Shand v. Porter Inc.
Defendant: Porter Inc. an Indiana Corporation doing business as Formula Boats
Intervenor Plaintiff: Gregory Shand
Case Number: 1:2023cv00007
Filed: January 6, 2023
Court: US District Court for the Northern District of Indiana
Presiding Judge: Holly A Brady
Referring Judge: Susan L Collins
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1345 Property Damage
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 22, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 22, 2023 Filing 77 TELEPHONIC HEARING (scheduled as a Rule 16 Preliminary Pretrial Conference) held on 2/22/2023 before Magistrate Judge Susan L Collins. Pla appeared by atty Madison Bode. Dft appeared by atty Emanuel McMiller. Parties advise there is an underlying matter filed in Florida, which is set for trial in February, 2024. For reasons stated on the record, Parties make oral motion to stay case pending resolution of the case filed in Florida. Court grants the Parties' oral motion and STAYS case. Telephonic Status Conference set for 9/20/2023 at 10:00 am. Court to initiate call. Parties are to file a Notice with the Court in the event the underlying Florida case is resolved prior to the 9/20/2023 Status Conference. (FTR 1st floor.) (mr)
February 15, 2023 Filing 76 REPORT of Rule 26(f) Planning Meeting. (McMiller, Emanuel)
February 2, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 75 ORDER granting #74 Application to Appear Pro Hac Vice of Attorney Madison Bode PHV for Gregory Shand. Signed by Magistrate Judge Susan L Collins on 2/2/2023. (ace)
January 27, 2023 Filing 74 Application for Attorney Madison Baxter Bode to Appear Pro Hac Vice on behalf of Gregory Shand. Pro Hac Vice fee of $ 96 has been received, receipt number AINNDC-5143701 (Attachments: #1 Exhibit DC Bar - Certificate of Good Standing, #2 Exhibit FL Bar - Certificate of Good Standing)(Bode, Madison)
January 27, 2023 Filing 73 MAGISTRATE JUDGE CONSENT FORMS sent to all parties. (mr)
January 27, 2023 Filing 72 NOTICE of Hearing: Telephonic Rule 16 Preliminary Pretrial Conference set for 2/22/2023 at 10:30 AM in US District Court - Fort Wayne before Magistrate Judge Susan L Collins. Court to initiate call.(mr)
January 27, 2023 Filing 71 TELEPHONIC STATUS CONFERENCE held on 1/27/2023 before Magistrate Judge Susan L Collins. Pla appeared by atty Madison Bode. Court was unable to reach counsel for Dft. Court will set Rule 16 Preliminary Pretrial Conference under separate order. (FTR 1st floor.) (mr)
January 20, 2023 Filing 70 NOTICE of Hearing: Telephonic Status Conference set for 2/27/2023 at 10:30 AM in US District Court - Fort Wayne before Magistrate Judge Susan L Collins. Court to initiate call.(mr)
January 18, 2023 Filing 69 NOTICE by Porter Inc. of Order from USDC Middle District of Florida Striking Amzim's Crossclaim (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1 - Order USDC FLMD)(McMiller, Emanuel)
January 18, 2023 Filing 68 NOTICE of Appearance by Emanuel L McMiller on behalf of Porter Inc. (McMiller, Emanuel)
January 18, 2023 Filing 67 NOTICE of Appearance by Angela Kelver Hall on behalf of Porter Inc. (Hall, Angela)
January 6, 2023 Filing 66 Case transferred in on Count II from District of Florida Middle; Case Number 2:21-cv-00829. Original file certified copy of transfer order and docket sheet received.
January 4, 2023 Filing 65 CROSSCLAIM against Porter Inc. filed by Amzim Marine Services, LLC.(Acuna, Krista) [Transferred from Florida Middle on 1/6/2023.]
November 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 64 ORDER granting #57 Motion to Change Venue / Transfer Case. If no objection to this order is filed within the time allotted under Fed. R. Civ. P. 72, the Clerk is directed to sever Shand's negligence claim against Porter (Doc. 33, Count II) and transfer that claim to the Northern District of Indiana while leaving the rest of the case here. If objections are timely filed, the Clerk is directed to hold disposition until so ordered by the District Judge. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kyle C. Dudek on 11/15/2022.(Dudek, Kyle) [Transferred from Florida Middle on 1/6/2023.]
