2022 Filing 8 AFFIDAVIT of Service for Summons, Complaint & Order served on Amazon.com, Inc. on 02/14/2022, filed by Annie Oakley Enterprises, Inc., Renee Gabet. (Overhauser, Paul)
February 1, 2022 Filing 7 SUMMONS REISSUED as to Amazon.com, Inc. with updated case # as requested. NOTE: The attached document is accessible by court personnel only. Summons forms that were electronically submitted to the court for issuance will be returned to counsel via e-mail. (mrm)
January 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER: Pursuant to 28 N.D. of Ind. L.R. 3-1(b)(2) this case is transferred to the Fort Wayne division. New Case Number 1:22cv35. Judge Holly A. Brady and Magistrate Judge Susan L. Collins assigned. Signed by Chief Judge Jon E DeGuilio on 1/28/2022. (rmf)
January 21, 2022 Filing 5 NOTICE by Renee Gabet Report On The Filing Of An Action Regarding A Trademark (Overhauser, Paul)
January 21, 2022 Filing 4 Summons Issued as to Amazon.com, Inc. NOTE:The attached document is accessible by court personnel only. Summons forms that were electronically submitted to the court for issuance will be returned to counsel via e-mail. (jdb)
January 21, 2022 **NEW CASE** Chief Judge Jon E DeGuilio and Magistrate Judge Michael G Gotsch, Sr added. (jdb)
January 20, 2022 Filing 3 Corporate Disclosure Statement by Annie Oakley Enterprises, Inc., Renee Gabet. (Overhauser, Paul)
January 20, 2022 Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Paul B Overhauser on behalf of Annie Oakley Enterprises, Inc., Renee Gabet (Overhauser, Paul)
January 20, 2022 Filing 1 COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND against Amazon.com, Inc.( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AINNDC-4810271.), filed by Renee Gabet, Annie Oakley Enterprises, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons)(Overhauser, Paul)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gabet et al v. Amazon.com, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Renee Gabet
Represented By: Paul B Overhauser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Annie Oakley Enterprises, Inc.
Represented By: Paul B Overhauser
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amazon.com, Inc.
Represented By: Robert T Cruzen PHV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: John Does 1-50
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?