DeBoard v. Solid Rock Properties, LLC et al
Plaintiff: David DeBoard
Defendant: Solid Rock Properties, LLC, SRL Corp. and Scott Lombard
Case Number: 1:2022cv00435
Filed: November 30, 2022
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Holly A Brady
Referring Judge: Susan L Collins
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Accomodations
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 405 Fair Housing Act
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 29, 2024. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 27, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Scott Lombard, SRL Corp..(Bolinger, Samuel)
January 27, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 20 Corporate Disclosure Statement by SRL Corp. identifying Corporate Parent SRL Corp. for SRL Corp... (Bolinger, Samuel)
January 26, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ANSWER to #1 Complaint by Solid Rock Properties, LLC.(O'Dell, Robert)
January 26, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 18 Proposed Order #16 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings , #17 Brief in Support Order by Defendant Solid Rock Properties, LLC. (O'Dell, Robert). Modified on 1/26/2023 to reflect filing is not a motion. (cer)
January 26, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 17 BRIEF in Support of #16 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings filed by Solid Rock Properties, LLC. (O'Dell, Robert)
January 26, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 16 MOTION for Judgment on the Pleadings by Defendant Solid Rock Properties, LLC. (O'Dell, Robert)
January 20, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 15 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (Calhoun, Eric)
January 6, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 14 MAGISTRATE JUDGE CONSENT FORMS sent to all parties. (mr)
January 6, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 13 NOTICE of Hearing: Telephonic Rule 16 Preliminary Pretrial Conference set for 1/31/2023 at 10:00 AM in US District Court - Fort Wayne before Magistrate Judge Susan L Collins. Court to initiate call.(mr)
January 3, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER for Magistrate Judge Susan Collins: #11 Defendant, Solid Rock Properties, LLC's Amended and Unopposed Motion for Enlargement of Time to Answer Plaintiff's Original Complaint is granted. Defendant, Solid Rock Properties, LLC granted to and including 1/26/2023 to file an Answer to Plaintiff's Complaint. #7 Defendant, Solid Rock Properties, LLC's Motion for Enlargement of Time to Answer Plaintiff's Original Complaint is deemed moot. Text entry order.(mr)
December 28, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 11 Amended MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer by Defendant Solid Rock Properties, LLC. (O'Dell, Robert)
December 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER for Magistrate Judge Susan Collins: The #9 Motion for Enlargement of Time to File an Answer or Responsive Pleading is granted. Defendants, SRL Corp., and Scott Lombard are granted to and including 1/26/2023 to file an Answer to #1 Plaintiff's Complaint. Text entry order. (mr)
December 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 9 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer re #1 Complaint by Defendants Scott Lombard, SRL Corp.. (Bolinger, Samuel)
December 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Samuel L Bolinger on behalf of Scott Lombard, SRL Corp. (Bolinger, Samuel)
December 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 7 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer Plaintiff's Original Complaint by Defendant Solid Rock Properties, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(O'Dell, Robert)
December 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 6 NOTICE of Appearance by Robert S O'Dell on behalf of Solid Rock Properties, LLC (O'Dell, Robert)
December 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 5 Summons Issued as to Scott Lombard, SRL Corp., Solid Rock Properties, LLC. NOTE:The attached document is accessible by court personnel only. Summons forms that were electronically submitted to the court for issuance will be returned to counsel via e-mail. (rmf)
December 1, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 4 NOTICE of Appearance by Syed Ali Saeed on behalf of David DeBoard (Saeed, Syed)
December 1, 2022 Opinion or Order **NEW CASE** Judge Holly A Brady and Magistrate Judge Susan L Collins added. (rmf)
November 30, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 3 Proposed Summons filed by David DeBoard. (Calhoun, Eric)
November 30, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 2 NOTICE of Appearance by Eric G Calhoun on behalf of David DeBoard (Calhoun, Eric)
November 30, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT with JURY DEMAND against All Defendants ( Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AINNDC-5092193.), filed by David DeBoard. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Calhoun, Eric)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: DeBoard v. Solid Rock Properties, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: David DeBoard
Represented By: Eric G Calhoun
Represented By: Syed Ali Saeed
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Solid Rock Properties, LLC
Represented By: Robert S O'Dell
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: SRL Corp.
Represented By: Samuel L Bolinger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Scott Lombard
Represented By: Samuel L Bolinger
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?