September 21, 2022 Filing 63 REPLY Supporting #57 MOTION to Transfer Venue filed by Porter Inc. (Mahfood, Marcus) Modified on 9/22/2022 to edit docket text to reflect pleading title and to correct link to previous filing (SEH). [Transferred from Florida Middle on 1/6/2023.]
September 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 62 ENDORSED ORDER granting Defendant's unopposed Motion for Leave to File a Reply Brief (Docs. #60 ; #61 ). Defendant may file a reply, not to exceed ten (10) pages, on or before September 21, 2022. Signed by Judge Sheri Polster Chappell on 9/15/2022. (KRH) [Transferred from Florida Middle on 1/6/2023.]
September 13, 2022 Filing 61 NOTICE of Filing Updated Local Rule 3.01(g) Certificate of Good Faith Conference in Further Support of #60 MOTION for Leave to File A Reply Brief in Support of Motion to Transfer (Mahfood, Marcus) Modified on 9/14/2022 to remove duplicate text (SEH). [Transferred from Florida Middle on 1/6/2023.]
September 13, 2022 Filing 60 MOTION for Leave to File A Reply Brief in Support of Motion to Transfer by Porter Inc. (Mahfood, Marcus) Modified on 9/14/2022 to remove duplicate text (SEH). [Transferred from Florida Middle on 1/6/2023.]
September 7, 2022 Filing 59 RESPONSE in Opposition re #57 MOTION to Change Venue / Transfer Case filed by Gregory Shand. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Abigail Alexaides v. Formula Boats, Complaint, Case No. 17-CV-05319-R-E)(Moore, Michael) [Transferred from Florida Middle on 1/6/2023.]
August 24, 2022 Filing 58 Defendant Porter, Inc. d/b/a Formula Boats' ANSWER and Affirmative Defenses to #33 Amended Complaint in Intervention by Porter Inc. (Mahfood, Marcus) Modified on 8/25/2022 to edit docket text to reflect pleading title (SEH). [Transferred from Florida Middle on 1/6/2023.]
August 24, 2022 Filing 57 MOTION to Transfer Venue by Porter Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Executed Warranty, #2 Exhibit Order Granting Transfer Case)(Mahfood, Marcus) Modified on 8/25/2022 to edit docket text and reflect pleading title (SEH). [Transferred from Florida Middle on 1/6/2023.]
August 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 56 ENDORSED ORDER granting #54 Defendant Porter, Inc.'s Unopposed Motion to Set Aside Clerk Default. The Clerk is directed to note on the docket that the Clerk's entry of default against Porter, Inc. is set aside. The Court grants in part #54 Motion for Leave to Respond to the Amended Complaint to the extent that the response to the Amended Complaint is due by August 24, 2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kyle C. Dudek on 8/17/2022. (BLW) [Transferred from Florida Middle on 1/6/2023.]
August 16, 2022 Filing 55 NOTICE of Filing Updated Local Rule 3.01(g) Certificate of Good Faith Conference in support of #54 MOTION to Set Aside Clerk Default and MOTION for Leave to Respond to Amended Complaint in Intervention (Mahfood, Marcus) Modified on 8/25/2022 to edit docket text to reflect pleading title (SEH). [Transferred from Florida Middle on 1/6/2023.]
August 15, 2022 Filing 54 MOTION to Set Aside Clerk's Default and for Leave to Respond to Amended Complaint in Intervention by Porter Inc. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Declaration of M. Boyd of Porter Inc.)(Mahfood, Marcus) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Kyle C. Dudek. MOTION for Leave to File on 8/16/2022 (SEH). Modified on 8/16/2022 to add Motion for Leave (SEH). [Transferred from Florida Middle on 1/6/2023.]
August 11, 2022 Filing 53 NOTICE of change of address by P. Zak Colangelo (Colangelo, P.) [Transferred from Florida Middle on 1/6/2023.]
August 10, 2022 Filing 52 NOTICE of Appearance by Marcus Mahfood on behalf of Porter Inc. (Mahfood, Marcus) [Transferred from Florida Middle on 1/6/2023.]
August 3, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 51 ENDORSED ORDER denying without prejudice #50 Plaintiff's Motion for Default Judgment against Porter, Inc., for failure to comply with Local Rule 3.01(g) and confer with Defendant Amzim Marine Services, LLC, which is particularly important here given the derivative liability issues discussed in the Motion. Signed by Magistrate Judge Kyle C. Dudek on 8/3/2022. (BLW) [Transferred from Florida Middle on 1/6/2023.]
August 2, 2022 Filing 50 MOTION for Default Judgment against Porter Inc. by Gregory Shand. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A- Disclosure on Amzim's Home Page, #2 Exhibit B- Vessel Purchase Agreement)(Bode, Madison) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Kyle C. Dudek. [Transferred from Florida Middle on 1/6/2023.]
August 2, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 49 ENDORSED ORDER denying without prejudice #48 Plaintiff's Motion for Default Judgment for failure to comply with Local Rule 1.08 governing typography (typeface must be Book Antiqua, Calisto MT, Century Schoolbook, Georgia, or Palatino; Times New Roman is permitted if the main text is at least 14-point, with other requirements). Signed by Magistrate Judge Kyle C. Dudek on 8/2/2022. (BLW) [Transferred from Florida Middle on 1/6/2023.]
July 26, 2022 Filing 48 MOTION for Default Judgment against Porter Inc. by Gregory Shand. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A- Disclsoure on Amzim's Home Page, #2 Exhibit B- Vessel Purchase Agreement)(Bode, Madison) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Kyle C. Dudek. [Transferred from Florida Middle on 1/6/2023.]
July 1, 2022 Filing 47 Case Reassigned to U.S. Magistrate Judge Kyle C Dudek. New case number: 2:21-cv-829-SPC-KCD. Magistrate Judge Mac R. McCoy no longer assigned to the case. (SMG) [Transferred from Florida Middle on 1/6/2023.]
June 22, 2022 Filing 46 SET ASIDE pursuant to 56 - Clerk's ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Porter Inc. (JK) Modified on 8/19/2022 to include language regarding default set aside (SEH). [Transferred from Florida Middle on 1/6/2023.]
June 7, 2022 Filing 45 NOTICE of Appearance by Madison Bode on behalf of Gregory Shand (Bode, Madison) [Transferred from Florida Middle on 1/6/2023.]
June 2, 2022 Filing 44 MOTION for Default Judgment against Porter Inc. by Gregory Shand. (Moore, Michael) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Mac R. McCoy. [Transferred from Florida Middle on 1/6/2023.]
May 9, 2022 Filing 43 PROOF of service by Gregory Shand (Attachments: #1 Affidavit of Service on Defendant Porter Inc, #2 Exhibit Summons Served on Defendant Porter Inc) (Moore, Michael) Modified as to docket text on 5/10/2022 (JK). [Transferred from Florida Middle on 1/6/2023.]
April 18, 2022 Filing 42 SUMMONS issued as to Porter Inc. (JK) [Transferred from Florida Middle on 1/6/2023.]
April 15, 2022 Filing 41 PROPOSED summons to be issued by Gregory Shand. (Moore, Michael) [Transferred from Florida Middle on 1/6/2023.]
April 11, 2022 Filing 40 NOTICE of Appearance by P. Zak Colangelo on behalf of Amzim Marine Services, LLC (Colangelo, P.) [Transferred from Florida Middle on 1/6/2023.]
April 8, 2022 Filing 39 NOTICE of Appearance by Krista Fowler Acuna on behalf of Amzim Marine Services, LLC (Acuna, Krista) [Transferred from Florida Middle on 1/6/2023.]
March 28, 2022 Filing 38 ANSWER and affirmative defenses to #33 Amended Complaint by Amzim Marine Services, LLC.(Hamilton, Jerry) Modified as to docket text on 4/18/2022 (JK). [Transferred from Florida Middle on 1/6/2023.]
March 16, 2022 Filing 37 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement re 25 MOTION for Extension of Time to File Corporate Disclosure Statements by Gregory Shand. (Moore, Michael) [Transferred from Florida Middle on 1/6/2023.]
March 16, 2022 Filing 36 NOTICE of a related action per Local Rule 1.07(c) by Gregory Shand. Related case(s): No (Moore, Michael) [Transferred from Florida Middle on 1/6/2023.]
March 16, 2022 Filing 35 NOTICE of Lead Counsel Designation by Michael T. Moore on behalf of Gregory Shand. Lead Counsel: Michael T. Moore. (Moore, Michael) [Transferred from Florida Middle on 1/6/2023.]
March 16, 2022 Filing 34 NOTICE of Lead Counsel Designation by Robert Mark Borak on behalf of Geico Marine Insurance Company. Lead Counsel: Robert M. Borak. (Borak, Robert) [Transferred from Florida Middle on 1/6/2023.]
March 14, 2022 Filing 33 AMENDED COMPLAINT in Intervention against Amzim Marine Services, LLC, Porter Inc., filed by Gregory Shand. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Amzim Home Page, #2 Exhibit Knox Marine Report, #3 Exhibit TMSN Report)(Moore, Michael) Modified as to docket text and to reflect counsel notified of full use of case number on filings on 3/15/2022 (JK). [Transferred from Florida Middle on 1/6/2023.]
March 14, 2022 Filing 32 NOTICE of a related action per Local Rule 1.07(c) by Amzim Marine Services, LLC. Related case(s): No (Hamilton, Jerry) Modified to remove duplicate docket text on 3/15/2022 (JK). [Transferred from Florida Middle on 1/6/2023.]
March 14, 2022 Filing 31 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement by Amzim Marine Services, LLC (Hamilton, Jerry) Modified to remove corporate parent entered in error and as to docket text on 3/14/2022 (JK). [Transferred from Florida Middle on 1/6/2023.]
March 14, 2022 Filing 30 NOTICE of Lead Counsel Designation by Jerry Dean Hamilton on behalf of Amzim Marine Services, LLC. Lead Counsel: Jerry D. Hamilton. (Hamilton, Jerry) [Transferred from Florida Middle on 1/6/2023.]
March 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 28 CASE MANAGEMENT AND SCHEDULING ORDER: Rule 26(a)(1) Mandatory Initial Disclosure to be exchanged by 3/15/2022; Motions to add or join parties or amend pleadings due by 5/11/2022; Plaintiff disclosure of expert report due by 12/1/2022; Defendant disclosure of expert report due by 1/4/2023; Rebuttal of expert report by 2/1/2023; Discovery due by 3/1/2023; Dispositive motions due by 5/1/2023; Final Pretrial Meeting by 9/1/2023; Motions in Limine due by 9/8/2023; Joint Final Pretrial statement due by 9/15/2023; Final Pretrial Conference set for 9/29/2023 at 09:30 AM in Ft. Myers Courtroom 5 D before Judge Sheri Polster Chappell; and Bench Trial set for 10/2/2023 in Ft. Myers Courtroom 5 D before Judge Sheri Polster Chappell. Conduct mediation hearing by 3/15/2023. Lead counsel to coordinate dates. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mac R. McCoy on 3/9/2022. (FN) [Transferred from Florida Middle on 1/6/2023.]
March 9, 2022 Filing 27 Minute Entry for Telephonic Proceedings held before Magistrate Judge Mac R. McCoy: granting 24 Joint Oral Motion by All Parties to approve Mediator designated in Case Management Report; granting 24 Joint Oral Motion by All Parties for Extension of Time to File Designation of Lead Counsel of Record by 3/16/2022; granting 25 Joint Oral Motion by Intervenor Plaintiff and Defendant for Extension of Time to File Corporate Disclosure Statements by 3/16/2022; and granting 26 Joint Oral Motion by Intervenor Plaintiff and Defendant for Extension of Time to File Notices of Related Action by 3/16/2022. PRELIMINARY PRETRIAL CONFERENCE held on 3/9/2022. (Digital) (FN) [Transferred from Florida Middle on 1/6/2023.]
March 9, 2022 Filing 26 JOINT ORAL MOTION by Intervenor Plaintiff and Defendant for Extension of Time to File Notices of Related Action by 3/16/2022. (FN) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Mac R. McCoy. [Transferred from Florida Middle on 1/6/2023.]
March 9, 2022 Filing 25 JOINT ORAL MOTION by Intervenor Plaintiff and Defendant for Extension of Time to File Corporate Disclosure Statements by 3/16/2022. (FN) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Mac R. McCoy. [Transferred from Florida Middle on 1/6/2023.]
March 9, 2022 Filing 24 JOINT ORAL MOTION by All Parties to approve Mediator designated in Case Management Report and JOINT ORAL MOTION by All Parties for Extension of Time to File Designation of Lead Counsel of Record by 3/16/2022. (FN) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Mac R. McCoy. [Transferred from Florida Middle on 1/6/2023.]
March 7, 2022 Filing 23 INTERVENOR COMPLAINT filed by Gregory Shand.(JK) [Transferred from Florida Middle on 1/6/2023.]
March 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER granting #16 Motion to Intervene. Gregory Shand is permitted to intervene in this action as a plaintiff. Accordingly, the Clerk of Court is directed to file Gregory Shand's Complaint in Intervention, (Doc. 16-1), as a new and separate docket entry. See Order for details. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mac R. McCoy on 3/7/2022. (WJF) [Transferred from Florida Middle on 1/6/2023.]
March 4, 2022 Filing 21 NOTICE of a related action per Local Rule 1.07(c) by Geico Marine Insurance Company. Related case(s): No (Borak, Robert) Modified to reflect counsel notified of full use of case number on filings on 3/4/2022 (JK). [Transferred from Florida Middle on 1/6/2023.]
March 1, 2022 Filing 20 CASE MANAGEMENT REPORT. (Borak, Robert) [Transferred from Florida Middle on 1/6/2023.]
February 22, 2022 Filing 19 NOTICE OF RESCHEDULING HEARING: The Preliminary Pretrial Conference hearing previously scheduled for 3/1/2022 is rescheduled. New scheduling date and time: Telephonic Preliminary Pretrial Conference set for 3/9/2022 at 10:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Mac R. McCoy. DIAL IN INSTRUCTIONS: TOLL FREE NUMBER: 1-888-273-3658, ACCESS CODE: 8335587. Dial in at least 5 minutes before hearing time. Landline preferred. Do not use the speaker phone feature during the call.(FN) [Transferred from Florida Middle on 1/6/2023.]
February 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 18 TEXT ORDER granting #17 Joint Stipulation for Enlargement of Time to File Case Management Report. The Court finds good cause to (1) extend the time by which the parties must file the Case Management Report and (2) continue the upcoming Preliminary Pretrial Conference. Accordingly, the parties must file a uniform Case Management Report no later than 3/1/2022. Additionally, the Clerk of Court is directed to reschedule the 3/1/2022 Preliminary Pretrial Conference for 3/9/2022 at 10:30 AM. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mac R. McCoy on 2/17/2022. (WJF) [Transferred from Florida Middle on 1/6/2023.]
February 15, 2022 Filing 17 STIPULATION for Enlargement of Time to File Case Management Report (Joint) by Geico Marine Insurance Company. (Borak, Robert) Modified on 2/16/2022 to make pending motion and refer to Judge McCoy (AEH). [Transferred from Florida Middle on 1/6/2023.]
February 14, 2022 Filing 16 MOTION to Intervene by Gregory Shand. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Complaint in Intervention)(Moore, Michael) [Transferred from Florida Middle on 1/6/2023.]
January 20, 2022 Filing 15 ANSWER and affirmative defenses to #1 Complaint by Amzim Marine Services, LLC.(Hamilton, Jerry) Modified as to docket text on 1/21/2022 (JK). [Transferred from Florida Middle on 1/6/2023.]
January 11, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ENDORSED ORDER granting #13 Defendant's Unopposed Motion for an Extension of Time to File Response to Complaint [D.E. 1]. Defendant must answer or otherwise respond to Plaintiff's Complaint, (Doc. #1 ), no later than 1/20/2022. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mac R. McCoy on 1/11/2022. (WJF) [Transferred from Florida Middle on 1/6/2023.]
January 10, 2022 Filing 13 UNOPPOSED MOTION for Extension of Time to File Response re #1 Complaint by Amzim Marine Services, LLC. (Hamilton, Jerry) Motions referred to Magistrate Judge Mac R. McCoy. Modified as to docket text on 1/11/2022 (JK). [Transferred from Florida Middle on 1/6/2023.]
January 7, 2022 Filing 12 AMENDED NOTICE of Appearance by Jerry Dean Hamilton on behalf of Amzim Marine Services, LLC (Hamilton, Jerry) Modified as to docket text on 1/10/2022 (JK). [Transferred from Florida Middle on 1/6/2023.]
January 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER Governing Telephonic Proceedings. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mac R. McCoy on 1/6/2022. (FN) [Transferred from Florida Middle on 1/6/2023.]
January 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER Governing Preliminary Pretrial Conference. Signed by Magistrate Judge Mac R. McCoy on 1/6/2022. (FN) [Transferred from Florida Middle on 1/6/2023.]
January 6, 2022 Filing 9 NOTICE of Hearing: Telephonic Preliminary Pretrial Conference set for 3/1/2022 at 10:30 AM before Magistrate Judge Mac R. McCoy. DIAL IN INSTRUCTIONS: TOLL FREE NUMBER: 1-888-273-3658, ACCESS CODE: 8335587. Dial in at least 5 minutes before hearing time. Landline preferred. Do not use the speaker phone feature during the call. Notwithstanding any prior Order of the Court, the parties must jointly file a Case Management Report on the approved form no later than 2/15/2022. To the extent Fed. R. Civ. P. 16(b)(2) so requires, the Court finds good cause to extend the time period for entering the Case Management and Scheduling Order until after the Case Management Report is filed and the Preliminary Pretrial Conference is held. (FN) [Transferred from Florida Middle on 1/6/2023.]
January 6, 2022 Filing 8 NOTICE of Appearance by Jerry Dean Hamilton on behalf of Amzim Marine Services, LLC (Hamilton, Jerry) [Transferred from Florida Middle on 1/6/2023.]
December 27, 2021 Filing 7 PROOF of service by Geico Marine Insurance Company as to Amzim Marine Services, LLC (Borak, Robert) Modified on 12/27/2021 to show as to whom service was issued. Notified counsel of correct event to use in the future (jmc). [Transferred from Florida Middle on 1/6/2023.]
November 9, 2021 Filing 6 SUMMONS issued as to Amzim Marine Services, LLC. (jmc) [Transferred from Florida Middle on 1/6/2023.]
November 9, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE of Local Rule 3.02(a)(2), which requires the parties in every civil proceeding, except those described in subsection (d), to file a case management report (CMR) using the uniform form at www.flmd.uscourts.gov. The CMR must be filed (1) within forty days after any defendant appears in an action originating in this court, (2) within forty days after the docketing of an action removed or transferred to this court, or (3) within seventy days after service on the United States attorney in an action against the United States, its agencies or employees. Judges may have a special CMR form for certain types of cases. These forms can be found at www.flmd.uscourts.gov under the Forms tab for each judge. (Signed by Deputy Clerk). (jmc) [Transferred from Florida Middle on 1/6/2023.]
November 9, 2021 Filing 4 CIVIL Action Order. Signed by All Divisional Judges on 11/9/2021. (jmc) [Transferred from Florida Middle on 1/6/2023.]
November 8, 2021 Filing 3 NEW CASE ASSIGNED to Judge Sheri Polster Chappell and Magistrate Judge Mac R. McCoy. New case number: 2:21-cv-829-SPC-MRM. (MLJ) [Transferred from Florida Middle on 1/6/2023.]
November 8, 2021 Filing 2 CERTIFICATE of interested persons and corporate disclosure statement by Geico Marine Insurance Company identifying Corporate Parent Berkshire Hathaway for Geico Marine Insurance Company. (Borak, Robert) [Transferred from Florida Middle on 1/6/2023.]
November 8, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Amzim Marine Services, LLC (Filing fee $ 402 receipt number AFLMDC-18905042) filed by Geico Marine Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Proposed Summons)(Borak, Robert) [Transferred from Florida Middle on 1/6/2023.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the Indiana Northern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Shand v. Porter Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Intervenor plaintiff: Gregory Shand
Represented By: Michael T. Moore
Represented By: Madison Bode
Represented By: Madison Bode PHV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Porter Inc. an Indiana Corporation doing business as Formula Boats
Represented By: Marcus Mahfood
Represented By: Angela Kelver Hall
Represented By: Emanuel L McMiller
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?